City of Santa Monica v. USA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 14-55583

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 4:41 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Deanne Maynard for Appellant City of Santa Monica. [9810268] [14-55583] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 12/30/2015 01:57 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Ms. Alisa Beth Klein for Appellees FAA, Michael P. Huerta and USA. [9807544] [14-55583] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 12/29/2015 06:05 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Appellant City of Santa Monica Correspondence: Notice of withdrawal of attorney of record, Don G. Rushing.. Date of service: 12/23/2015 [9803746] [14-55583] (Rushing, Don) [Entered: 12/23/2015 11:37 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) Appellant City of Santa Monica Correspondence: regarding availability for oral argument. Date of service: 11/25/2015 [9771000] [14-55583] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 11/25/2015 12:46 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
          Filed clerk order: The reply brief [40] submitted by City of Santa Monica is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9446563] (GV) [Entered: 03/05/2015 11:24 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 40 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
            Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 03/04/2015. [9445798] [14-55583] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 03/04/2015 04:22 PM]
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellant’s unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief is due March 4, 2015. [9394547] (SM) [Entered: 01/23/2015 04:18 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                Filed clerk order: The amicus brief [34] submitted by Aircraft Owners and Pilots Association and National Business Aviation Association is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: green. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9394436] (GV) [Entered: 01/23/2015 03:51 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                  Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review (by government or with consent per FRAP 29(a)). Submitted by Aircraft Owners and Pilots Association and National Business Aviation Association. Date of service: 01/22/2015. [9392083] [14-55583] (Yodice, Kathleen) [Entered: 01/22/2015 01:49 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Appellant City of Santa Monica Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 03/04/2015. Date of service: 01/22/2015. [9392045] [14-55583] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 01/22/2015 01:40 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                    Filed clerk order: The answering brief [30] submitted by FAA and Michael P. Huerta is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9386388] (GV) [Entered: 01/16/2015 03:49 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                      Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellees FAA, Michael P. Huerta and USA. Date of service: 01/15/2015. [9384468] [14-55583] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 01/15/2015 02:07 PM]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LBS): Appellees’ unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief is due January 23, 2015. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9281020] (LBS) [Entered: 10/17/2014 01:22 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                          Received Appellant City of Santa Monica excerpts of record [22] in 3 volumes. Served on 10/14/2014. Deficiencies: excerpts of record pages are double-sided. Notified counsel (See attached notice). [9280583] (GV) [Entered: 10/17/2014 10:37 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) Appellees FAA, Michael P. Huerta and USA Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 01/23/2015. Date of service: 10/16/2014. [9279007] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 10/16/2014 11:32 AM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                              Filed clerk order: The opening brief [22] submitted by City of Santa Monica is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [22] submitted by City of Santa Monica. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9278277] (GV) [Entered: 10/15/2014 05:14 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 10/14/2014. [9275845] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 10/14/2014 01:45 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joanna L. Simon for Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 10/14/2014. [9275069] (Simon, Joanna) [Entered: 10/14/2014 09:52 AM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jessica E. Palmer for Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 09/18/2014. [9245360] (Ryen, Jessica) [Entered: 09/18/2014 02:44 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marc A. Hearron for Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 09/18/2014. [9245343] (Hearron, Marc) [Entered: 09/18/2014 02:41 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard for Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 09/18/2014. [9245333] (Maynard, Deanne) [Entered: 09/18/2014 02:40 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                        Filed Mediation order: This case is NOT SELECTED for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Counsel may contact circuit mediator to discuss services available through the court's mediation program, to request a settlement assessment conf, or to request a stay of the appeal for settlement purposes. Also, upon agreement of the parties, the brfing sch can be modified or vacated to facilitate settlement discussions. Csl are requested to send copies of this order to their clients. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [9128082] (BS) [Entered: 06/11/2014 11:06 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alisa B. Klein for Appellees FAA, Michael P. Huerta and USA. Date of service: 05/01/2014. [9079647] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 05/01/2014 12:44 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant City of Santa Monica Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/18/2014. [9063691] (O'Connor, William) [Entered: 04/18/2014 12:04 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph Lawrence for Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 04/15/2014. [9058342]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected notice. Resent NDA. 04/15/2014 by RY] (Lawrence, Joseph) [Entered: 04/15/2014 10:49 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marsha Jones Moutrie for Appellant City of Santa Monica. Date of service: 04/15/2014. [9058258] (Moutrie, Marsha) [Entered: 04/15/2014 10:32 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Filed Appellant City of Santa Monica's Representation Statement. Served on 04/11/2014. [9055762] (JN) [Entered: 04/11/2014 04:23 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                    DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/18/2014. Transcript ordered by 05/12/2014. Transcript due 08/11/2014. Appellant City of Santa Monica opening brief due 09/22/2014. Appellees Federal Aviation Administration, Michael P. Huerta and United States of America answering brief due 10/22/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9055745] (JN) [Entered: 04/11/2014 04:17 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?