Trump Taj Mahal Associates
Bankruptcy Case New Jersey Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 91-13321
District Judge Rosemary Gambardella, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 5:45 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Steven Sciaretta, Creditor Committee
No Logo Thomas E. Ross, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Schneider +1 201 645 5912
Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP, Debtor
Officially listed as "Trump Taj Mahal Associates"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ben H. Becker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ben H. Becker +1 201 912 8084

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine, Staller, Sklar, Chan & Brodsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur E. Sklar +1 609 348 1300

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald J. Crecca +1 973 622 4444 +1 973 849 4068 dcrecca@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ribis, Graham, Verdon & Curtin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/1992 Richard T. Ludwig +1 201 292 1700
TERMINATED: 06/22/1992 Robert Regimbal +1 201 292 1700
TERMINATED: 06/22/1992 Brian D. Spector +1 201 292 1700

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz, Tobia & Stanziale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neal M. Ruben +1 201 746 6000
Space Charles A. Stanziale, Jr. +1 201 746 6000

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael W. Hile +1 212 935 8000
Space Lawrence O Kamin +1 212 728 8231 +1 212 728 8111 lkamin@willkie.com
Space Theodore LaPier +1 212 935 8000
Space Andrew V. Tenzer +1 212 935 8000
Space Myron Trepper +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111
  Entries (928) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
Docket Text: Order Granting [927-1] Application Authorizing Entry of Final Decree NUNC PRO TUNC Pursuant to Docket No. 926 as Filed on September 6, 1996 and Entered on the Docket Septemeber 13, 1996 by Trump Taj Mahal Associates, Trump Taj Mahal Inc., The Trump Taj Mahal Corporation and Trump Taj Mahal Funding, Inc {mvb) (EOD 08/02/00] Modified on 5/19/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
    Docket Text: Application for the Entry of Order NUNC PRO TUNC Pursuant to Docket No. 926 as Filed on September 6, 1996 and Entered on the Docket on September 13, 1996 Filed By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Authorizing Entry of Final Decree {mvb) (EOD 08/02/00] Modified on 5/19/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 9/6/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re:Proposed form of objection to final decree. Outcome OTBS (ccg) (EOD 09/13/96] Modified on 5/19/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
        Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Proposed form of objection to final decree. Outcome Telephone Conf. call (ccg) (EOD 09/12I 96] Modified on 5/19/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document 924 Filed: 9/3/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
          Docket Text: Copy of Notice of Appeal re: Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates from U.S.D.C. (ccg) [EOD 09/04/96] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 7/23/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
            Docket Text: Letter to withdraw the claim for administrative Expense filed by AIG. (ccg) (EOD 07/30/96] Modified on 5/19/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 3/29/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
              Docket Text: Memorandum of Law of claimant DCA Inc. in opposition to debtor's proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law and in further support of DCA Inc. proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (ccg) (EOD 03/29/96] Modified on 5/19/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                Docket Text: Bond of Trustee and Approval In Amount of $ 2,008,819.79 With U.S. Fire Insurance Co. As Surety. (ccg) [EOD 03/22/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 3/12/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                  Docket Text: Order resolving [912-1] Motion to stay execution and proceedings to enforce judgment pending final disposition of its appeal by Trump Taj Mahal Associates . (ccg) [EOD 03/13/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                    Docket Text: Memorandum of law of DCA Incorporated of [912-1] Motion to stay execution and proceedings to enforce judgment pending final disposition of its appeal by Trump Taj Mahal Associates . (ccg) [EOD 03/11/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [912-1] Motion to stay execution and proceedings to enforce judgment pending final disposition of its appeal by Trump Taj Mahal Associates . Outcome granted. (ccg) [EOD 03/08/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                        Docket Text: Letter from Dilworth, Paxson, Kalich & Kauffman re: Motion to Stay Execution and Designation of Record on Appeal. (lmw) [EOD 03/05/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 2/28/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 DocumentCourt Filing
                          Docket Text: Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal Re: [904-1] District Court Docket Number 96-822 assigned to U.S. District Judge Bissell (lmw) [EOD 03/05/96] [91-13321 Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                            Docket Text: Transmission of Record on Appeal to the U.S. District Court Re: [904-1] Notice Appeal by Trump Taj Mahal Associates of 1/29/96 (ccg) [EOD 02/21/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 2/16/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                              Docket Text: Designation By DCA Incorporated Of additional record items on appeal. (ccg) [EOD 02/21/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                Docket Text: Brief in Support of [912-1] Motion to stay execution and proceedings to enforce pending final disposition of its appeal by Trump Taj Mahal Associates . (ccg) [EOD 02/15/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                  Docket Text: Notice of Motion by attorney for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates to stay execution and proceedings to enforce judgment pending final disposition of its appeal.APPEARANCES WILL BE REQUIRED BY THE COURT. (ccg) [EOD 02/15/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                    Docket Text: Debtor's statement of issues on appeal. (ccg) [EOD 02/09/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 2/8/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                      Docket Text: Designation By Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of Contents For Inclusion In Record On Appeal Re: [904-1] Notice Appeal by Trump Taj Mahal Associates ; Transmission Due: 3/11/96 (ccg [EOD 02/09/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                        Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 4/1/94 (slh) [EOD 02/02/96] [Edit date 02/02/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 9/2/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                          Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 2/26/93 (slh) [EOD 02/02/96] [Edit date 02/02/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 9/6/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                            Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 4/2/94 (slh) [EOD 02/02/96] [Edit date 02/02/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                              Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By attorney for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [904-1] Notice Appeal. (ccg) [EOD 01/30/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [904-1] Notice Appeal by Trump Taj Mahal Associates . (ccg) [EOD 01/30/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                  Docket Text: Notice Of Appeal By attorney for Trump Taj Mahal Associates Appeal Designation Due: 2/8/96 RE: [903-1] Order allowing the claim of DCA, Inc. (ccg) [EOD 01/30/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document 903 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                    Docket Text: Order allowing claim of DCA, Inc. . (ccg) [EOD 01/30/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 902 Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 DocumentCourt Filing
                                                      Docket Text: Opinion by Judge Rosemary Gambardella re: That DCA's claim shall be fixed in the amount of $2,008,819.79. (ccg) [EOD 01/03/96] [91-13321] Modified on 5/13/2016 (Purce, Sharon). Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                        Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 2/3/95 (slh) [EOD 04/05/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Oral argument on poat trial briefs . (ccg) [EOD 02/14/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document 899 Filed: 1/31/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                            Docket Text: Reply brief in further Support of debtor's objection to proof of claim of DCA Incorporated . (ccg) [EOD 02/01/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 1/26/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                              Docket Text: Memorandum of law in Support By Creditor DCA Incorporated of [896-1] finding of facts and conclusions of law. (ccg) [EOD 02/01/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Dilworth Paxson Kalish & Kauffman for Creditor Resorts International, Inc. Of [893-1] Post Trial Brief in support of debtors objection to proof of claim. (ccg) [EOD 01/24/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 896 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                  Docket Text: Proposed findings of fact of claimant DCA Inc. in support of proof of claim. (ccg) [EOD 01/19/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 895 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                    Docket Text: Proposed conclusions of law of claimant DCA Inc. in support of proof of claim. (ccg) [EOD 01/19/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 894 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                      Docket Text: Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law in support of debtor's objection to proof of claim of DCA Inc. (ccg) [EOD 01/19/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 893 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                        Docket Text: Post Trial brief in Support of debtor's objection to proof of claim of DCA Inc, (ccg) [EOD 01/19/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 892 Filed: 1/17/1995, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                          Docket Text: Proposed findings of fact of claimant DCA Inc. in support of proof of claim. (ccg) [EOD 01/18/95] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 891 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                            Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on Feb. 25, 1993 re: Trial, objection to motion to disallow expunge or reduce claim of DCA. (tw) [EOD 08/04/94] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 890 Filed: 8/4/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                            Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on Feb. 24, 1993 re: Trial, objection to motion to disallow, expunge or reduce claim of DCA. (tw) [EOD 08/04/94] [91-13321] Modified on 5/11/2016 (clb).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 889 Filed: 7/22/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                              Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on Jan. 29, 1993 re: obj. to motion to disallow expunge or reduce claim of DCA. (tw) [EOD 07/27/94] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 888 Filed: 7/22/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on Jan. 28, 1993 re: obj. to motion to disallow expunge or reduce claim of DCA. (tw) [EOD 07/27/94] [91-13321]Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 887 Filed: 5/16/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Rich McBride to being barred and precluded from asserting rights or claims for damages or any other rights of first refusal from breach of right of first refusal. (tw) [EOD 06/09/94] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 886 Filed: 5/31/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Mooting [852-1] Motion To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Court Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County; Granting [852-2] Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (tw) [EOD 06/03/94] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 885 Filed: 3/15/1994, Entered: 4/28/2016 DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                    Docket Text: Copy Of District Court Order By Judge Alfred M. Wolin Dismissing Notice Of Appeal Filed RE: [884-1] Order Denying Motion Of Targan & Kievit, Attorneys For John Frantz, For An Order Permitting The Defendant To File A Late Notice Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 03/16/94] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 884 Filed: 12/20/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Denying [847-1] Motion For An Order Allowing Plaintiff To File A Late Notice Of Claim And For Such Other And Further Relief As The Court Deems To Be Just And Proper by Marlene Hope. (ere) [EOD 12/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 883 Filed: 10/14/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Denying [863-1] Order To Show Cause To Permit Ida Zdorovyak To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 10/18/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 882 Filed: 10/8/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                        Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 7/2/93 RE: Order To Show Cause To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 10/12/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 881 Filed: 9/30/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                          Docket Text: Opinion by Judge Rosemary Gambardella re: Motion to permit Ida Zdorovyak to file a late proof of claim. (ccg)[EOD 10/06/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 880 Filed: 9/15/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Dismissing [772-1] Notice of Appeal. (cv)[EOD 09/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 879 Filed: 9/8/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Canceled (Minute Sheet) and Motion Withdrawn Re: Motion To Vacate Stay By Samuel And Ethel Gorenstein. (NOTE: Motion Is Not Docketed). (ere) [EOD 09/14/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 878 Filed: 9/9/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                Docket Text: Stipulation and Order Of Settlement And Release Between Trump Tah Mahal Associates, Et Al., Debtors (Case No.'s 91-13321, 91-13325, 91-13331 and 91-13334), The Trump Organization, Resorts International, Inc., Et Al., Debtors (Case No.'s 89-10119, 89-10120, 89-10461 and 89-10462) And Resorts International Hotel, Inc. With Regard To The Assignment Of Pandick, Inc.'s Protective Proof Of Claim No. 514.00 To Trump Taj Mahal Associates, Et Al., Debtors. (ere)[EOD 09/14/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 877 Filed: 9/13/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Status Conference Per Letter Dated 7/1/93 From MP. (Outcome: Settled Per C. Stanziale). (ere)[EOD 09/14/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 876 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                    Docket Text: Clerk's Certification RE: Notice of Appeal to District Court For an Order Dismissing Appeal. (cv) [EOD 09/08/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                      Docket Text: Brief in Support To [852-2] Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim by Trump Taj Mahal Associates,[852-1] Motion To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County by Trump Taj Mahal Associates . (cCg) [EOD 09/08/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 874 Filed: 8/31/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Status Conference Re-Scheduled For September 13, 1993 at 2:00, Courtroom E, Newark. (ere) [EOD 09/01/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 8/30/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Motion To Vacate Stay By Samuel and Ethel Gorenstein Re-Scheduled For September 8, 1993 at 10:00, Courtroom E, Newark. (ere) [EOD 08/31/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 872 Filed: 8/23/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                            Docket Text: Letter Memorandum In Taj Mahal Associates Permission To File A Ida Zdorovyak. (ere) Response By Attorney For Debtor Trump To [863-1] Order To Show Cause For Late Proof Of Claim By Attorney For [EOD 08/27/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 871 Filed: 8/17/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [863-1] file late proof of claim [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 870 Filed: 8/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                Docket Text: Stipulation By And Between Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates and Creditor Marlene Hope Allowing Marlene Hope To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 08119193][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 869 Filed: 8/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certification of Ben H. Becker in support of memorandum of Law in opposition to movants motion to file a late proof of claim. (ccg) [EOD 08118193] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 868 Filed: 8/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Memorandum of Law in opposition to movants motion to file a late proof of claim By attorneys for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates . (ccg) [EOD 08118193] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 867 Filed: 8/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification of Robert Feith in Support To [864-1] Support of memorandum of Law in opposition to movants motion to file late proof of claims by Ida Zdorovyak (ccg) [EOD 08118193] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 866 Filed: 8/17/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Status Conference Per Letter Dated 7/1/93 From MP Re-Scheduled For August 31, 1993 at 2:00, Courtroom E, Newark. (ere) [EOD 08/18/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 865 Filed: 7/22/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Michael Steiman for Creditor Ida Zdorovyak Of [863-1] Order To Show Cause For Permission To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 07130193][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 864 Filed: 7/15/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Petition In Support By Attorney For Creditor Ida Zdorovyak To [863-1] Order To Show Cause For Permission To File A Late Proof Of Claim Form. (ere) [EOD 07119193][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 863 Filed: 7/15/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order To Show Cause For Permission To File A Late Proof Of Claim Form By Attorney For Ida Zdorovyak; Show Cause Hearing Set For 11:00 8117193 AT Courtroom E, Newark (ere)[EOD 07I 19I 93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 6/29/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Attorneys For The Estate Of Kevin Kelly Of [852-1] Motion To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Court Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County and [852-2] Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 07/19/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 861 Filed: 7/14/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Denying [852-1] Motion To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Court Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County and Denying [852-2] Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (ere) [EOD 07119193] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 860 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [847-1] Motion For An Order Allowing Plaintiff To File A Late Notice Of Claim And For Such Other And Further Relief As The Court Deems To Be Just And Proper by Marlene Hope. (Outcome: COTES). (ere) [EOD 07113193][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 859 Filed: 7/2/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: O.S.T. RE: Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (Outcome: Denied OTBS). (ere) [EOD 07109193][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 858 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Supplemental Certification Of Martin L. Borosko. (ere) [EOD 07107193] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 857 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification Of Frank Harrison In Opposition To Motions to File Late Claims. (ere) [EOD 07/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Brief By Charles A. Stanziale for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Support Of [852-1] Motion To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Court Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia and [852-2] Motion To File A Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 07/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 855 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification Of Martin L. Borosko. (ere) [EOD 07/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 854 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit Of Daniel P. Finegan, Esq. RE: [852-1] Motion To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Court Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County and [852-2] Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim by Trump Taj Mahal Associates (ere) [EOD 07/07/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 853 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Affidavit Of James P. McEvilly, Jr., Esq. RE: [852-1] Motion To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Court Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County and [852-2] Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (ere) [EOD 07/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 852 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice Of Motion By Attorney For Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates To Vacate The Automatic Stay And Permitting The Estate Of Kevin Kelly To Proceed In The Court Of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County and To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 07/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 851 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting [850-1] Application For An Order Shortening Time RE: Motion To Vacate Automatic Stay and For Permission To File A Late Proof Of Claim by Trump Taj Mahal Associates (ere) [EOD 07/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 850 Filed: 6/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Application Filed By Attorney For Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates For An Order Shortening Time RE: Motion To Vacate Automatic Stay and For Permission To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (ere) [EOD 07/07/93) [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 849 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [847-1] Motion For An Order Allowing Plaintiff To File A Late Notice Of Claim And For Such Other And Further Relief As The Court Deems To Be Just And Proper by Marlene Hope Re-scheduled for 10:00 7/13/93 at Courtroom E, Newark (ere) [EOD 07/06/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 848 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Affidavit Of Annette Z. Kolman RE: [847-1] Motion For An Order Allowing Plaintiff To File A Late Notice Of Claim And For Such Other And Further Relief As The Court Deems To Be Just And Proper by Marlene Hope. (ere) [EOD 06/09/93][91-13321) Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 847 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice Of Motion By Attorney For Creditor Marlene Hope For An Order Allowing Plaintiff To File A Late Notice Of Claim And For Such Other And Further Relief As The Court Deems To Be Just And Proper. (ere) [EOD 06/09/93] [91-13321) Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 846 Filed: 5/27/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 9/21/92 Re: Order To Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Enjoined From Prosecuting An Action Against Debtors, Etc., Motion To Allow Defendant Thaddeus Bajek To File Late Notice Of Claim and Motion For Leave To File Late Notice Of Claims. (ere)[EOD 06/01/93] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 845 Filed: 5/18/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Expunging Claim Of Raymond And Frances Jones (Claim No. 528-00). (ere) [EOD 05/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 844 Filed: 5/18/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Minute of Hearing Held Re: Plenary Hearing on Debtor's Motion to Expunge the Claim of Raymond & Frances Jones (Claim Expunged; 0/S). (slh) [EOD 05/20/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 843 Filed: 5/18/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Minute of Status Hearing Held Re: [822-1] Objection by Frances & Raymond Jones to Second Omnibus Motion to Expunge Claims (Claim Expunged 0/S). (slh) [EOD 05/20/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 842 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification in Support Of [840-1] Motion To allow the Defendant, John Frantz, to fil a late notice of claim by John Frantz. (cv) [EOD 05/18/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 841 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Brief in Support Of [840-1] Motion To allow the Defendant, John Frantz, to fil a late notice of claim by John Frantz. (cv) [EOD 05/18/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 840 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Notice of Motion to case(s) 91-13321, By Attorney for Defendant John Frantz in 91-13321 To allow the Defendant, John Frantz, to file a late notice of claim & Certification of Service. (cv) [EOD 05/18/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 839 Filed: 5/5/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Scheduling Prenary Hearing On: (Debtor's Motion To Expunge The Claim Of Raymond And Frances Jones Claim No. 528-00). (ere) [EOD 05/06/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 838 Filed: 4/26/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Claudia King & Assoc. for Debtor Of Notice of Hearing on Disclosure Statement and Prepetition Solicitaiton of Votes, Confirmation Of Plan and P.O.C. to Creditor #756 Ginan Alibraham. (cv) [EOD 04/29/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 837 Filed: 4/22/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Status Conference re: Obj. by Frances & Raymond Jones to Second Omnibus Motion to Expunge Claims. (Trial on claims scheduled for 5-18-93 2:00p.m.)(cv) [EOD 04/29/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 836 Filed: 4/13/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [816-1] Motion For an Extension of Time To File Proof of Claim by Gertrude Rothman. (C/O TBS) (cv) [EOD 04/29/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 1/27/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Complaint (93-2056) Trump Taj Mahal Associates, Trump Taj Mahal, Inc., The Trump Taj Mahal Corp. and Trump Taj Mahal Funding, Inc. vs. Ginan Alibraham, Rashid Alibraham, Cynthia Smith, Ann Jordan, Marilyn Kunkel, Rrobert Ww. Matthews, Helen O'Hara, Eugene O;Hara, Louis J. Picariello, and Ccynthia Picariello . NOS 456 Declaratory Judgment . (aap) [EOD 01/28/93] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 834 Filed: 4/2/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Trial Hearing Held Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (No decision) (cv)[EOD 04/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 833 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 4/2/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 04/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 832 Filed: 2/26/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Trial Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 4/1/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 04/22/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 831 Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 2/26/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 04/22/93][91-13321]. Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 830 Filed: 2/24/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 2/25/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 04/22/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 829 Filed: 1/27/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 2/24/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 04/22/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 828 Filed: 3/29/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Consent Order relating to Treatment of Bankers' Trust Claim. (lmw) [EOD 04/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 827 Filed: 4/16/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Consent Order Allowing Filing Of Proof Of Claim Out Of Time & Granting [816-1] Motion For an Extension of Time To File Proof of Claim by Gertrude Rothman. (ere) [EOD 04/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 826 Filed: 3/5/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [795-1] Motion For an Order Permitting Proof of Claim After the Bar Date Herein and Limited [795-2] Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay by Robert W. Mathews . Outcome: denied, OTBS (roc) [EOD 04/16/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 825 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificaton Of Mailing By Attorney for D-I-P Of Declaration of Mailing of notice of Hearing to Consider approval of Debtors' Disclosure Statement and Prepetition Solicitation of Votes with Respect to their Plan. (slh) [EOD 04/16/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 824 Filed: 3/26/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Status Connference of objection by Frances and Raymond Jones to second Omnibus motion to expunge claims, adjourned to 4.22.93 10:00am. (roc) [EOD 04/16/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 823 Filed: 3/10/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Letter By Donald J. Crecca for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Support Of debtors application to expunge the claim of Raymond and Frances Jones. (roc) [EOD 04/15/93] [Edit date 04/16/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 822 Filed: 3/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice of Status Conference Re: [1-1] Voluntary Petition scheduled for 10:00 4/22/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 04/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 821 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Transcript of Trial Held on 1.27.93 RE: Objection to Motion to Disallow, Expunge or Reduce Claim of DCA, etc. (cv) [EOD 04/01/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 820 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate Of Service Of [816-1] Motion For an Extension of Time To File Proof of Claim by Gertrude Rothman. (cv) [EOD 03/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 819 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit of Gertrude Rothman in Support Of[816-1] Motion For an Extension of Time To File Proof of Claim by Gertrude Rothman. (cv) [EOD 03/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 818 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Affidavit of Steven C. Hurvitz in Support Of [816-1] Motion For an Extension of Time To File Proof of Claim by Gertrude Rothman. (cv) [EOD 03/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 817 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Memorandum of Law In Support Of[816-1] Motion For an Extension of Time To File Proof of Claim by Gertrude Rothman. (cv) [EOD 03/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 816 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Motion By Attorney for Creditor Gertrude Rothman For an Extension of Time To File Proof of Claim. (cv)[EOD 03/23/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 815 Filed: 3/1/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [795-1] Motion For an Order Permitting Proof of Claim After the Bar Date Herein and Limited, and [795-2] Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay by Robert W. Mathews Re-scheduled for 9:30 3/5/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 03/03/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 814 Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Notice By Harold A. Sherman, Esq. Attorney for Defendants Samuel & Vincenza Mascola. (RE: Adv. Case 92-1397) (cv)[EOD 03/01/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 813 Filed: 2/23/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Charles A. Stanziale for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [38-1] Motion For Order (i) Scheduling Hearing To Consider Approval Of The Debtors' (a) Disclosure Statement, (b) Pre-Petition Solicitation Of Votes With Respect To Their Plan, and (c) Confirmation Of That Plan; (ii) Approving The Debtors' (a) Disclosure Statement and (b) Pre-Petition Solicitation Of Votes With Respect To Their Plan; (iii) Confirming The Debtors' Plan; and (iv) Granting Related Relief (lmw) [EOD 02/25/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 812 Filed: 2/16/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Opposition by Co-Counsel for Debtor To [795-2] Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay by Robert W. Mathews. (lmw) [EOD 02/24/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 811 Filed: 2/16/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Stipulation of Settlement and Release between Trump Taj Mahal Associatges et al, and McDonald, Carano, Wilson, McCune, Bergin, Frankovich and Hicks. (Claim No. 00421). (lmw) [EOD 02/24/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 810 Filed: 2/17/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Kelly; Butensky, Pepe & Van Keuren for Creditor Robert W. Mathews in 91-13321 Of [809-1] Answer. (lmw) [EOD 02/22/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 809 Filed: 2/17/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Response By Attorneys for Creditor Robert W. Mathews Second Verified Complaint To enforce the Order of Confirmation Dated August 28,1991 and for Sanction. [164-1]. (lmw)[EOD 12/07/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 808 Filed: 2/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Per Status Conference and order of 10/13/92. (Settled). (lmw) [EOD 02/22/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 807 Filed: 2/10/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Min of Hearing Held Re: Trial Per Status Conference and Order of 10/13/92 (Settled). (lmw) [EOD 02/22/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 806 Filed: 2/9/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [795-2] Motion For Relief From the Automatic St.ay by Robert W. Mathews Re-scheduled for 12:00 2/17/93 at Courtroom E, Newark (lmw)[EOD 02/22/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 805 Filed: 2/17/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Min of Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [795-2] Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay by Robert W. Mathews Re-scheduled for 9:30 3/1/93 at Courtroom E, Newark (lmw)[EOD 02/19/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 804 Filed: 2/9/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order & Stipulation of Settlement and Release Between Trump Taj Mahal Assoc., et al. and Millville Laundry (Claim#561). (cv) [EOD 02/16/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 803 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate Of Service Of [800-1] Application For Andrew N. Howe, To Appear Pro Hac Vice by DCA Incorporated. (cv)[EOD 02/08/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 802 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting [800-1] Application For Andrew N. Howe, To Appear Pro Hac Vice by DCA Incorporated. (cv) [EOD 02/08/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 801 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification of Andrew B. Altenburg, Jr. in Support Of [800-1] Application For Andrew N. Howe, To Appear Pro Hac Vice by DCA Incorporated. (cv) [EOD 02/08/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 800 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Application Filed By Attorney for Creditor DCA Incorporated For Andrew N. Howe, To Appear Pro Hac Vice. (cv)[EOD 02/08/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 799 Filed: 2/2/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Stipulation of Settlement and Release Between Trump Taj Mahal Associates, et als. The Trump Organization and Pandick, Inc. (Claim #514.00). (cv) [EOD 02/08/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 798 Filed: 1/25/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Minute of Hearing Held Re:[778-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Marjorie Kaufman. (Outcome: Motion Dismissed) (aek) [EOD 01/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 797 Filed: 1/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Min of Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Status Conference (Adjourned 2/9/93 at 10:00). (lmw) [EOD 02/04/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 796 Filed: 1/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Statement in Lieu of Brief in Support Of [795-1] Motion For an Order Permitting Proof of Claim After the Bar Date Herein and Limited, and [795-2] Motion For Relief From the Automatic Stay by Robert W. Mathews. (cv) [EOD 01/30/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 795 Filed: 1/11/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Motion By Attorney for Creditor Robert W. Mathews For an Order Permitting Proof of Claim After the Bar Date Herein and Limited, and For Relief From the Automatic Stay. (cv) [EOD 01/30/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 794 Filed: 1/19/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order, Dismissing [783-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Marjorie Kaufman. (cv) [EOD 01/29/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 793 Filed: 1/21/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 11.13.92 RE: Trial re: Objection to Motion to Disallow, Expunge or Reduce Claim of DCA, etc. . (cv) [EOD 01/25/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 792 Filed: 1/5/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Affidavit of Robert w. Matthews. (lmw) [EOD 01/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 791 Filed: 1/5/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Affidavit of Fred R. Meyer. (lmw) [EOD 01/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 790 Filed: 1/5/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Affidavit of Stephen A. Pepe. (lmw) [EOD 01/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 789 Filed: 1/19/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on November 12, 1992 Re: Objection To Motion To Disallow, Expung Or Reduce Claim of DCA, Inc. (aek) [EOD 01/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 788 Filed: 1/19/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Minute of Hearing Held Re: [778-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Marjorie Kaufman. (Outcome: Motion Dismissed) (aek) [EOD 01/21/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 787 Filed: 12/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order and Stipulation of Settlement and Mutual Release Between Trump Taj Mahal Associates, et al., and Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. (Claim 898.00). (cv) [EOD 01/13/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 786 Filed: 1/5/1993, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [783-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Marjorie Kaufman Re-scheduled for 10:00 1/19/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 01/12/93][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 785 Filed: 12/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [783-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Marjorie Kaufman Re-scheduled for 10:00 1/19/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (ere) [EOD 12/29/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 784 Filed: 12/7/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Application in Support Of [783-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Marjorie Kaufman. (cv) [EOD 12/18/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 783 Filed: 12/7/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Motion By Attorney for Creditor Marjorie Kaufman For Relief From Stay. (cv) (EOD 12/18/92] (91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb). Modified on 5/20/2016 to correct filed date (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 782 Filed: 12/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Stipulation of Settlement and Release by and between Creditor Financial Consulting Services and Debtor For Claim No. 615.00. (cv) (EOD 12/16/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 781 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 1/27/93 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv) [EOD 12/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 780 Filed: 11/12/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Obection To: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 11/13/92 at Courtroom E, Newark. (cv)[EOD 12/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 779 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Application in Support Of [778-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Marjorie Kaufman. (cv) [EOD 12/08/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 778 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Motion By Attorney for Creditor Marjorie Kaufman For Relief From Stay. (cv) (EOD 12/08/92] (91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 777 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order of the Bankruptcy Court Abstainin From Hearing and Deciding The Claim of Gerald Price. (cv) [EOD 12/07/92] [91-13321](clb). Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 776 Filed: 11/19/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Stipulation of Settlement and Release Between Trump Taj Mahal Associates, et al. and Anthony Mari (Claim #992.00) (cv) [EOD 12/07/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 775 Filed: 11/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Transcript of Oral Deposition of Jeffrey F. Krieger taken at offices of Duane, Morris & Heckscher on 11-11-92. (cv) [EOD 11/17/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 774 Filed: 11/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Brief By Attorney Creditor Resorts International, Inc. In Support Of Debtor's Objection to Proof of Claim of DCA Inc. (cv) [EOD 11/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 773 Filed: 11/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By U.S. Bankrupty Court Of: [772-1] Notice Appeal. (cv) [EOD 11/02/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 11/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Notice Of Appeal By Attorney for John Frantz; Appeal Designation Due: 11/12/92 RE: [769-1] Order Denying John Frantz to File a Late Proof of Claim. (cv) [EOD 11/02/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/20/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 771 Filed: 10/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting [770-1] Application To Terminate the Retention of Claudia King & Assoc. as Agent to Bankruptcy Court by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (cv) [EOD 10/30/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 770 Filed: 10/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Application Filed By Attorney for Debtor To Terminate the Retention of Claudia King & Assoc. as Agent to Bankruptcy Court. (cv) [EOD 10/30/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 769 Filed: 10/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order by Attorney for Debtor Denying Motion of John Frantz to File a Late Proof of Claim. (cv) [EOD 10/29/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 768 Filed: 10/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order by Attorney for Debtor Denying Motion of Thaddeus Bajek to File a Late Proof of Claim. (cv) [EOD 10/29/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 767 Filed: 10/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order by Attorney for Debtor Denying Cross Motion of Rubins and Meredith to File a Late Proof of Claim. (cv)[EOD 10/29/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 766 Filed: 10/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order by Attorney for Debtor Denying Motion of Eleanor DiNardo to File a Late Proof of Claim. (cv) [EOD 10/29/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 765 Filed: 10/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Charles A. Stanziale for Debtor Of Application to terminate the retention of Claudia King & Assoc., Inc. (not linked) (cv) [EOD 10/28/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 764 Filed: 10/26/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 10-2-92 RE: Judge's Oral Decision. (cv) [EOD 10/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 763 Filed: 10/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery and Trial Date; Trial Hearing Scheduled for 2-10-92 10:00 in Courtroom C in Newark; Last Day for Discovery 10-30-92. (cv) [EOD 10/19/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 762 Filed: 10/1/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Motions to file late proofs of claim of John Frantz, Eleanor DiNardo, Thaddeus Bejek, Marilyn & Aaron Rugin & Ann & Sidney Meredith. (TCC) (cv)[EOD 10/13/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 761 Filed: 9/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Reply Certification in Support of Motion to File Late Proof of Claim of John Frantz. (cv) [EOD 10/13/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 760 Filed: 9/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Response By Attorney for Debtor in Opposition to Notice of Motion of John Frantz to File a Late Notice of Claim. (cv) [EOD 10/13/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 759 Filed: 9/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Permitting Marc S. Dreier to Appear & Participate on Behalf of Pandick Inc. RE : [758-1 Certification. (No application) (cv) [EOD 10113/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 758 Filed: 9/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certification of Marc S. Dreier in Support of Pro Hac Vice Application in Order to Appear on Behalf of Pandick. (cv) [EOD 10/13/92][91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 757 Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Status Conference Re: Objection by Frances & Raymond Jones to Second Omnibus Motion to Expunge Claims. (Trial set for 3-26-93 @ 10:00 OTBS) (cv) [EOD 10/09/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 756 Filed: 9/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Status Conference Re: Motion objection to claim of financial consultants. (Trial set for April 8 & 9,1993 & OTBS) (cv) [EOD 10/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 755 Filed: 10/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate Of Service Of [754-1] Stipulation & Order by First Boston Corporation & Trump Taj Mahal Assoc. (cv) [EOD 10/08/92] [91:..13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 754 Filed: 10/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Stipulation and Order of Dismissal and Settlement by and between Creditor First Boston Corporation and Trump Taj Mahal Assoc., et al. . (cv) [EOD 10/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 753 Filed: 10/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [363-1] Objection by First Boston Corporation Re-scheduled for at Courtroom C, Newark. (cv) [EOD 10/06/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 752 Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Denying [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and Granting [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 10/02/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 751 Filed: 9/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Status Conference Per: [707-1] Order. (Trial 2-10-93 & 2-11-93; Discovery complete by 10-30-92; Witness list & Exhibits 11-16-92) (cv) [EOD 09/25/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 750 Filed: 9/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 9-10-92 RE: Oral Decision. (cv[EOD 09/23/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 749 Filed: 9/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 8-18-92. (cv) [EOD 09/22/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 748 Filed: 9/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certification of Nicolas F. Moles, Esq.[EOD 09/21/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 747 Filed: 9/10/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv)[EOD 09/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 746 Filed: 8/19/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Letter by Attorney Creditor First Boston Corporation RE: Knudsen v. Quebecor Printing Oral Argument. (cv)[EOD 09/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 745 Filed: 8/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Response By Creditor First Boston Corporation To Mr. Ollers letter to the Court. (cv) [EOD 09/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 744 Filed: 8/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Affidavit of Paul M. O'Gara in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 09/10/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 743 Filed: 8/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 8-17-92 Deposition of Wilbur L. Ross, Jr., taken by First Boston Corp. pursuant to Subpoena. (cv) [EOD 09/10/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 742 Filed: 8/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [.718-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Barbara & William Hagan. (Granted 0/E) (cv) [EOD 09/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 741 Filed: 8/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Granting [718-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Barbara & William Hagan. (cv) [EOD 09/03/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 740 Filed: 8/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 12-13-91 RE: Fee Applications. (cv) [EOD 09/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 739 Filed: 8/17/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order by and between Creditor First Boston Corporation For the Protection of Confidential Information, Documents or Materials that may be Produced or Otherwise Disclosed During the Course of this Action. (cv) [EOD 08/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 738 Filed: 8/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting [729-1] Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission of John R. Oller. (cv) [EOD 08/24/92] [Edit date 09/08/93] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 737 Filed: 8/17/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Stipulation of Settlement and Release Between Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates and National Decision Systems, Inc. (Claim #351.00,). (cv) [EOD 08/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 736 Filed: 8/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Adj. to 8-28-92@ 11:00 Courtroom C. (cv)[EOD 08/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 735 Filed: 8/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested by First Boston Corporation Re-scheduled for 11:00 8/28/92 at Courtroom C, Newark. (cv) [EOD 08/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 734 Filed: 8/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Affidavit of Paul M. 0' Gara. (ccg) [EOD 08/21/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 733 Filed: 8/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Brief By Crummy, Del Deo, Dolan, Griffinger et al for Creditor First Boston Corporation In Support Of [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (aek)[EOD 08/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 732 Filed: 8/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Brief By Attorneys For Creditor First Boston Corporation In Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp. by First Boston Corporation. (aek) [EOD 08/19/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 731 Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Statement in Lieu of Brief in Support [729-1] Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission of John R. Oller. (cv) [EOD 08/13/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 730 Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Declaration in Support By Of [729-1] Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission of John R. Oller. (cv) [EOD 08/13/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 729 Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice of Motion By Co-Counsel for Debtor For Pro Hac Vice Admission of John R. Oller. (cv) [EOD 08/13/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 728 Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting [727-1] Application For Order Notice of Hearing on Motion for Pro Hac Vice John R. Oller by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. [EOD 08/13/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 727 Filed: 8/12/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Application Filed By Attorney for Debtor For Order Reducing Notice of Hearing on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John R. Oller. (cv) [EOD 08/13/92][91-13321) Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 726 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Brief By Attorney for Debtor In Opposition To [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2) Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 08/12/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 725 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Statement of Material Facts By Attorney for Debtor In Opposition To [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2) Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 08/12/92)[91-13321) Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 724 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Brief By Attorney for Debtor In Opposition To [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 08/12/92) [91-13321) Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 723 Filed: 8/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit of Irene M. Koch By Charles A. Stanziale Co-Counsel for Debtor In Opposition To [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 08/12/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 722 Filed: 7/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 8/18/92 at Courtroom C, Newark. (cv) [EOD 08/10/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 721 Filed: 8/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate Of Service Of [718-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Barbara & William Hagan. (cv) [EOD 08/05/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 720 Filed: 8/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificatjon in Support Of [718-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Barbara & William Hagan. (cv) [EOD 08/05/92)[91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 719 Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Brief In Support Of [718-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Barbara & William Hagan. (cv) [EOD 08/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 718 Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Motion By Attorney for Creditors Barbara & William Hagan For Relief From Stay. (cv) [EOD 08/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 717 Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Affidavit of Irene M. Koch in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 08/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 716 Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Debtors' Statement of Uncontested Material Facts Submitted in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv)[EOD 08/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 715 Filed: 7/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Reply Brief By Attorney for Debtor In Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 08/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 7/23/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Daniel L. Ackman in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and by First Boston Corporation, [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 07/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon). (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 7/23/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplementary Affidavit of Daniel L. Ackman in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 07/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon). (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 7/23/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavits in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) (EOD 07/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon). (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 711 Filed: 7/23/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Brief in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 07/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon). (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 710 Filed: 7/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Brief in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 07/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 7/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Statement of Material Facts in Support Of [708-1] Motion For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in of The First Boston Corp., and [708-2] Motion Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter by First Boston Corporation. (cv) [EOD 07/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 708 Filed: 7/23/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice of Cross Motion By Attorney for Creditor First Boston Corporation For Orders Granting Partial Summary Judgment in Favor of The First Boston Corp., and Compelling Deposition of Donald J. Trump in Contested Matter & Certification of Service. (cv) [EOD 07/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 707 Filed: 7/10/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery and Status Conference; Discovery should be complete by Sept. 15, 1992 and Scheduling Conference on Sept. 22, 1992 at 10:00 am in Courtroom C in Newark. (cv) [EOD 07/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 706 Filed: 7/10/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on 6-17-92 RE: Examinations of Rayment & Frances Jones. (cv) [EOD 07/13/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 705 Filed: 7/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Expunging Claim of Gloria Roper #344-00; Granting [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (cv [EOD 07/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 704 Filed: 6/26/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Stipulation of Settlement and Release Between Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates, et al. and Benjamin E. Labov & Sons (Claim # 1 & 233). (cv) [EOD 07/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 703 Filed: 7/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Consent Order Adjudicating Claim of John Aquilino, Jr. as Being Timely Field; Granting [640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino. (cv) [EOD 07/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 702 Filed: 7/1/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Brief In Support Of [701-1] Motion Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (cv) [EOD 07/06/92] [91-13321]. Modified on 5/3/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 701 Filed: 7/1/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Notice of Motion to Debtors' First Omnibus Motion to Disallow, Reduce and Expunge Claims Filed by Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (cv) [EOD 07/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 700 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Claim Of DCA, Inc. Trial Now Scheduled For 11/12/92 and 11/13/92 at 10:00 A.M. In Newark. (jpp) [EOD 07/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 699 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino - consent order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 07/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 698 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Motion To Expunge Claim Of Gloria Roper - claim expunged - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 07/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 697 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Letter Memorandum By Donald J. Crecca for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Support Of Expungement Of Claim Of Gloria Roper. (jpp) [EOD 07/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 696 Filed: 6/19/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Of Transfer Of Case From The Vicinage Of Camden To The Vicinage Of Newark. Order Covers All Related Adversary Proceedings As Well As Related Consolidated Cases 91-13326, 91-13331 and 91-13334 (jpp) [EOD 07/01/92] [91-13321) Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 695 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Stipulation Of Settlement And Release Between Trump Taj Mahal Associates, et al. and Philadelphia Stationers, Inc. (Claim No. 526). (jpp) [EOD 06/29/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 694 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Trial Date Of 6/22/92 at 2:00 P.M. Regarding The Claim Of Gloria Roper. (jpp)[EOD 06/25/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 693 Filed: 6/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting [690-1] Application To Allow J. Shane Creamer, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Resorts International, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 06/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 692 Filed: 6/17/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Counsel For Resorts International, Inc. Of [690-1] Application To Allow J. Shane Creamer, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Resorts International, Inc. (jpp) (EOD 06/24/92) [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 691 Filed: 6/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification Of Penny Conly Ellison In Support Of [690-1] Application To Allow J. Shane Creamer, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Resorts International, Inc. (jpp)[EOD 06/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 690 Filed: 6/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Application By Resorts International, Inc. To Allow J. Shane Creamer, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Penny Conly Ellison, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 06/24/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 689 Filed: 6/15/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Consent Order Expunging Claim Of Hale Trailer and Truck Equipment. (jpp) [EOD 06/18/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 688 Filed: 6/15/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Granting [685-1] Application To Allow John J. Soroko, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice by DCA Incorporated. (jpp) [EOD 06/18/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 687 Filed: 6/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Diane E. Vuocolo Of [685-1] Application To Allow John J. Soroka, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice by DCA Incorporated. (jpp) [EOD 06/18/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 686 Filed: 6/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certification In Support Of [685-1] Application To Allow John J. Soroka, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice by DCA Incorporated. (jpp) [EOD 06/18/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 685 Filed: 6/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Application By Creditor DCA Incorporated To Allow John J. Soroka, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Diane E. Vuocolo, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 06/18/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 6/12/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Revised And Amended Trial Brief Of Creditor DCA Incorporated In Support Of Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 06/16/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 683 Filed: 6/10/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Moiton To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce The Claim Of DCA, Inc. - Hearing Adjourned To 6/22/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 06/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 682 Filed: 6/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino Re-scheduled for 10:00 6/22/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. (jpp) [EOD 06/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 681 Filed: 6/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Denying [598-1] Motion To Extend The Time Within Which A Proof Of Claim Or Interest May Be Filed by David H. Morse. (jpp) [EOD 06/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 680 Filed: 6/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Granting [679-1] Application For Entry Of Order Vacating Expungement Of Deborah Adamczyk's Proof Of Claim By Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 06/09/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 679 Filed: 5/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Application By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates For Entry Of Order Vacating Expungement Of Deborah Adamczyk's Proof Of Claim, filed by Donald J. Crecca, Esquire. (jpp)[EOD 06/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 6/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Trial Brief Of Creditor DCA Incorporated In Support Of Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 06/09/92] [91-13321) Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 677 Filed: 6/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Counsel For Creditor DCA Incorporated Of [676-1] Stipulation. (jpp) (EOD 06/09/92] [91-13321) Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 676 Filed: 6/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Stipulation Between Creditor DCA Incorporated and Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Respect Of The Proof Of Claim Of DCA Incorporated. (jpp) [EOD 06/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 675 Filed: 6/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Atlantic City Showboat - settled. (jpp) [EOD 06/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 674 Filed: 5/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Motion Objecting To Claim Of Financial Consultants - Status Conference Scheduled For 9/23/92 at 2:00P.M. (jpp) [EOD 06/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 673 Filed: 5/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Trial Regarding Objection By Frances and Raymond Jones To Second Omnibus Motion To Expunge Claims - Status Conference Scheduled For 9/23/92 at 2:00P.M. (jpp) [EOD 06/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 672 Filed: 5/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Philadelphia Stationers - settled. (jpp) [EOD 06/01/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 671 Filed: 5/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Letter Response By Counsel For Creditor John Aquilino To [656-1] Debtor's Letter Brief In Opposition To Aquilino's Motion To Allow Claim. (jpp) [EOD 05/29/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 670 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of National Decision System - settled. (jpp) [EOD 05/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 669 Filed: 5/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Motion To Expunge Claim Of Ben Labov and Son - settled. (jpp) [EOD 05/26/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 668 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Frances and Raymond Jones - Hearing Adjourned To 9/23/92 at 2:00 (Status Conference). (jpp) [EOD 05/22/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 667 Filed: 5/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Ben Labov and Son - Hearing Adjourned To 5/22/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 05/22/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 666 Filed: 5/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Extending Discovery And Trial Date Regarding The Claim Of Raymond and Frances Jones. Discovery Time Extended To 7/10/92; Final Status Conference Scheduled For 9/23/92 at 2:00P.M. (jpp) [EOD 05/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 665 Filed: 5/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [648-1] Motion For Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Regarding The Claim Of Gloria Roper by Trump Taj Mahal Associates - claimant to obtain attorney within 2 weeks - 30 day discovery period - Trial regarding motion to expunge claim of Gloria Roper scheduled for 6/22/92 at 2:00 P.M. (jpp) [EOD 05/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 664 Filed: 5/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino Re-scheduled for 10:00 6/8/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. Reply Brief By 5/26/92 - Any Other Responses By 6/2/92. (jpp) [EOD 05/20/92] [91-13321]. Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 663 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claims Of Anthony Mari - settled. (jpp)[EOD 05/18/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 662 Filed: 5/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting [661-1] Application For Order Extending Time To Take Depositions Regarding National Decision Systems by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 05/15/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 661 Filed: 5/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Application By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates For Order Extending Time To Take Depositions Regarding National Decision Systems, filed by Donald J. Crecca, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 05/15/92] [91-13321] Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2016 (clb). Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 660 Filed: 5/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino Re-scheduled for 10:00 5/18/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. (jpp) [EOD 05/12/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 659 Filed: 5/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Objection To Proposed Order Abstaining From Hearing And Deciding Claim Of Sol and Ada Urbach - prior order to stand. (jpp) [EOD 05/12/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 658 Filed: 3/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Letter Objection By Creditor Sol Urbach To "Proposal Of Debtors That Claim Not Be Dealt With". (jpp) [EOD 05/12/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 657 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Abstaining From Hearing And Deciding The Claim Of Sol and Ida Urbach (Claim No. 362). (jpp) [EOD 05/12/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 656 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Letter Brief By Donald J. Crecca for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Opposition To (640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino. (jpp) [EOD 05/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 655 Filed: 5/1/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Granting (654-1] Application To Allow Sally Henry 1 Esquire, Robert E. Zimet, Esquire and Daniel Ackman, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice by First Boston Corporation. (jpp) [EOD 05/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 654 Filed: 4/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Application By Creditor First Boston Corporation To Allow Sally Henry, Esquire, Robert E. Zimet, Esquire and Daniel Ackman, Esquire To Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Michael R. Griffinger, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 05/08/92][91-13321]. Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 653 Filed: 4/30/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Millville Laundry - settled - consent order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 05/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 652 Filed: 4/30/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of NFF Construction (Category 11 B11 Claim) - settled - consent order to be submitted. (jpp)[EOD 05/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 651 Filed: 4/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Regarding The Adjudication Of The Class Action Claims For All Purposes. (jpp) [EOD 04/29/92] (91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 650 Filed: 4/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Donald J. Crecca Of [648-1] Motion For Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Regarding The Claim Of Gloria Roper by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 04/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 649 Filed: 4/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification In Support Of [648-1] Motion For Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Regarding The Claim Of Gloria Roper by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 04/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 648 Filed: 4/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates For Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Regarding The Claim Of Gloria Roper, filed by Donald J. Crecca, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 04/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 647 Filed: 4/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Scheduling Conference Re: Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Benefit Resources, Inc. - Trial Dates Of 12/8/92 Through 12/l1/92 at 10:00 A.M. - Scheduling Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 04/27/92](91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 646 Filed: 4/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery Deadlines And Trial Date Of May 29, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Regarding The Objection To Debtors' Motion To Expunge The Claim Of Philadelphia Stationers. (jpp [EOD 04/23I 92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 645 Filed: 4/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Of Settlement And Release Between Trump Taj Mahal Associates, et al. and Productions Unlimited, Inc. (Claim No. 542). (jpp) [EOD 04/23/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 644 Filed: 4/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Hale Trailer and Truck Equipment - settled. (jpp) [EOD 04/22/92) [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 643 Filed: 4/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Atlantic City Showboat - Hearing Adjourned To 6/4/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 04/22/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 642 Filed: 4/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Steven R. Neuner for Creditor John Aquilino Of [640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino. (jpp)[EOD 04/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 641 Filed: 4/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification Of Gary N. Elkind, Esquire In Support Of [640-1] Motion To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed by John Aquilino. (jpp) [EOD 04/20/92][91-13321] Modified on 5/10/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 640 Filed: 4/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Motion By Creditor John Aquilino To Determine That Proof Of Claim Was Timely Filed, filed by Steven R. Neuner, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 04/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 639 Filed: 4/10/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Consent Order Permitting Richard Burris The Right To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 04/13/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 638 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Expunging Claim Of Donald J. Buzney. (jpp) [EOD 04/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 637 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Withdrawing Debtor's Motion To Disallow, Reduce Or Expunge The Claim Of Paul McCullough (Claim No. 193). (jpp) [EOD 04/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 636 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Expunging Claims Of NFF Construction, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 04/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 635 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Withdrawing Debtor's Motion To Disallow, Reduce Or Expunge The Claim of Walter Haybert (Claim No. 513). (jpp) [EOD 04/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 634 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Expunging The Claim Of Madeline Greenberg.(jpp) [EOD 04/08/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 633 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Expunging The Claim of Ann E. Stone and Associates. (jpp) [EOD 04/08/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 632 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Stipulation Of Settlement And Release Between Trump Taj Mahal Associates, et al. and John Conte (Claim No. 985). (jpp) [EOD 04/07/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 631 Filed: 4/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Objection To Reduce Modify Or Expunge Claim Of Philadelphia Stationers - 30 day discovery period - Trial date of 5/20/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 04/07/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 630 Filed: 4/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Trial On Objection By DCA, Inc. To Debtor's Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Claim - Hearing Adjourned To 6/10/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 04/02/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 629 Filed: 3/31/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: (598-1] Motion To Extend The Time Within Which A Proof Of Claim Or Interest May Be Filed by David H. Morse - motion denied - order to be submitted. (jpp)[EOD 04/02/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 628 Filed: 3/30/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Notice Of Change Of Address Of Counsel For Creditor Pandick, Inc. (jpp) (EOD 03/31/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 627 Filed: 3/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice Of Change Of Address Of Counsel For Creditor Pandick, Inc. (jpp) (EOD 03/31/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 626 Filed: 3/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Trial Date For Claim Of The First Boston Corporation. Trial Date Is October 1 and 2, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 03/31/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (clb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 625 Filed: 3/25/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Transcript Of Deposition Of Donald Buzney Taken On 3/12/92. (jpp) [EOD 03/27/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 624 Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection Expunge Claim Of Donald Buzney - claim expunged - order to be submitted. (jpp [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 623 Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Scheduling Conference Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Benefit Resources, Inc. - Hearing Adjourned 4/21/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 622 Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Madeline Greenberg - claim expunged - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 621 Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Scheduling Conference Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of McDonald Carono, et al. - settled. (jpp) [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 620 Filed: 3/20/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Trial Regarding Motion To Expunge Claim Of Ann Stone - claim to be expunged - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 619 Filed: 3/17/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Setting Scheduling Conference For The Claims Of McDonald Corano Wilson McCune Bergin Frankovich and Hicks And Benefit Resources, Inc. Hearing Scheduled For 3/20/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 618 Filed: 3/17/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Consent Order Granting [500-1] Motion To File Proof Of Claim Out Of Time by Grace Porras. (jpp) [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh). Modified on 5/20/2016 to correct filed date (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 617 Filed: 3/17/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Abstaining From Hearing And Determining The Claim Of Michelle Tarsitano (Claim No. 258, 282). (jpp) [EOD 03/26/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 616 Filed: 3/25/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Counsel For Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [613-1] Opposition Of Trump Taj Mahal Associates To Motion Of David Morse To File An Untimely Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 03/25/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 615 Filed: 3/25/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Brief By Neal M. Ruben for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Opposition To [598-1] Motion To Extend The Time Within Which A Proof Of Claim Or Interest May Be Filed by David H. Morse. (jpp) [EOD 03/25/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 614 Filed: 3/25/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certification In Support Of [613-1] Opposition Of Trump Taj Mahal Associates To Morse's Motion To File An Untimely Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 03/25/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 613 Filed: 3/25/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Opposition Of Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates To [598-1] Motion To Extend The Time Within Which A Proof Of Claim Or Interest May Be Filed by David H. Morse.(jpp)[EOD 03/25/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 612 Filed: 2/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [472-1] Second Omnibus Motion To Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates - settled. (jpp) [EOD 03/17/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 611 Filed: 2/24/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [514-1] Cross Motion To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim and For Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Edward H. Tillinghast III, Esquire by Dreyer and Traub - settled. (jpp) [EOD 03/17/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 610 Filed: 3/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Trial Date Of May 28, 1992 at 2:00 P.M. Regarding The Claim Of Frances and Raymond Jones. (jpp) [EOD 03/16/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 609 Filed: 3/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Abstaining From Hearing The Claim Of Larry Clark. (jpp [EOD 03/16/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 608 Filed: 3/4/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Abstaining From Hearing The Claim Of Michelle Tarsitano. (jpp) [EOD 03/16/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 607 Filed: 9/11/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Transcript Of Hearing Held On August 2 1991. (jpp) [EOD 03/12/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 606 Filed: 3/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Allowing Claim No. 497 Filed By Falcon Steel Company. (jpp) [EOD 03/11/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 605 Filed: 3/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Allowing Claim No. 493 Filed By Perfection Equipment, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 03/11/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 604 Filed: 3/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Allowing Claim No. 494 Filed By Baring Industries, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 03/11/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 603 Filed: 3/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Notice Of Rescheduled Hearing On Objection To Motion To Reduce, Modify Or Expunge Claim Of Philadelphia Stationers; Hearing Scheduled For 4/6/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp)[EOD 03/11/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 602 Filed: 3/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Status Conference Regarding Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of First Boston Corp.- Trial Dates of October 1 and October 2, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Discovery Cutoff Set As September 4, 1992 - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 03/10/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 601 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Granting [514-1] Motion To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim and For Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Edward H. Tillinghast III, Esquire by Dreyer and Traub. (jpp) [EOD 03/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 600 Filed: 3/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Edward H. Tillinghast Of Dreyer and Traub Of Stipulation And Order Allowing And Directing Payment Of Dreyer and Traub's Claim, And Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Edward H. Tillinghast III. (jpp)[EOD 03/04/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 599 Filed: 2/25/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Certification Of Attorney In Support Of [598-1] Motion To Extend The Time Within Which A Proof Of Claim Or Interest May Be Filed by David H. Morse. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 598 Filed: 2/25/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Motion By Creditor David H. Morse To Extend The Time Within Which A Proof Of Claim Or Interest May Be Filed, filed by William A. Bromley, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 597 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Withdrawing Debtors' Motion To Disallow, Reduce Or Expunge Certain Category "B" Claims As It Pertains To Calvi Electric Company, Fisher Brothers, Inc., Fred Hill and Son, Julie Temporary Service, Katz and Powell, McCloskey and Faber, New Jersey Department of Transportation and NFF Construction. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 596 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Granting [422-1] Motion To Expunge, Reduce Or Modify Certain Claims Of Donald J. Trump, Trump Taj Mahal Associates, Trump Taj Mahal, Inc., Trump Taj Mahal Corporation, Ernest East, Stephen Bollenbach, Dennis C. Gomes and R. Bruce McKee by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 595 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Consent Order Granting [594-1] Application For Entry Of An Order Vacating Expungement And Abstaining From Determination Of Claim The Claim Of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittburgh, PA by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 594 Filed: 2/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Application By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates For Entry Of An Order Vacating Expungement And Abstaining From Determination Of Claim The Claim Of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittburgh, PA, filed by Ben H. Becker, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 593 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Second Scheduling Order Setting Hearing On Certain Contested Category "B" Claims For 'Scheduling Conference' On February 11, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 03/03I 92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 592 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Expunging Category "I" Claims Except Certain Contested Matters. Claim Of First Bank National Association Is Allowed And Shall Be Treated In The Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 591 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Dismissing [417-1] Motion To Vacate Automatic Stay by Harold and Libby Forman. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 590 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Consent Order Permitting Richard Burris To File A Late Proof of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 589 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Consent Order Permitting Dorothy Carlson (Claim No. 968) To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 588 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Consent Order Permitting Michael Mahan (Claim No. 945) To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 587 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Abstaining From Hearing And Deciding The Claim Of Gregory Johnson (Claim No. 792). (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 586 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of March 20, 1992 at 2:00 P.M. Regarding The Claim Of Ann E. Stone and Associates, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 585 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of March 20, 1992 at 11:00 A.M. Regarding The Claim Of Madeline Greenberg. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 584 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of March 20, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Regarding The Claim Of Donald Buzney. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 583 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of April 3, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Regarding The Claim Of Productions Unlimited. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321 Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 582 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of April 30, 1992 at 2:00 P.M. Regarding The Claim Of Millville Laundry. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 581 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of May 14, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Regarding The Claim Of Anthony Mari. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 580 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of May 21, 1992 at 2:00 P.M. Regarding The Claim Of Frances Jones and Raymond Jones. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 579 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of May 22, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Regarding The Claim Of Benjamin LaBov and Sons. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321 Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 578 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of May 22, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Regarding The Claim Of National Decision Systems. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 577 Filed: 2/27/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Scheduling Discovery And Setting Trial Date Of July 8, 9 and 10, 1992 at 10:00 A.M. Regarding The Claim Of Pandick, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 03/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 576 Filed: 2/10/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [500-1] Motion To File Proof Of Claim Out Of Time by Grace Porras - consent order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/25/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 575 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Denying [429-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Proof Of Claim, Nunc Pro Tunc by Trump Taj Mahal Cocktail Waitresses (Jacqueline Polansky, et al.) (jpp)[EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 574 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Expunging Claim Of Mary Perrier. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 573 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Motion To Disallow Expunge Or Reduce Claims - Consent Order To Be Submitted (jpp) Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 572 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Paul McCullough - Motion To Expunge Claim Withdrawn - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 571 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Larry Clark - Consent Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 570 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Haybert - Consent Order To Be Submitted - Claim Expunged. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 569 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Thomas Burke - Consent Order To Be Submitted - Claim Expunged. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 568 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of McDonald Carono, et al. (Category B Claim) - Hearing Adjourned To 3/20/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 567 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Hale Trailer and Truck Equipment- Hearing Adjourned To 4/16/92 at 2:00 P.M. - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 566 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Benefit Resources Inc. (Category B Claim) - Hearing Adjourned To 3/20/92 at 10:00 A.M. (To Report) (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 565 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim of Donald Buzney - Trial Date Of 3/12/92 at 10:00 A.M. - 30 Day Discovery Cutoff. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 564 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Claim Of Madeline Greenberg - Trial Date 3/20/92 at 11:00 A.M. - 30 Day Discovey Cutoff. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 563 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Anthony Mari - Trial Date Of 5/14/92 at 10:00 A.M. - 75 Day Discovery Cutoff - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 562 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Ben Labov and Son (Category B Claim) - Trial Date Of 5/11/92 at 10:00 A.M.- Discovery Cutoff: 5/11/92.(jpp) [EOD 02/24/92 [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 561 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Ann Stone (Category B Claim) - Trial Date Of 3/20/92 at 2:00P.M.- Discovery Cutoff: 3/13/92. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 560 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Frances and Raymond Jones - Trial Date Of 5/21/92 at 2:00 P.M. - Discovery Cutoff: 5/11/92 - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 559 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Productions Unlimited (Category B Claim) - Trial Date Of 4/3/92 at 10:00 A.M. - Discovery Cutoff: 3/13/92 - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 558 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Millville Laundry (Category B Claim) - Trial Date Of 4/30/92 at 2:00 P.M. - Discovery Cutoff: 4/10/92 - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 557 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of NFF Construction (Category B Claim) - Trial Date Of 4/30/92 at 10:00 A.M. - 60 Day Discovery Cutoff - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 556 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of National Decision Systems (Category B. Claim) - Trial Date Of 5/22/92 at 10:00 A.M. - 90 Day Discovery Period - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 555 Filed: 2/11/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Pandick, Inc. (Category B Claim) - Trial Dates Of 7/8, 7/9 and 7/10/92 at 10:00 A.M. - Discovery Cutoff: 6/12/92. (jpp) [EOD 02/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 554 Filed: 2/19/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification Of Nicholas I. Ribis, Esquire In Opposition To [514-1] Cross Motion To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim by Dreyer and Traub.(executed original) (jpp) [EOD 02/20/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh). Modified on 5/10/2016 to correct the file date (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 553 Filed: 2/19/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certification Of Nicholas L. Ribis, Esquire In Opposition To [514-1] Cross Motion To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim by Dreyer and Traub. (jpp)[EOD 02/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 552 Filed: 2/19/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Memorandum By Ben H. Becker for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Opposition To [514-1] Cross Motion To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim by Dreyer and Traub. (jpp) [EOD 02/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 551 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Letter Objection By Creditors Sol and Ada Urbach To [472-1] Motion To Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/20/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 550 Filed: 2/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Transcript of Hearing Held on January 28, 1992. (jpp) [EOD 02/07/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 549 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Withdrawing Debtors' Motion To Disallow, Reduce Or Expunge The Claim Of Dubois Chemicals, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 548 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Counsel For Creditor John Conte of [546-1] Reply Brief, etc. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321 Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 547 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certification In Lieu Of Affidavit Of Michele A. Querques, Esquire In Support Of Creditor, John Conte's Motion To Extend The Time Within Which To File A Late Proof Of Claim And In Opposition To Taj Mahal Associates' Motion To Disallow And Expunge Creditor Conte's Claim. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 546 Filed: 2/5/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Reply Brief Of Counsel For Creditor John J. Conte To Debtor's Brief In Opposition To Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/4/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 545 Filed: 12/17/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Donald J. Buzney To [207-6] Motion To Expunge Category H Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 544 Filed: 12/2/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Gloria W. Roper To [207-4] Motion To Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp)[EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 543 Filed: 12/2/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Barbara W. Puffer To 207 Motion To Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 542 Filed: 12/2/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Melvin Cohen To [207-4] Motion To Expunge Category D Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 541 Filed: 11/26/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Labov Mechanical Contractors To[207-2] Motion To Expunge Category B Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 540 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Affidavit Of Counsel For Creditor Edith Williams In Response To [207-4] Motion To Expunge Category D Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 539 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Response By Creditor Financial Consulting Services To [207-2] Motion To Expunge Category B Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 538 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Jacqueline Parisi To [207-4] Motion To Expunge Category D Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 537 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Judith Raymond To [207-4] Motion To Expunge Category D Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 536 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Fredric L. Shenkman Of [535-1] Supplemental Affidavit. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 535 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Supplemental Affidavit In Support Of [429-1] Cross Motion To Extend Time To File Proof Of Claim, Nunc Pro Tunc by Trump Taj Mahal Cocktail Waitresses. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 534 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Steven B. Berger For Creditor Sheela Allen-Stephens Of [533-1] Objection By Sheela Allen-Stephens To Motion To Expunge Claims. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 533 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Sheela Allen-Stephens To [207-4] Motion To Expunge Category D Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 02/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 532 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Letter From Counsel For Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates To Judge Gambardella Dated 1/24/92 Regarding Adequate Service Of Notice Of Bar Date Upon Mary Perrier. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 531 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Claims (re: DCA Incorporated) - Trial dates of 4/2/92, 4/3/92 and 4/8/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 530 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [472-1] Second Omnibus Motion To Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 2:00 2/24/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. Dyer and Taub - cross-motion to be filed by 2/3/92 I returnable 2/24/92 at 2:00 P.M. - balance of claims - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 529 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Price - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 528 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [433-1] Motion To Engage In Discovery With The Debtors With Regard To The Latter's Motion To Expunge Claim by Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. - order signed. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 527 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Holroyd - withdrawn. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 526 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Claims (re: Mary Perrier) - claim disallowed - motion to extend time to filed proof of claim denied - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 525 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Gregory Johnson - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 524 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Bankers Trust - consent order to be submitted. (jpp [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 523 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Atlantic City Showboat - Trial Scheduled For 4/16/92 at 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 522 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Sol and Ada Urbach - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 521 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Michele Tarsitano - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 520 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Hale Trailer and Truck Equipment - Hearing Adjourned To 2/11/92 at 2:00 P.M. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 519 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of First Boston Corp. - Hearing Adjourned To 3/3/92 at 10:00 A.M. (Status Conference) (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 518 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Hearing On Objection To Motion To Expunge Claim Of Riendeau - withdrawn. (jpp) [EOD 02/05/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 517 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Notice Of Deposition And Certificate Of Service, filed by Dreyer and Traub. (jpp) [EOD 02/04/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 516 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Jonathan S. Bristol Of [514-1] Cross Motion To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim and For Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Edward H. Tillinghast III, Esquire by Dreyer and Traub. (jpp) [EOD 02/04/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 515 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Memorandum By Jonathan S. Bristol In Support Of [514-1] Cross Motion To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim and For Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Edward H. Tillinghast III, Esquire by Dreyer and Traub. (jpp) [EOD 02/04/92] [Edit date 02/04/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 514 Filed: 2/3/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Cross Motion By Creditor Dreyer and Traub To Enforce Settlement, Allow Claim, Direct Payment Of Claim and For Pro Hac Vice Admission Of Edward H. Tillinghast III, Esquire, filed by Jonathan S. Bristol, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 02/04/92] [Edit date 02/04/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 513 Filed: 1/28/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Granting [433-1] Motion To Engage In Discovery With The Debtors With Regard To The Latter's Motion To Expunge Claim by Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. HEARING ON DEBTORS' MOTION TO EXPUNGE ATLANTIC CITY SHOWBOAT'S CLAIM SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 16, 1992 AT 10:00 A.M. (jpp) [EOD 02/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 512 Filed: 12/20/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Transcript Of Hearing Held On November 19, 1991. (jpp) [EOD 02/03/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 511 Filed: 1/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Of The Bankruptcy Court Denying Richard Ladd's (984.00) Request To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 01/29/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 510 Filed: 1/21/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Robert N. Braverman for Creditor Grace Porras Of [500-1] Motion To File Proof Of Claim Out Of Time by Grace Porras. (jpp) [EOD 01/29/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 509 Filed: 1/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [207-1] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Category A Claim Of Ladd By Trump Taj Mahal Associates - motion to expunge claim granted - order signed. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 508 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [207-1) Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Category A Claim Of Conte By Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 2:00 2/11/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 507 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [472-1] Second Omnibus Motion To Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 10:00 1/28/92 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321]Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 506 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: 207 Motion To Expunge, Reduce Or Modify Claims By Trump Taj Mahal Associates - granted - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 505 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [207-5] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Category G Claim Of Calvie Electric By Trump Taj Mahal Associates - withdrawn - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 504 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [207-1] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Category A Claim Of DuBois By Trump Taj Mahal Associates - withdrawn - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 503 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: 207 Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Claim Of Polansky By Trump Taj Mahal Associates - granted - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 502 Filed: 1/13/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [207-1] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Category A Claim Of Perrier By Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled for 2:00 1/28/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. (jpp) [EOD 01/28/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 501 Filed: 1/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Affidavit In Support Of [500-1] Motion To File Proof Of Claim Out Of Time by Grace Porras. (jpp) [EOD 01/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 500 Filed: 1/14/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Motion By Creditor Grace Porras To File Proof Of Claim Out Of Time, filed by Joan S. Lavery, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 01/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 11/27/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Objection By Creditor Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. To 207 Motion To Expunge Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp [EOD 01/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 498 Filed: 11/19/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Objection By Creditor DCA Incorporated To [207-5] Motion To Expunge Category G Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 01/27/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 497 Filed: 1/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Scheduling Hearing For Category "H11 Claimants Contesting Debtors' First Omnibus Motion For An Order Disallowing, Expunging Or Reducing Claims; Hearing Scheduled For 2/11/92 at 2:00 P.M. (jpp) [EOD 01/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 496 Filed: 1/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Scheduling Hearings For Category 11 C11 Claimants And Certain Category "D" Claims Contesting Debtors' First Omnibus Motion For An Order Disallowing, Expunging Or Reducing Claims; Hearing Scheduled For 1/28/92 at 2:00P.M. (jpp) [EOD 01/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 495 Filed: 1/16/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Expunging Category 11 H11 Claims Where Claimants Have Not Contested First Omnibus Motion. (jpp) [EOD 01/24/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 494 Filed: 1/9/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Ben H. Becker for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [484-1] Supplement To Motion To Expunge Claims. (jpp) [EOD 01/17/92) [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 493 Filed: 1/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Claudia King and Associates, Inc. For Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [472-1] Second Omnibus Motion To.Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (service was made on 12/26/91) (jpp) [EOD 01/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 492 Filed: 1/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Claudia King and Associates, Inc. For Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [472-1] Second Omnibus Motion To Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates.(service was made on 12/24/91) (jpp) [EOD 01/15/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 491 Filed: 12/30/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting [246-1] Application For Allowance Of Final Compensation (Fees: $688,121.00, Expenses: $88,918.18 And Fee Enhancement: $141,744.06) By Theodore LaPier Of Willkie Farr and Gallagher. (jpp) [EOD 01/14/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 490 Filed: 12/30/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Granting [243-1] Application For Compensation (Fees: $400,000.00, Expenses: $29,591.85) by Donaldson Lufkin and Jenrette Securities. Fee Enhancement Of $475,000.00 Also Allowed. (jpp) [EOD 01/14I 92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 489 Filed: 12/30/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Granting [232-1] Application For Allowance Of Compensation (Fees: $77,226.80, Expenses: $926.30) by Arthur Andersen and Co. (jpp) [EOD 01/14/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 488 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: Applications For Fees - Orders Signed I Orders To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 01/14/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 487 Filed: 1/2/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Regarding Claim Of Simpson Sign Company. (jpp) [EOD 01I 10I 92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 486 Filed: 12/23/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [451-1] Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Debtor's Motion To Disallow Claims by Jimmie Scott - motion dismissed - no appearance by movant. (jpp) [EOD 01/10/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 485 Filed: 1/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Supplemental Brief By Vincent A. Cirillo for Creditor Mary Perrier In Support Of Claimant's Motion To Allow The Filing Of Its Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 01/10/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 484 Filed: 1/6/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Supplement By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates To [422-1] Motion To Expunge, Reduce Or Modify Certain Claims Of Donald J. Trump, Trump Taj Mahal Associates, Trump Taj Mahal, Inc., Trump Taj Mahal Corporation, Ernest East, Stephen Bollenbach, Dennis C. Gomes and R. Bruce McKee by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 01/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 483 Filed: 1/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Neal M. Ruben for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [480-1] Brief In Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim Of Richard S. Ladd. (jpp) [EOD 01/09/92] (91-13321) Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 482 Filed: 1/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certification Of Jamie Jo Niedbala-Washburne In Support Of Debtor's Motion To Expunge The Late Filed Proof Of Claim Of RichardS. Ladd. (jpp) [EOD 01/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 481 Filed: 1/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Opposition By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates To Motion By Richard Ladd, Claim No. 984, To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 01/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 480 Filed: 1/8/1992, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Brief By Neal M. Ruben for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Opposition To Richard Ladd's Motion To File A Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 01/09/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 479 Filed: 12/24/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Letter From Accountant Arthur Andersen & Co. To Judge Gambardella Dated 12/23/91 With Attachment Showing Detailed Listing Of Expenses. (jpp) [EOD 01/07/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 478 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Withdrawing [282-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Tomislav and Dragica Popovic. (jpp) [EOD 01/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 477 Filed: 12/17/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Expunging Executory Contracts Not Subject To Prior Agreement. (jpp) [EOD 01/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 476 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Expunging Claims Of Parties To The Subcontractor Agreement. (jpp) [EOD 01/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 475 Filed: 12/30/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Scheduling Hearings For Category "B11 Claimants Contesting Debtors' First Omnibus Motion For An Order Disallowing, Expunging Or Reducing Claims. Hearing Scheduled For 1/13/92 at 2:00P.M. (jpp) [EOD 01/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 474 Filed: 12/30/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Expunging "Category B" Claims Where Claimants Have Not Contested First Omnibus Motion. (jpp) [EOD 01/06/92] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 473 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Notice Of Motion Re: [472-1] Motion To Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp) [EOD 12/20/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 472 Filed: 11/26/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Second Omnibus Motion By Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates To Disallow, Reduce, Expunge and Abstain From Hearing Certain Claims, filed by Ben H. Becker, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 12/20/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 471 Filed: 12/16/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Letter From Creditor Diversey/DuBois Company Dated 12/13/91 Regarding Their Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] (91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 470 Filed: 12/17/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Letter From Creditor Thomas P. Burke Advising That Claim No. 822-00 Has Been Settled. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 469 Filed: 12/17/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Brief By Fredric L. Shenkman For Polansky In Support Of Polansky's Motion To File Late Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 468 Filed: 12/17/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [207-5] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Modify Category G Claims And [207-6] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Modify Category H Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. Class G Claims: Calvie Electric Adjourned To 1/13/92 at 2:00P.M.; DCA Adjourned To 1/28/92 at 2:00 P.M.; Dixie Narco - Consent Order Signed; Falcon Steel - Consent Order To Be Submitted. Class H Claims: Claims By Shenkman - Consent Order To Be Submitted; Claims Of DuBois, Conte, Polansky, Perrier Adjourned To 1/13/92 at 2:00P.M.; Claim Of Price Adjourned To 1/28/92 at 2:00P.M.; Claims Of Buzney, Burke, Haybert, Mari, McCullough, Clark and Greenberg Adjourned To 2/11/92 at 2:00 P.M. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/5/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 467 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [207-3] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Modify Category C Claims And [207-4] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Modify Category D Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates For 2:00 1/28/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden As To Holroid, Reendo, Price and Johnson. Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 466 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [415-1] Motion For An Order To Allow Claim To Proceed In The Superior Court Of New Jersey by Richard Caggiano - motion dismiss for failure of movant to appear - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 465 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [417-1] Motion To Vacate Automatic Stay by Harold and Libby Forman - motion dismissed for failure of movant to appear - order to be submitted. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 464 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [433-1] Motion To Engage In Discovery With The Debtors With Regard To The Latter's Motion To Expunge Claim by Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. Re-scheduled for 2:00 1/28/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 463 Filed: 12/3/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [207-2] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Category B and I Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled For 2:00 1/13/92 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden As To Contested Claims. Balance Of Claims Expunged - Order To Be Submitted. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 462 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing (Minute Sheet filed) Re: [207-1] Motion To Disallow, Expunge Or Reduce Category A, E and F Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates Re-scheduled For 2:00 12/17/91 at 3rd Floor Courtroom, Camden As To Claims Of Polarsky, Conte, Carlson, Perrier, Mackunis, DuBois Co. and Lust; Claim Of Ladd Adjourned To 1/14/92 at 10:00 A.M. Consent Order To Be Submitted As To Claims Of Mohan, Fegadel, Atlantic City Coin and Slot, Simpson Sign and Subcontractors. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 461 Filed: 11/25/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [256-1] Motion For An Order From The Bankruptcy Court Abstaining From Hearing And Determining Disputes Relating To Timely Filed Personal Injury Claims And Granting Relief From The Injunction Imposed By 11 USC Section 524 With Respect To These Claims by Trump Taj Mahal Associates - granted - order signed. (jpp) [EOD 12/18/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 460 Filed: 12/10/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Expunging Proof Of Claim Of Best of Life Park And Confirming Assumption Of Executory Contract Upon Terms And Conditions Set Forth Herein. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 459 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Supplement To Fee Application Of National Westminister Bank, USA Regarding Wien Malkin and Bettex. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 458 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Order Granting [231-1] Application For An Order Allowing Professional Fees And Expenses Of Winston and Strawn, Wien Malkin and Bettex And Eichler Forgosh Gottilla and Rudnick By National Westminister Bank, USA. Payment To Wien Malkin and Bettex Of $23,9519.00 In Fees And $17,104.17 In Expenses; Winston and Strawn Of $125,803.40 In Fees And $19,363.70 In Expenses; To Eichler Forgosh Gottilla and Rudnick Of $8,712.50 In Fees And $354.20 In Expenses; To Goldin Associates Of $27,000.00 In Fees; To Williams Hospitality Management Corp. Of $19,266.22 In Fees. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Order Granting [233-1] Application For Allowance Of Final Compensation (Fees: $ 65,000.00, Expenses: $ 437.99) By Arthur E. Sklar Of The Firm Of Levine Staller Sklar Chan and Brodsky. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91] [91-13321) Modified on 5/23/2016 (Purce, Sharon).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 456 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Order Granting [237-1] Application For Allowance Of Compensation (Fees: $ 346,504.00, Expenses: $ 27,843.75) By Edward S. Weisfelner Of The Firm Of Berlack Israels and Liberman. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91) [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 455 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Order Granting [239-1] Application For Final Allowance Of Compensation For The Period From July 16, 1991 Through October 4, 1991 (Fees: $ 132,258.06, Expenses: $ 2,717.73) By Rothschild, Inc. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 454 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Order Granting [236-1] Application For Allowance Of Compensation (Fees: $ 70,228.50, Expenses: $ 4,078.40) By Andrew Alcorn Of The Firm Of Greenberg Margolis. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 453 Filed: 12/13/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Granting [235-1) Application For Allowance Of Final Compensation (Fees: $ 27,127.50, Expenses: $ 1,393.35) By Charles A. Stanziale Jr. Of The Firm Of Schwartz Tobia and Stanziale. (jpp) [EOD 12/17/91] [91-13321) Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 452 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Brief By Ben H. Becker For Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates In Opposition To John Conte, Polansky et al., Mary Perrier, Mae Mackunis and DuBois Chemical's Separate Motions To File Late Proofs Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 12/16/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 451 Filed: 11/7/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Motion By Creditor Jimmie Scott To Extend Time To Respond To Debtor's Motion To Disallow Claims, filed by Stephen C. Offutt, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 12/16/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 450 Filed: 12/11/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Ben H. Becker for Debtor Trump Taj Mahal Associates Of [422-1] Motion To Expunge, Reduce Or Modify Certain Claims Of Donald J. Trump, Trump Taj Mahal Associates, Trump Taj Mahal, Inc., Trump Taj Mahal Corporation, Ernest East, Stephen Bollenbach, Dennis C. Gomes and R. Bruce McKee by Trump Taj Mahal Associates. (jpp [EOD 12/16/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 449 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Vincent A. Cirillo for Creditor Mary Perrier Of [447-1] Motion For An Extension Of Time To File A Formal Proof Of Claim by Mary Perrier. (jpp) [EOD 12/16/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 448 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Brief By Vincent A. Cirillo for Creditor Mary Perrier In Support Of [447-1] Motion For An Extension Of Time To File A Formal Proof Of Claim by Mary Perrier. (jpp) [EOD 12/16/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 447 Filed: 12/12/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Motion By Creditor Mary Perrier For An Extension Of Time To File A Formal Proof Of Claim, filed by Vincent A. Cirillo Jr., Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 12/16/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 446 Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Consent Order Allowing Claims Filed By First Fidelity Bank.(jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 445 Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Order Expunging Executory Contracts Not Subject To Prior Agreement. (re: Category 11 E11 Claims) (jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 444 Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Expunging Claims Of Parties To The Subcontractor's Agreement. (jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 443 Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Expunging Untimely Filed Proofs Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 442 Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Consent Order Respecting Motion Of Debtors For An Order Disallowing, Reducing and Expunging Certain Claims And Related Relief. (re: Benajmin Polakoff and Son, Inc.) (jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 441 Filed: 11/27/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Between Counsel For Debtor And Counsel For Benjamin Polakoff and Son, Inc. For Extension Of Time To Respond To Motion To Disallow Claims. (jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 440 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Letter From Creditor Donald J. Buzney Dated 11/25/91 Requesting A Copy Of Motion To Disallow Claim. (jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 439 Filed: 12/4/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Stipulation And Order Granting Motion Of Skadden Arps Slate Meagher and Floro To Withdraw Its Proof Of Claim. (jpp) [EOD 12/13/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 438 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [285-1] Motion For Relief From Stay To The Extent Of Insurance Available by Richard Burris - motion dismissed for failure of movant to appear. (jpp) [EOD 12/12/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 437 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Hearing Held Re: [282-1] Motion For Relief From Stay by Tomislav and Dragica Popovic - motion withdrawn. (jpp) [EOD 12/12/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 436 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text: Order Denying [203-1] Motion For An Order Pursuant To Rule 3003 (c)(3) Granting An Extension Of Time To File A Proof Claim by Myron Shapiro. (jpp) [EOD 12/12/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 435 Filed: 12/11/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text: Order Granting [44-1] Application For Order Authorizing Retention Of Donaldson Lufkin and Jenrette Securities Corporation As Financial Advisors For The Debtors And Debtors-In-Possession. (mrh) [EOD 12/11/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 434 Filed: 11/27/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Fredric R. Cohen for Creditor Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. Of [433-1] Motion To Engage In Discovery With The Debtors With Regard To The Latter's Motion To Expunge Claim by Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. (jpp [EOD 12/06/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 433 Filed: 11/27/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Docket Text: Motion By Creditor Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. To Engage in Discovery With The Debtors With Regard To The Latter's Motion To Expunge Claim, filed by Fredric R. Cohen, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 12/06/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 432 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text: Certificate Of Service By Fredric L. Shenkman Motion To Extend Time To File Proof Of Claim, by Trump Taj Mahal Cocktail Waitresses. (jpp) [91-13321] Of [429-1] Nunc Pro Tunc [EOD 12/05/91] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 431 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text: Statement By Attorney For Trump Taj Mahal Cocktail Waitresses Why No Brief Is Necessary In Support Of [429-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Proof Of Claim, Nunc Pro Tunc by Trump Taj Mahal Cocktail Waitresses. (jpp) [EOD 12/05/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 430 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text: Affidavit Of Attorney In Support Of [429-1] Motion To Extend Time To File Proof Of Claim, Nunc Pro Tunc by Trump Taj Mahal Cocktail Waitresses. (jpp) [EOD 12/05/91 [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 429 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 4/28/2016 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text: Motion By Trump Taj Mahal Cocktail Waitresses To Extend Time To File Proof Of Claim, Nunc Pro Tunc, filed by Fredric Shenkman, Esquire. (jpp) [EOD 12/05/91] [91-13321] Modified on 5/6/2016 (rh).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 639 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?