Blumex USA, Inc. v. Air Canada
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-03196

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 1:32 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Blumex USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jayne A. Goldstein +1 954 515 0123 +1 954 515 0124 jgoldstein@magergoldstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mager & Goldstein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LEE ALBERT +1 215 640 3280

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
No Logo Import Blumex Export BV, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
v.
No Logo Air Canada, Defendant
No Logo Air France-KLM, Defendant
No Logo All Nippon Airways Co., Defendant
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Airlines"
Officer/Director, Orbitz Inc
American Airlines, Inc. Officer/Director, American Airlines, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mesa Airlines Inc
No Logo AMR Corp., Defendant
No Logo Asiana Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clark Steven Tomashefsky +1 312 923 2769 +1 312 840 7769 stomashefsky@jenner.com
No Logo Atlas Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Ray, III +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 john.ray@ropesgray.com
No Logo British Airways Plc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis A. Citera +1 312 456 8400 +1 312 456 8435 citeraf@gtlaw.com
No Logo Cargolux Airlines International, SA, Defendant
No Logo Cathay Pacific Airways Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Cathay Pacific Airways Limited"
No Logo Deutsche Lufthansa Ag, Defendant
No Logo Japan Airlines Corp., Defendant
No Logo John Does I-X, Defendant
No Logo Korean Air Co., Defendant
No Logo Lan Airlines S.a., Defendant
No Logo Nippon Cargo Airlines Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Polar Air Cargo, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John H. Ray, III +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 john.ray@ropesgray.com
No Logo SAS Cargo Group A/S, Defendant
No Logo Scandinavian Airline Systems, Defendant
No Logo UAL Corp., Defendant
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Howard Shulman +1 312 782 0600 +1 312 706 8321 courtnotification@mayerbrownrowe.com
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Order(Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Matthew McCahill Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (McCahill, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Letter to Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky enclosing courtsey copies of Motion to Amend Practice and Procedure Order Nos. 2 and 6 by All Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Salzman, Hollis) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Practice and Procedure Order Nos. 2 and 6 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Salzman, Hollis) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 1717 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 1719 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement; granting 1720 Motion for Approval of Proposed Plan of Allocation: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order, the Court hereby grants Plaintiffs' counsel's 1719 motion for final approval of Plaintiffs' settlement agreements with (1) Lan Airlines, S.A., Lan Cargo, S.A., and Aerolinhas Brasileiras, S.A. (collectively, "Lan"); (2) British Airways plc ("British Airways"); (3) South African Airways Ltd. ("South African"); (4) Malaysia Airlines ("Malaysia"); (5) Saudia Arabian Airlines, Ltd. ("Saudia"); (6) Emirates Airline d/b/a Emirates ("Emirates"); (7) El Al Israel Airlines Ltd. ("El Al"); (8) Air Canada and AC Cargo LP (collectively, "Air Canada"); and (9) Salvatore Sanfilippo. Final judgments of dismissal as to the settling defendants will be entered separately. The Court also grants Plaintiffs' counsel's 1720 motion for final approval of the plan of allocation. The Court grants counsel's 1717 request for an award of attorneys' fees and expenses to the extent set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 8/2/2012. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Talbott, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Change of Withdrawal as counsel / change of firm. by Andreas Stargard NOTICE of Withdrawal as counsel / change of firm Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Stargard, Andreas) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-5237775. by China Airlines, LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Blair, Kevin) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                Letter dated 10/10/2011 from Alexander Italianer, Director General of the European Commission to Magistrate Judge Pohorelsky. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG-VVP et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                  Letter requesting clarification of this Court's May 23, 2011 Order granting Plaintiff's "motion to compel production of documents" by Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-JG -VVP et al. (Wolkoff, Harvey) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Jane Edelstein-Fait on behalf of Import Blumex Export BV, Blumex USA, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service# 2 Service List)(Edelstein-Fait, Mary) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT (filed in the Northern District of Illinois on 3/1/06; their document #1) against all defendants, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet from Illinois Northern)(Vaughn, Terry) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                        Letter dated 7/7/06 by Air Canada. Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-00888-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-00984-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03184-CBA-VVP, 1:06-cv-03185-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03188-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03189-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03190-CBA-VVP, 1:06-cv-03191-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03192-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03193-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03194-CBA-VVP, 1:06-cv-03195-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03196-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03197-CBA-VVP(Hritz, George) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                          Letter dated 6/30/06 from Robert N. Kaplan, Esq. on behalf by Plaintiffs in 06-cv-888(CBA) ABM International, Inc. v. Ace Aviation Holdings, Inc. et al. advising the Court the plaintiffs object to the releif requested in the Motion for an entry of a Case Management Order and appointment of Co-Lead counsel filed by the "Fleurchem Plaintiffs" in 06-cv-706(CBA). Associated Cases: 1:06-md-01775-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-00888-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-00984-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03184-CBA-VVP, 1:06-cv-03185-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03188-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03189-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03190-CBA-VVP, 1:06-cv-03191-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03192-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03193-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03194-CBA-VVP, 1:06-cv-03195-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03196-CBA-VVP,1:06-cv-03197-CBA-VVP(Permaul, Jenny) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
                            Letter dated 6/20/06 from the MDL Panel to Robert C. Heinemann, enclosing their certified transfer order to EDNY, for their consolidation into MDL-1775. (from Northern District of Illinois, case #06-1124). (Attachments: # 1 Air Cargo Panel Attorney Service List# 2 Air Cargo Transfer Order)(Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Space Space

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 105 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?