Armstead v. Clinton et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00063

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2018 at 4:48 PM ST (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brenda C. Armstead, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brenda C Armstead

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brenda C Armstead
v.
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Clinton"
No Logo Jeb Bush, Defendant
No Logo Ted Cruz, Defendant
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Supplement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: None Transfer Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Response
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned Undeliverable
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Transfer Case
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Final
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Transfer Case
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Transfer Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Transfer Case
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Memorandum and Recommendations
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None Response
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None referring case to magistrate judge
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Order for Initial Conference & Disclosure-WITHOUT FORM
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?