Izquierdo v. Florida Department of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-20549

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 3:15 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jacqueline Izquierdo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ana M. Davide +1 305 854 6100 +8546 854 854 6197 ADAVIDE@aol.com
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2255 US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Robert Geldens +1 305 377 5441 +1 305 377 5655 jeffrey.geldens@myfloridalegal.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2254
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Appealability
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: 8/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Jacqueline Izquierdo. (Davide, Ana)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in support of Petition 1 and respond to the Department's Response to the petition. Reply now due by August 18, 2016. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/30/2016. (EGT) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Motion for extension of time to file reply by Jacqueline Izquierdo. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Davide, Ana) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Florida Department of Corrections re 13 Response to Order to Show Cause of Filing Appendix (Attachments: # 1 Appendix App pt 1 of 7, # 2 Appendix App pt 2 of 7, # 3 Appendix App pt 3 of 7, # 4 Appendix App pt 4 of 7, # 5 Appendix App pt 5 of 7, # 6 Appendix App pt 6 of 7, # 7 Appendix App pt 7 of 7) (Geldens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Florida Department of Corrections of Filing Trial Transcripts (Attachments: # 1 Transcripts, # 2 Transcripts, # 3 Transcripts, # 4 Transcripts, # 5 Transcripts, # 6 Transcripts, # 7 Transcripts, # 8 Transcripts, # 9 Transcripts, # 10 Transcripts) (Geldens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, by Florida Department of Corrections. (Geldens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Re: 1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jacqueline Izquierdo. Good cause has been demonstrated for the Respondent to file its response to the Petition and the Court's Order to Show Cause. Response now due by 6/27/2016. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 5/26/2016. (EGT) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Jeffrey Robert Geldens added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Geldens, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Upon review of the record, no response memorandum has been filed to the petition or supporting memorandum. Respondent shall, therefore, file a response no later than May 27, 2016, or otherwise show cause why the Petition should not be Granted. Show Cause Response due by 5/27/2016. Docket Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/27/2016. (EGT) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Jacqueline Izquierdo OF INQUIRY (Davide, Ana) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: 2/18/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Dispositive Matters. Senior Judge James Lawrence King no longer assigned as presider judge(s) in case. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/17/2016. (jw)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    NOTICE by Jacqueline Izquierdo And Consent To Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge (Davide, Ana) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Jacqueline Izquierdo re 1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davide, Ana) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Jacqueline Izquierdo. (Davide, Ana) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                          Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (bb) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (bb) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King (bb) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
                                                APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-8484401, filed by Jacqueline Izquierdo.(Davide, Ana) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?