CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00231

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2017 at 10:46 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Cause Of Action Institute, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cause Of Action Institute

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russel James Valvo, III +1 202 499 4232 james.valvo@causeofaction.org
v.
National Archives & Records Administration National Archives & Records Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal , joint, with prejudice by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
    Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Answer
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None civil cover sheet
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 32 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?