Mohammed v. Sidecar Technologies Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02538

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:21 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Abdul Mohammed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abdul Mohammed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abdul Mohammed +1 630 597 3098 aamohammed@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by pfeifferlawoffices.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/11/2017 Oran D Cart +1 812 493 5546 oran@pfeifferlawoffices.com
TERMINATED: 05/11/2017, LEAD ATTORNEY James Matthew Pfeiffer +1 630 517 0808 +1 630 517 0809 matt@pfeifferlawoffices.com
v.
No Logo General Motors Holding Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen Grace DeRosa +1 312 558 3028 +1 312 807 3619 colleen.derosa@ogletreedeakins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Lawrence Hayes +1 312 558 1235 +1 312 807 3619 john.hayes@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo Jahan Khanna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Rose Riedl +1 312 619 4924 sriedl@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan Meyer LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M O'Hagan +1 312 422 6100 +1 312 422 6110 kohagan@ohaganmeyer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Ann Plominski-Gloede +1 312 422 6100 kgloede@ohaganlaw.com
No Logo Side.cr, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Rose Riedl +1 312 619 4924 sriedl@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan Meyer LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M O'Hagan +1 312 422 6100 +1 312 422 6110 kohagan@ohaganmeyer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Ann Plominski-Gloede +1 312 422 6100 kgloede@ohaganlaw.com
No Logo Sidecar Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Rose Riedl +1 312 619 4924 sriedl@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan Meyer LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M O'Hagan +1 312 422 6100 +1 312 422 6110 kohagan@ohaganmeyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Ann Plominski-Gloede +1 312 422 6100 kgloede@ohaganlaw.com
No Logo Sunil Paul, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Rose Riedl +1 312 619 4924 sriedl@gordonrees.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Hagan Meyer LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M O'Hagan +1 312 422 6100 +1 312 422 6110 kohagan@ohaganmeyer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Ann Plominski-Gloede +1 312 422 6100 kgloede@ohaganlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held on 6/7/2017. Over defendants' objection, plaintiff's oral motion to voluntarily dismiss without prejudice is granted. Defendants' motions to dismiss 47 48 are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rth, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation 55 is denied without prejudice. Status hearing set for 6/7/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Motion by Abdul Mohammed for presentment of motion for attorney representation 55 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 47 , motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, 48 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/30/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Mohammed, Abdul) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
        MOTION by Plaintiff Abdul Mohammed for attorney representation (Mohammed, Abdul)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          PRO SE Appearance by Abdul Mohammed (Mohammed, Abdul) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office (bg)) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 6/21/17 at 9:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion to withdraw as counsel 51 is granted. Attorneys James Matthew Pfeiffer and Oran D Cart are given leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. Plaintiff shall a file pro se appearance form or substitution of counsel appearance form by 6/1/17. Defendants' motions to dismiss 47 and 48 are entered and continued to 6/21/17 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff or plaintiff's substituted counsel shall respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss 47 and 48 by 6/8/17. Failure to comply with this order will lead to this case being dismissed for want of prosecution. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Motion by James Matthew Pfeiffer for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, 51 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/11/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Pfeiffer, James) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: 5/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                MOTION by Attorney J. Matthew Pfeiffer to withdraw as attorney for Abdul Mohammed. New address information: Abdul Mohammed, 258 E. Bailey Rd., Apt. C, Naperville, IL 60565 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Party Contact Info)(Pfeiffer, James)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: 4/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 5/11/17 at 9:30 a.m. Defendants' motions to dismiss 47 and 48 are entered and continued to 5/11/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CERTIFICATE of Service by Katherine Ann Plominski-Gloede on behalf of All Defendants regarding MOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 48 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 47 (Plominski-Gloede, Katherine) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff'sComplaint, # 2 Exhibit B - IL DOL Hearing Transcript, # 3 Exhibit C- Declaration of Sunil Paul, # 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Jahan Khanna)(Plominski-Gloede, Katherine)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff'sComplaint, # 2 Exhibit B - IL DOL Hearing Transcript)(Plominski-Gloede, Katherine)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: 3/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's amended complaint 44 is granted to 4/21/17. Status hearing previously set for 3/29/17 is stricken and reset to 4/26/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            (Agreed Motion) NOTICE of Motion by Katherine Ann Plominski-Gloede for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 44 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 3/29/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Plominski-Gloede, Katherine) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Agreed Motion) (Plominski-Gloede, Katherine)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. by Katherine Ann Plominski-Gloede (Plominski-Gloede, Katherine) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 3/29/17 at 9:30 a.m. Defendant's oral motion for extension of time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint is granted to 3/24/17. Parties are directed to meet and confer regarding settlement. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: 2/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    AMENDED complaint by Abdul Mohammed against Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. (Pfeiffer, James)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: 12/20/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiff's motion for enlargement of time to file his amended complaint 36 is granted to 2/3/17. Motion hearing date of 12/21/16 is stricken. Status hearing set for 2/7/17 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) Modified on 12/20/2016 (ntf, ).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Abdul Mohammed by Oran D Cart (Cart, Oran) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Abdul Mohammed by James Matthew Pfeiffer (Pfeiffer, James) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Motion by James Matthew Pfeiffer for presentment of extension of time 36 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 12/21/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Pfeiffer, James) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Abdul Mohammed for extension of time (Pfeiffer, James)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Motion hearing held. Defendant General Motor's motion to dismiss 33 is granted. Plaintiff's oral motion for an extension of time to file an amended complaint is granted to 12/23/16. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on or before 12/23/16, this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Motion by John Lawrence Hayes for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 33 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/17/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Hayes, John) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: 11/14/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Hayes, John)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Defendants' motion to dismiss 25 is granted. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, if desired, no later than December 2, 2016. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint on or before the December 2 deadline, this case may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 11/10/2016. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 10/26/16 is stricken. Defendants' amended motion to dismiss 25 is taken under advisement. The court will rule electronically. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing previously set for 9/8/16 is stricken and reset to 10/26/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, 25 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Abdul Mohammed for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 6/28/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Mohammed, Abdul) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE by Abdul Mohammedin Opposition to Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIMMOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc., Sunil Paul to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 25 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Mohammed, Abdul) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 9/8/16 at 9:30 a.m. Motion hearing held. Defendant General Motors' motion for extension of time to answer 18 is granted until after ruling is entered on Defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants' motion for leave to file motion in excess of fifteen pages 21 is granted. Defendants' motion to dismiss 23 is withdrawn. Defendants' amended motion to dismiss 25 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 6/24/16. Defendants' reply in support shall be filed by 7/15/16. The court will rule electronically. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Amended MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc., Sunil Paul to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Rose Riedl for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, 23 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/26/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc., Sunil Paul to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Rose Riedl for presentment of motion for leave to file 21 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/26/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. for leave to file Motion in Excess of Fifteen (15) Pages (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Amended NOTICE of Motion by John Lawrence Hayes for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 18 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/26/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Hayes, John) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by John Lawrence Hayes for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 18 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/24/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Hayes, John) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant General Motors Holding Company for extension of time to file answer (Hayes, John) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant General Motors LLC's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint 15 is granted to 5/23/16. Motion hearing date of 5/10/16 is stricken. Status hearing remains set for 5/26/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Colleen Grace DeRosa for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 15 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 5/10/2016 at 09:30 AM. (DeRosa, Colleen) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant General Motors Holding Company for extension of time to file answer (DeRosa, Colleen) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General Motors Holding Company by John Lawrence Hayes (Hayes, John) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant General Motors Holding Company by Colleen Grace DeRosa (DeRosa, Colleen) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc.'s motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint 10 is granted to 5/23/16. Motion hearing date of 4/14/16 is stricken. Status hearing previously set for 4/27/16 is stricken and reset to 5/26/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Rose Riedl for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 10 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 4/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Riedl, Sarah)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. by Sarah Rose Riedl (Riedl, Sarah) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jahan Khanna, Sunil Paul, Side.cr llc, Sidecar Technologies Inc. by Kevin Michael O'Hagan (O'Hagan, Kevin) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abdul Mohammed as to Side.cr llc on 3/28/2016, answer due 4/18/2016; Sidecar Technologies Inc. on 3/28/2016, answer due 4/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Side.Cr LLC) (sxn, ) Modified on 3/30/2016 (sxn, ). (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Abdul Mohammed. General Motors Holding Company waiver sent on 3/15/2016, answer due 5/16/2016. (sxn, ) Modified on 3/28/2016 (sxn, ). (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 4/27/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Abdul Mohammed. (sxn, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                CIVIL Cover Sheet. (sxn, ) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed by Abdul Mohammed; Jury Demand. (sxn, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 227 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?