GRAPHITE ELECTRODE SALES, INC. v. AMERI-SOURCE HOLDINGS, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00474
District Judge Joy Flowers Conti, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 7:27 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo GRAPHITE ELECTRODE SALES, INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Myers +1 412 566 5900 +1 412 566 6099 jmyers@eckertseamans.com

Represented by Frohsin & Barger LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Fredrick Barger, Jr. +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 jim@frohsinbarger.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry I Frohsin +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 henry@frohsinbarger.com
TERMINATED: 12/23/2014, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie M. Motes +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 carrie@frohsinbarger.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Elliott Walthall +1 205 933 4006 +1 205 933 4008 elliott@frohsinbarger.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul E. Skirtich +1 412 644 3500 paul.skirtich@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo AJAY GOEL, Defendant
No Logo AMERI STEEL, INC, Defendant
No Logo AMERI-SOURCE ENGINEERING INDIA PRIVATE LTD, Defendant
No Logo Ameri-source Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMERI-SOURCE INTERNATIONAL, INC., Defendant
No Logo AMERI-SOURCE SPECIALTY PRODUCTS, Defendant
No Logo Smc, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SPECIAL MACHINGING COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo TOM DIENER, Defendant
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None Sealed Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 29 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER that the Relator's Complaint, the Government's Notice of Election to Intervene in Part and to Decline to Intervene in Part, and this Order on file in this matter shall be unsealed on Monday February 22, 2016, all other papers or Orders (Documents 2 through 27) on file in this matter shall remain under seal and the Seal Shall be lifted on all entries occurring in this action after Monday, February 22, 2016. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/19/2016. (smc) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Election by the United States to intervene in part and to decline to intervene in part by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Settlement Agreement) (jv) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against AMERI STEEL, INC, AMERI-SOURCE ENGINEERING INDIA PRIVATE LTD, AMERI-SOURCE HOLDINGS, INC., AMERI-SOURCE INTERNATIONAL, INC., AMERI-SOURCE SPECIALTY PRODUCTS, TOM DIENER, AJAY GOEL, SMC, INC, SPECIAL MACHINGING COMPANY (Filing fee $350, receipt number 24668020527), filed by GRAPHITE ELECTRODE SALES, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt Filing Fee) (plh) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 76 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?