Paul Andress v. Daubert Law Firm LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit, Case No. 16-1078

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 11:06 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None
Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Joel D. Bertocchi for Appellees Daubert Law Firm LLC and Michael A. Stueland. [2] [6723781] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [16-1078] [Edited 01/26/2016 by CAG to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Bertocchi, Joel)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
    Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 01/27/2016. Appellant's brief due on or before 02/22/2016 for Paul Andress. [1] [6721094] [16-1078] (MM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 85 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?