Automotores Galindo, S.A. v. Ford Motor Company
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 15-14414

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 5:54 AM EST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108710129 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
ORDER: Motion to dismiss appeal without prejudice filed by Appellant Automotores Galindo, S.A. is GRANTED. [7600395-2] RSR and JP
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108641591 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None
    MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal without prejudice filed by Automotores Galindo, S.A.. Motion is Opposed. [7600395-1] (ECF: Jack Reiter)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108633225 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by David L. Luck - Appellee Ford Motor Company (ECF: David Luck)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108633212 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Wendy F. Lumish for Ford Motor Company. (ECF: Wendy Lumish)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108626897 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
          CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Automotores Galindo, S.A. on 09/30/2015. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on 10/23/2015 as to Appellant Automotores Galindo, S.A.
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 23 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?