Chrimar Systems, Inc. v. Fortinet, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-00897

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2020 at 4:42 PM DT (9.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ChriMar Holding Company LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
No Logo Chrimar Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
v.
No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
No Logo ChriMar Holding Company LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
No Logo Chrimar Systems, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr. +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 969 1751 richard.wynne@tklaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (118) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Case Management Statement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Settlement Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Settlement Conference
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/16/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/26/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Statement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO STAY 84 in case 3:16-cv-00186-SI; 67 in case 3:16-cv-00558-SI; 84 in case 3:16-cv-00624-SI; 62 in case 3:16-cv-00897-SI. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/26/2016) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to 63 Counterclaim by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 9/22/2016) Modified on 9/23/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Letter from Justin S. Cohen and Ognjen Zivojnovic to Judge Illston Regarding a Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Dispute Letter, # 2 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            CORRECTED ORDER (see attached) RE: granting (92) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00186-SI; granting (73) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00558-SI; granting (93) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00624-SI; granting (67) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00897-SI (STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reschedule Hearing On Defendants Motion To Stay & Extend Deadline To Complete Claim Construction Discovery).. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/16/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2016: # 1 Appendix Order with Judge's signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/16/2016 (tfS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to (84 in 3:16-cv-00186-SI) MOTION to Stay , (84 in 3:16-cv-00624-SI) MOTION to Stay , (67 in 3:16-cv-00558-SI) MOTION to Stay pending Inter Partes Review, (62 in 3:16-cv-00897-SI) MOTION to Stay . Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (92) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00186-SI; granting (73) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00558-SI; granting (93) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00624-SI; granting (67) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00897-SI (STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reschedule Hearing On Defendants Motion To Stay & Extend Deadline To Complete Claim Construction Discovery). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  REPLY (re 62 MOTION to Stay ) filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Krause, # 2 Exhibit A)(Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: 9/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reschedule Hearing On Defendants Motion To Stay & Extend Deadline To Complete Claim Construction Discovery filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Richard L. Wynne, Jr. in Support of 65 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Related document(s) 65 ) (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 9/9/2016) Modified on 9/12/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 62 MOTION to Stay ) Pending Final Resolution of All IPRs filed byChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: 9/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-3 filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: 8/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Fortinet, Inc.'s ANSWER to 61 Second Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Fortinet Inc.. (Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 8/29/2016) Modified on 8/30/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: 8/26/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay filed by Fortinet Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/9/2016. Replies due by 9/16/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ognjen Zivojnovic, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Proposed Order)(Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Fortinet Inc. Filed byChriMar Systems Inc, ChriMar Holding Company LLC. (Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 8/15/2016) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER RELATING CASES: 16-186, 16-624, 16-897, 16-558. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/21/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 55 Stipulation re: experts and claim construction extrinsic evidence. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 56 MOTION to Relate Case filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 56 MOTION to Relate Case filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Relate Case filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Identify Experts and Exchange Claim Constructions & Extrinsic Evidence filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ognjen Zivojnovic)(Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 7/20/2016) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE RE: CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (b) Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related. Whenever a party knows or learns that an action, filed in or removed to this district is (or the party believes that the action may be) related to an action which is or was pending in this District as defined in Civil L.R. 3-12(a), the party must promptly file in the lowest-numbered case an Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11. In addition to complying with Civil L.R. 7-11, a copy of the motion, together with proof of service pursuant to Civil L.R. 5-5, must be served on all known parties to each apparently related action. A courtesy copy of the motion must be lodged with the assigned Judge in each apparently related case under Civil L.R. 5-1(e). Counsel is directed to file a motion to relate this case with the other Chrimar cases on or before July 20, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 52 Stipulation re: extension to serve invalidity contentions.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Serve Invalidity Contentions filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ognjen Zivojnovic)(Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 6/23/2016) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 50 Stipulated Protective Order. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Stipulated Protective Order filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 6/3/2016) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Ognjen Zivojnovic on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Zivojnovic, Ognjen) (Filed on 6/3/2016) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00186-SI; granting (70) Stipulation in case 3:16-cv-00624-SI, 16-cv-558-SI, 16-cv-897-SI Extending time to file proposed protective order. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2016) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Bruce J. Zabarauskas in Support of 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To File Proposed Protective Order filed byChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Related document(s) 46 ) (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To File Proposed Protective Order filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 5/27/2016) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Susan Illston: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/13/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/20/2016 03:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 12/13/2016 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Total Time in Court 24 minutes. Court Reporter Name n/a. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 5/6/2016) Modified on 5/9/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) by Plaintiffs and Defendant (Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 4/21/2016) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, Motions terminated: 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by ChriMar Systems Inc, ChriMar Holding Company LLC. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/18/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2016) Modified on 4/19/2016 (tfS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options - Fortinet, Inc.'s ADR Certification By Parties And Counsel (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 4/12/2016) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Holmes (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 4/12/2016) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiffs' ADR Certification (Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, Motions terminated: 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by ChriMar Systems Inc, ChriMar Holding Company LLC. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/22/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reschedule Case Management Conference filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Wynne, Richard) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: 3/4/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Illston's Standing ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  ***ERRONEOUS ATTACHMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016) Modified on 3/3/2016 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Patent Rule 2-1(a). Hon. Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/2/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard L. Wynne, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25Q8G42K.) Filing fee previously paid on 3/1/2016 filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wynne, Richard) (Filed on 3/2/2016) Modified on 3/2/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/1/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10251966.) filed by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cohen, Justin) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc.. (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by ChriMar Holding Company LLC, ChriMar Systems Inc (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce John Zabarauskas (Zabarauskas, Bruce) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE: DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 5/24/2016 case management conference is advanced to 4/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Parties are to submit a case management conference statement no later than 3/29/2016. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a "Consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge," or else a "Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment" no later than 3/11/2016. Form is available from the clerk of the court, or from the Forms (Civil) section of the court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2016. Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:15-cv-00651. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 18 Motion to Change Venue. This civil action shall be transferred to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/01/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Fortinet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Fortinet, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Transfer to the Northern District of California)(Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc., Fortinet, Inc.. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D Love for all further proceedings and the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/11/2015. (gsg) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues, except venue. Cause No. 6:15cv618 is designated as the LEAD CASE. All parties are instructed to file any future filings except relating to venue in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' ANSWER to 9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc..(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fortinet, Inc. (Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew M Holmes on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Holmes, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. by Fortinet, Inc..(Neukom, John) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Neukom on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Neukom, John) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fortinet, Inc.( Cohen, Justin) Modified on 2/25/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Fortinet, Inc.( Cohen, Justin) Modified on 2/25/2016 (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Return of Service Executed as to Fortinet, Inc. on 7/10/2015, by personal service; answer due: 7/31/2015. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chrimar Holding Company, LLC, Chrimar Systems, Inc. (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Lawrence Wynne, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Fortinet, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5277920.), filed by Chrimar Systems, Inc., Chrimar Holding Company, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Notice to USPTO)(Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?