Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP v. Samsung Electronics Co LTD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00170

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 30, 2018 at 11:40 AM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rembrandt Wireless Technologies, LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ahmad, Zavitsanos & Anaipakos, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Demetrios Anaipakos +1 713 655 1101 +1 713 655 0062 danaipakos@azalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heim, Payne & Chorush, LLP-Houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric James Enger +1 713 221 2016 +1 713 221 2021 eenger@hpcllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael F Heim +1 713 221 2000 +1 713 221 2021 mheim@hpcllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miranda Yan Jones +1 713 221 2017 +1 713 221 2021 mjones@hpcllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Research In Motion Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S J Hung +1 415 268 6000 +1 415 268 7522 rhung@mofo.com
Research In Motion Ltd. Research In Motion Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S J Hung +1 415 268 6000 +1 415 268 7522 rhung@mofo.com
Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC Samsung Austin Semiconductor, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood +1 202 420 2200 +1 202 420 2201 JSherwood@BlankRome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood +1 202 420 2200 +1 202 420 2201 JSherwood@BlankRome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Rose Carrizosa +1 650 617 4019 rebecca.carrizosa@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne K. Cevasco +1 212 596 9000 +1 646 728 1706 deanne.cevasco@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Y Ling +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 vincent.ling@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co LTD"

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood +1 202 420 2200 +1 202 420 2201 JSherwood@BlankRome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Rose Carrizosa +1 650 617 4019 rebecca.carrizosa@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne K. Cevasco +1 212 596 9000 +1 646 728 1706 deanne.cevasco@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Y Ling +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 vincent.ling@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Kirk Sherwood +1 202 420 2200 +1 202 420 2201 JSherwood@BlankRome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Rose Carrizosa +1 650 617 4019 rebecca.carrizosa@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deanne K. Cevasco +1 212 596 9000 +1 646 728 1706 deanne.cevasco@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Y Ling +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 vincent.ling@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Stay
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Stay
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/15/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Response to Non-Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney VINCENT Y. LING by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granted in part 6 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/18/2016. (nkl, ) Modified on 5/18/2016 (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Support re 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 6 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Enger, Eric) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca R Carrizosa on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5703852. (Carrizosa, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Deanne K Cevasco on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5702636. (Cevasco, Deanne) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Vincent Y Ling on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5702527. (Ling, Vincent) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael F Heim on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Heim, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miranda Yan Jones on behalf of Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP (Jones, Miranda) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabrielle Elizabeth Higgins on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Higgins, Gabrielle) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian P Biddinger on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Biddinger, Brian) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jesse J Jenner on behalf of Samsung Electronics America Inc, Samsung Electronics Co LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Jenner, Jesse) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Sealed Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?