Hooper Holmes, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 16-10407
District Judge Stuart M. Bernstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 18, 2021 at 8:01 PM EDT (10.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Franklin Abreu-Depena, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by William Schwitzer & Associates, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard R Cohen +1 212 683 3800 +1 212 685 2356
No Logo Rosemarie A. Herman, as natural guardian for Gavin I. Esmail and Jesse A. Esmail, individually and as beneficiaries of the trust created by Harold Herman as as Grantor under agreement dated March 1, 1990 and as beneficiaries of the trust created by , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Howard Schwartz +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 jschwartz@jaspanllp.com
No Logo Rosemarie A. Herman, individually, as beneficiary of the trust created by Harold Herman as Grantor under agreement dated March 1, 1990 and as beneficiary of the trust created by Rosemarie A. Herman as Grantor dated Nov. 27, 1991 and on behalf of May, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
Space Jeffrey Howard Schwartz +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 jschwartz@jaspanllp.com
Space Natasha Shishov +1 516 393 8291
Securities Investor Protection Corporation Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mcilvaine, Cloyd S.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathanael Kelley +1 202 371 8300 +1 202 371 6728

Toggle Switch Represented by Quanta Asset Management LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Josephine Wang +1 202 371 8300

Toggle Switch Represented by Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin H. Bell +1 202 371 8300 +1 202 371 6728 kbell@sipc.org
Space Christopher H. LaRosa +1 202 371 8300 +1 202 371 6728 clarosa@sipc.org
No Logo Jeffrey Kusama-Hinte, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin J. Auerbach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin J. Auerbach +1 212 704 4347 +1 646 304 0175
v.
No Logo A&G Goldman Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael Ira Goldberg +1 954 463 2700 +1 954 463 2224
No Logo ABC Company #1 through ABC Company #10, the last ten entities being fictitious and unknown to the Plaintiffs, the entities intended being entities, if any, involved in the acts or omissions described in the Complaint, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ABC Company #1 through ABC Company #10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ABC Company #1 through ABC Company #10
No Logo ABN AMRO BANK N.V. (presently known as THE ROYAL BANK OF SCOTLAND, N.V.), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen & Overy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Svetkey Feldberg +1 212 610 6360 +1 212 610 6399 michael.feldberg@newyork.allenovery.com
No Logo Access International Advisors Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo Access Management Luxembourg SA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo Access Partners SA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo Adele Fox, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Helen Davis Chaitman +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 hchaitman@chaitmanllp.com
No Logo Alan Goldman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael Ira Goldberg +1 954 463 2700 +1 954 463 2224
No Logo Alpine Trustees Limited, Individually and As Trustee of El Prela Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo Amy A. Hobish, Mitchell K. Hobish, Richard S. Hobish, Toby T. Hobish, LI Ram L.P., a New York limited partnership, Marital Trust under Article XXII of the Herbert W. Hobish Living Trust, a New York tr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Andrew H. Cohen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Goett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Goett +1 917 273 7950
No Logo Antaeus Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becker, Glynn, Muffly, Chassin & Hosinski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alec P. Ostrow +1 212 888 3033 +1 212 888 0255
No Logo Ardent Investments LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ardent Investments LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ardent Investments LLC
No Logo Ariel Fund Limited And Gabriel Capital, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan W. Siev +1 212 278 1000 +1 212 278 1733 jsiev@reedsmith.com
No Logo Arthur B. Page, in his capacity as Trustee of the Helene R. Cahners Grantor Retained Annuity Trust #1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Ascot Fund Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Judith A. Archer +1 212 318 3342 +1 212 318 3400 judith.archer@nortonrosefulbright.com
, Jami Mills Vibbert +1 212 318 3000 +1 212 318 3400
No Logo Ascot Partners, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Judith A. Archer +1 212 318 3342 +1 212 318 3400 judith.archer@nortonrosefulbright.com
, Jami Mills Vibbert +1 212 318 3000 +1 212 318 3400
No Logo Ashby Holdings Services Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo Ashby Investment Services Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo Atlantic Security Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Anthony D. Boccanfuso +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 8689
No Logo Atlas, in her capacity as Personal Representative of the Estate of Muriel B. Cantor, Nancy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Atlas, in her capacity as Personal Representative of the Estate of Muriel B. Cantor, Nancy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Atlas, in her capacity as Personal Representative of the Estate of Muriel B. Cantor, Nancy
No Logo Avon Bard LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Avon Bard LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Avon Bard LLC
No Logo Bam L.P., Adam Mann, Meryl Mann, Michael Mann, and Betsy Mann Polatsch, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Banca Carige S.p.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Mark +1 212 505 1990 +1 212 500 3490 dmark@kasowitz.com
No Logo Bank Austria Worldwide Fund Management Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Worcester, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Franklin B. Velie +1 212 660 3000 +1 212 660 3001 fvelie@sandw.com
No Logo Banque J. Safra (Suisse) S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marisa Glassman +1 212 558 4000
Space Robinson Burrell Lacy +1 212 558 3879 +1 212 558 3588 Lacyr@sullcrom.com
No Logo Banque Syz SA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard Beryl Levin +1 212 891 1600 +1 212 891 1699 rlevin@jenner.com
No Logo Barfield Nominees Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo Benjamin W. Roth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michele L. Pahmer +1 212 806 5400 +1 212 806 7646 mpahmer@stroock.com
Madoff, Bernard L. Madoff, Bernard L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC."
No Logo Bernard Marden Profit Sharing Plan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo BNP Paribas Appellees, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Virtanen, Kari Viljo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Breon Peace +1 212 225 2059 +1 212 225 3999
No Logo BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Virtanen, Kari Viljo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Breon Peace +1 212 225 2059 +1 212 225 3999
BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited BNP Paribas Bank & Trust Cayman Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Virtanen, Kari Viljo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Breon Peace +1 212 225 2059 +1 212 225 3999
No Logo BNP Paribas S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Virtanen, Kari Viljo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Breon Peace +1 212 225 2059 +1 212 225 3999
No Logo BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Virtanen, Kari Viljo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Breon Peace +1 212 225 2059 +1 212 225 3999
No Logo C&P Associates, Inc., C&P Associates, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arkin Solbakken Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alex Reisen +1 212 333 0200
No Logo C&P Associates, Ltd., C&P Associates, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arkin Solbakken Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alex Reisen +1 212 333 0200
No Logo Cara Mendelow, Cara Mendelow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arkin Solbakken Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alex Reisen +1 212 333 0200
No Logo Carl Glick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becker, Glynn, Muffly, Chassin & Hosinski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alec P. Ostrow +1 212 888 3033 +1 212 888 0255
No Logo Carla Goldworm, Luke Goldworm, Samuel Goldworm, S&L Partnership, a New York partnership, Trust for the benefit of Luke Goldworm, a New York trust, Trust for the benefit of Samuel Goldworm, a New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Carlo Grosso, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Mor Wetzler +1 212 318 6000 +1 212 752 3289 morwetzler@paulhastings.com
No Logo Certain Defendants Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb & Loeb LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel B. Besikof +1 212 407 4129 +1 646 417 6335 dbesikof@loeb.com
No Logo Certain Transferee Defendants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Certain Transferee Defendants

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Certain Transferee Defendants
No Logo Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Carmine Boccuzzi +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499
Citicorp North America, Inc. Citicorp North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Carmine Boccuzzi +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499
No Logo Consolidated Realty Holdings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Consolidated Realty Holdings, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Consolidated Realty Holdings, LLC
No Logo Credit Agricole Corporate And Investment Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lawrence B. Friedman +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3999
No Logo Credit Agricole S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lawrence B. Friedman +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3999
No Logo David Shapiro 1989 Trust, as amended, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lax & Neville, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert Miller +1 212 696 1999
, , , Brian Neville +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531
No Logo DAVID SHAPIRO, individually and as trustee for Trust f/b/o [W.P.S.] & [J.G.S.], Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lax & Neville, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Barry R. Lax +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531
No Logo Donald J. Weiss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolff & Samson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Lawrence Israel +1 973 530 2045 +1 973 530 2245
No Logo Edmond A. Gorek, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Margarita Y. Ginzburg +1 973 966 8265
, Thomas Dunn Goldberg +1 203 977 7383 +1 203 977 7301 tgoldberg@daypitney.com
No Logo El Prela Group Holding Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo El Prela Trading Investments Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo El Prela Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo Elaine S. Stein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Douglas L Furth +1 212 907 7340 +1 212 754 0330 dfurth@golenbock.com
No Logo Elaine S. Stein Revocable Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Douglas L Furth +1 212 907 7340 +1 212 754 0330 dfurth@golenbock.com
No Logo Elins Daughters Trust For The Benefit of Jamie Ann Elins Dated December 12, 1989, A California Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew J. Gold +1 212 880 9827 +1 212 986 8866 mgold@kkwc.com
No Logo Elins Daughters Trust for the Benefit of Julie Lynn Eilns Dated December 12, 1989, a California Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew J. Gold +1 212 880 9827 +1 212 986 8866 mgold@kkwc.com
No Logo Elins Family Trust, a California Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew J. Gold +1 212 880 9827 +1 212 986 8866 mgold@kkwc.com
No Logo Epic Ventures, LLC, and Eric P. Stein, individually, and as Managing Member of Epic Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Estate of Beatrice Bader, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Estate of Helen Shurman, Estate of Jack Shurman, Paul S. Shurman, individually, in his capacity as Executor of the Estate of Jack Shurman and Helen Shurman and as beneficiary under the wills of Jack S, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo ESTATE OF HELENE R. CAHNERS KAPLAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Estate of Muriel B. Cantor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Estate of Muriel B. Cantor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Estate of Muriel B. Cantor
No Logo Estate of Norma Fishbein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Estate of Sheldon Shaffer, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Southard & Stevens, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brendan M. Scott +1 212 972 3000 +1 212 972 2245
No Logo Evelyn Chernis Revocable Trust Agreement for Samantha Eyges dtd October 6th 1986, et al., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael R. Lastowski +1 302 657 4900 +1 302 657 4901 mlastowski@duanemorris.com
No Logo Evelyn Fisher, individually, and in her capacity as Trustee for TRUST U/W/O DAVID L. FISHER and TRUST U/T/A 8/20/90, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Terence William McCormick +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mccormick@mintzandgold.com
No Logo Fairfield Greenwich Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Eric Kazanoff +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 pkazanoff@stblaw.com
No Logo Federico Ceretti, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Mor Wetzler +1 212 318 6000 +1 212 752 3289 morwetzler@paulhastings.com
No Logo FGLS Equity LLC, FGLS Equity LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arkin Solbakken Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alex Reisen +1 212 333 0200
No Logo FIM Advisers LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Mor Wetzler +1 212 318 6000 +1 212 752 3289 morwetzler@paulhastings.com
No Logo FIM Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Mor Wetzler +1 212 318 6000 +1 212 752 3289 morwetzler@paulhastings.com
No Logo First Peninsula Trustees Limited, Individually and as Trustee of The Ashby Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo Fullerton Capital Pte. Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Anthony D. Boccanfuso +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 8689
No Logo Gabriel Capital Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mariel R. Bronen +1 212 698 3500
, Neil A. Steiner +1 212 698 3822 +1 212 698 0480
No Logo Gerald Goldman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Michael Ira Goldberg +1 954 463 2700 +1 954 463 2224
No Logo Gerald J. Block, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Mikhailevich +1 212 415 9243 +1 646 417 7236
No Logo Grosvenor Aggressive Growth Fund Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jargalsaihan, Batsaihan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Gregg Mashberg +1 212 969 3450 +1 212 969 2900
No Logo Grosvenor Balanced Growth Fund Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jargalsaihan, Batsaihan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Gregg Mashberg +1 212 969 3450 +1 212 969 2900
No Logo Grosvenor Investment Management Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jargalsaihan, Batsaihan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Gregg Mashberg +1 212 969 3450 +1 212 969 2900
No Logo Grosvenor Private Private Reserve Fund Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jargalsaihan, Batsaihan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Gregg Mashberg +1 212 969 3450 +1 212 969 2900
No Logo Helene Cummings Karp Annuity, and Helene Cummings Karp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Helene R. Cahners Grantor Retained Annuity Trust #1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Thomas J. Moloney +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3999 tmoloney@cgsh.com
No Logo HSBC Defendants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Thomas J. Moloney +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3999 tmoloney@cgsh.com
No Logo J. Ezra Merkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glenn A Gundersen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Mariel R. Bronen +1 212 698 3500
, Neil A. Steiner +1 212 698 3822 +1 212 698 0480
No Logo J. Maurice Herman, as Trustee of the J. Maurice Herman Revocable Trust dated October 28, 2002, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Darren Traub +1 212 880 3800 +1 212 905 6472 darren.traub@akerman.com
No Logo J. Maurice Herman, as trustee of the trust created by Harold Herman as Grantor under agreement dated March 1, 1990, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by J. Maurice Herman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Maurice Herman
No Logo James Doyle, in his capacity as trustee of the Trust Created Under the Last Will and Testament of Beatrice Bader, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo James P. Marden, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo James P. Marden, as trustee of Bernard Marden Profit Sharing Plan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Jamie Elins Sabet, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew J. Gold +1 212 880 9827 +1 212 986 8866 mgold@kkwc.com
No Logo Joel I. Gordon, and Joel I. Gordon Revocable Trust U/A/D 5/11/94, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, the last ten names being fictitious and unknown to the Plaintiffs, the persons intended being the persons, if any, involved in the acts or omissions described in the Complaint, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10
No Logo Julian Maurice Herman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Darren Traub +1 212 880 3800 +1 212 905 6472 darren.traub@akerman.com
No Logo Julie Elins Banks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew J. Gold +1 212 880 9827 +1 212 986 8866 mgold@kkwc.com
No Logo KBC Investments Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "KBC Investments Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Unger +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 389 5599
No Logo Kelman Partners Limited Partnership, et al., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo KENNETH CITRON, individually and as trustee for Trust f/b/o [A.J.C., [K.F.C.] AND [L.C.C.], as amended, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lax & Neville, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Barry R. Lax +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531
No Logo Keystone Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keystone Management LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keystone Management LLC
No Logo Kingate Euro Fund, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jordan Harap +1 212 849 7013
, Rex Lee +1 212 849 7163 +1 212 849 7100 rexlee@quinnemanuel.com
, Robert Scott Loigman +1 212 849 7444 +1 212 849 7100 robertloigman@quinnemanuel.com
, Lindsay M. Weber +1 212 849 7277

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Xochitl S. Strohbehn +1 212 370 6224
No Logo Kingate Global Fund, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Jordan Harap +1 212 849 7013
, Rex Lee +1 212 849 7163 +1 212 849 7100 rexlee@quinnemanuel.com
, Robert Scott Loigman +1 212 849 7444 +1 212 849 7100 robertloigman@quinnemanuel.com
, Lindsay M. Weber +1 212 849 7277

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Xochitl S. Strohbehn +1 212 370 6224
No Logo Kingate Management Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAFFETZ LINDSEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Walter Reynolds +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 scott.reynolds@chaffetzlindsey.com
, Erin Elaine Valentine +1 212 257 6932 +1 212 257 6950 erin.valentine@chaffetzlindsey.com
No Logo L.H. Rich Companies, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Garvey Shubert & Barer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Goodman +1 212 965 4534 +1 212 334 1278 agoodman@gsblaw.com
No Logo LAD Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lax & Neville, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert Miller +1 212 696 1999
, , , Brian Neville +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531
No Logo Lawrence D. Marks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Lawrence Elins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew J. Gold +1 212 880 9827 +1 212 986 8866 mgold@kkwc.com
No Logo Legacy Capital, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens & Lee, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas F. Kajon +1 212 537 0403 +1 610 371 1223 nfk@stevenslee.com
No Logo Leslie Engelson, Alicia P. Felton, Miles J. Felton, in his capacity as Grantor of the Murray Family Trust, William D. Felton, in his capacity as Trustee of the Doris Felton Family Trust, Murray B. Fel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Leslie Shapiro 1985 Trust, as amended, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lax & Neville, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert Miller +1 212 696 1999
, , , Brian Neville +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531
No Logo LESLIE SHAPIRO CITRON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by LESLIE SHAPIRO CITRON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LESLIE SHAPIRO CITRON
No Logo Lexington Capital Partners, L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becker, Glynn, Muffly, Chassin & Hosinski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alec P. Ostrow +1 212 888 3033 +1 212 888 0255
No Logo LGT Bank (Switzerland) Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES R KLAIBER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dorothy Heyl +1 212 530 5088
No Logo LGT Bank Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by JAMES R KLAIBER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Dorothy Heyl +1 212 530 5088
No Logo Linda Elins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kleinberg, Kaplan, Wolff & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Matthew J. Gold +1 212 880 9827 +1 212 986 8866 mgold@kkwc.com
No Logo Linda Sohn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Terence William McCormick +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mccormick@mintzandgold.com
No Logo Lloyds TSB Bank plc, Lloyds TSB Bank plc (now known as Lloyds Bank plc), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo M&B Capital Advisers Sociedad De Valores, S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard Beryl Levin +1 212 891 1600 +1 212 891 1699 rlevin@jenner.com
No Logo Marguerite M. Gorek, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Margarita Y. Ginzburg +1 973 966 8265
, Thomas Dunn Goldberg +1 203 977 7383 +1 203 977 7301 tgoldberg@daypitney.com
No Logo Marion B. Roth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michele L. Pahmer +1 212 806 5400 +1 212 806 7646 mpahmer@stroock.com
No Logo Marsha Peshkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Helen Davis Chaitman +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 hchaitman@chaitmanllp.com
No Logo Mayfair York LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayfair York LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mayfair York LLC
No Logo Mercedes P. Rea, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Richard E. Signorelli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard E Signorelli +1 212 254 4218 +1 212 254 1396 rsignorelli@nyclitigator.com
No Logo Merit Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Merit Management LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Merit Management LLC
No Logo Merritt Kevin Auld, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Michael Offit, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHANIE LYNN GAL +1 212 872 7491 sgal@akingump.com
Space Sean E O'Donnell +1 212 872 1093 +1 212 872 1002 sodonnell@akingump.com
No Logo Michael Offit, as trustee of the trust created by Harold Herman as Grantor under agreement dated march 1, 1990, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Offit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Offit
No Logo Michael Offit, as trustee of the trust created by Rosemarie A. Herman as Grantor dated November 27, 1991, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Offit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Offit
No Logo Milberg LLP and Seeger Weiss LLP Defendants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Aaron Kupillas +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mkupillas@milberg.com
No Logo Myra Perlen in her capacity as Trustee for the Stuart Perlen Revocable Trust and individually, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo Myra Perlen Revocable Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo Myra Perlen, individually and in her capacity as Trustee of the Myra Perlen Revocable Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo Nancy J. Marks Trust 2002, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Nancy L. Cahners, individually and in her capacity as Trustee of the Helene R. Cahners Grantor Retained Annuity Trust #1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Neal M. Goldman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Terence William McCormick +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mccormick@mintzandgold.com
No Logo Nine Thirty Capital Partners LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FisherBroyles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard A. Kirby +1 202 236 2854 +1 866 788 9942
No Logo Nine Thirty Partners Holdings, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FisherBroyles, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard A. Kirby +1 202 236 2854 +1 866 788 9942
No Logo Norma Fishbein Revocable Trust dtd 3/21/90, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Norma Shapiro, The Norma Shapiro Revocable Declaration of Trust Under Agreement Dated 9/16/08, Trust Under Will of Philip L. Shapiro, and Martin Rosen , in his capacity as Trustee of the Trust Under W, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Northern Trust Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo Odyssey Alternative Strategy Fund, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Odyssey Alternative Strategy Fund, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Odyssey Alternative Strategy Fund, Ltd.
No Logo Pamela Christian, Pamela Christian, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arkin Solbakken Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alex Reisen +1 212 333 0200
No Logo Pamela Goldman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Pamela Goldman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Goldman
No Logo Panagiotis Sakellariou Settlement, an irrevocable trust u/a/d 12/17/92, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY John F. Zulack +1 212 571 0550 +1 212 571 0555
No Logo Parson Finance Panama S.A., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellner Herlihy Getty & Friedman, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene Frederick Getty +1 212 889 2121 +1 212 684 6224
No Logo Pati H. Gerber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Pati H. Gerber

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pati H. Gerber
No Logo Patrice M. Auld, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Patrice M. Auld & Certain Other Avoidance Defendants Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Patrice M. Auld, as trustee of Bernard Marden Profit Sharing Plan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Patricia DeLuca, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by HUNTON ANDREWS KURTH LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Anthony Rich +212030 910 00x1132 +2 120 309 1100 rrich2@huntonak.com
No Logo Patrick Littaye, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo Peter G. Chernis Revocable Trust dtd 1/16/87, as amended, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Michael R. Lastowski +1 302 657 4900 +1 302 657 4901 mlastowski@duanemorris.com
No Logo Philip Cahners, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Anthony D. Boccanfuso +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 8689
No Logo Port of Hercules Trustees Limited, Individually and as Trustee of El Prela Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo Primrose Management, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Primrose Management, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Primrose Management LLC
No Logo Prospect Capital Partners, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becker, Glynn, Muffly, Chassin & Hosinski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alec P. Ostrow +1 212 888 3033 +1 212 888 0255
No Logo Prospect Hill Foundation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becker, Glynn, Muffly, Chassin & Hosinski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alec P. Ostrow +1 212 888 3033 +1 212 888 0255
No Logo Public Institution for Social Security, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory W. Fox +1 212 459 7348 +1 212 355 3333
No Logo Queensgate Foundation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Eiseman +1 212 907 7330 +1 212 754 0330 deiseman@golenbock.com
No Logo Rachel Cahners Caveney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo RACHEL SHAPIRO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by RACHEL SHAPIRO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RACHEL SHAPIRO
No Logo RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, LTD.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Helen Davis Chaitman +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 hchaitman@chaitmanllp.com
, GREGORY MICHAEL DEXTER +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 gdexter@chaitmanllp.com
No Logo RBC Foreign Defendants, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo RENEE SHAPIRO, individually, as general partner of S&R Investment Co., as trustee for LAD Trust, as trustee for David Shapiro 1989 Trust, as amended, and as trustee for Leslie Shapiro 1985 Trust, as a, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by RENEE SHAPIRO, individually, as general partner of S&R Investment Co., as trustee for LAD Trust, as trustee for David Shapiro 1989 Trust, as amended, and as trustee for Leslie Shapiro 1985 Trust, as a

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RENEE SHAPIRO, individually, as general partner of S&R Investment Co., as trustee for LAD Trust, as trustee for David Shapiro 1989 Trust, as amended, and as trustee for Leslie Shapiro 1985 Trust, as a
No Logo Richard M. Glantz, RICHARD M. GLANTZ, individually, as trustee of the Richard M. Glantz 1991 Living Trust, the Edward R. Glantz Living Trust, the Thelma Glantz Living Trust, the Glantz-Ostrin Trust I, and the Glantz-Ostrin Trust II, and as personal , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Richard E. Signorelli

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard E Signorelli +1 212 254 4218 +1 212 254 1396 rsignorelli@nyclitigator.com
No Logo Robert A. Marks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Robert Fishbein, in his capacity as the Personal Representative of the estate of Norma Fishbein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Robert Fishbein, in his capacity as Trustee of the Norma Fishbein Revocable Trust dtd 3/21/90, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Robert Fried & Certain Other Avoidance Defendants Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Robert M. Cahners, individually and in his capacity as Trustee of the Helene R. Cahners Grantor Retained Annuity Trust #1, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Russell Oasis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Helen Davis Chaitman +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 hchaitman@chaitmanllp.com
, GREGORY MICHAEL DEXTER +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 gdexter@chaitmanllp.com
No Logo S&R Investment Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lax & Neville, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert Miller +1 212 696 1999
, , , Brian Neville +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531
No Logo Schroder & Co Bank AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Steven Fischler +1 212 841 5700 +1 212 841 5725 robert.fischler@ropesgray.com
No Logo Seton Industrial Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seton Industrial Corp.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Seton Industrial Corp.
No Logo SG Hambros Bank & Trust (Bahamas) Limited, in its capacity as trustee of the Panagiotis Sakellariou Settlement, an Irrevocable Trust u/a/d 12/17/92, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allegaert Berger & Vogel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY John F. Zulack +1 212 571 0550 +1 212 571 0555
No Logo Sharon A. Raddock, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Sharon Popkin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Helen Davis Chaitman +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 hchaitman@chaitmanllp.com
No Logo Sidney Marks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Sidney Marks Trust 2002, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Six Sis AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CHAFFETZ LINDSEY LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andreas A. Frischknecht +1 212 257 6965 +1 212 257 6950 andreas.frischknecht@chaffetzlindsey.com
, Erin Elaine Valentine +1 212 257 6932 +1 212 257 6950 erin.valentine@chaffetzlindsey.com
No Logo Somers Dublin Designated Activity Company (f/k/a Somers Dublin Limited), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Thomas J. Moloney +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3999 tmoloney@cgsh.com
No Logo Stanley Plesent, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo STANLEY SHAPIRO, individually, as general partner of S&R Investment Co., as trustee for LAD Trust, as trustee for David Shapiro 1989 Trust, as amended, and as trustee for Leslie Shapiro 1985 Trust, as, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lax & Neville, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Barry R. Lax +1 212 696 1999 +1 212 566 4531
No Logo Steven B. Mendelow, Steven B. Mendelow, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arkin Solbakken Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alex Reisen +1 212 333 0200
No Logo Stuart Perlen and Myra Perlen, in their capacities as trustees for the Trust F/B/O Melissa Perlen U/A Dated 9/12/1979, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo Stuart Perlen in his capacity as Grantor and Trustee for the Stuart Perlen Revocable Trust and individually, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo Stuart Perlen Revocable Trust dtd 1/4/08, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo Stuart Perlen, in his capacity as Trustee of the Myra Perlen Revocable Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo Stuart Zlotolow, in his capacity as executor of the Estate of Beatrice Bader and as former trustee of the Trust Created Under the Last Will and Testament of Beatrice Bader, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Susan Lazarus, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Susan Schemen Fradin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Thompson Baio +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 jbaio@willkie.com
No Logo Susanne Stone Marshall, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Helen Davis Chaitman +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 hchaitman@chaitmanllp.com
No Logo The Ashby Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Timothy P. Harkness +1 212 230 4610 +1 212 277 4001 timothy.herkness@freshfield.com
No Logo The Estate of Leonard Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Chaitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Helen Davis Chaitman +1 888 759 1114 +1 888 759 1114 hchaitman@chaitmanllp.com
No Logo The Estate of Nancy Marks, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
No Logo The Horowitz & Libshutz Family Foundation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo The Murray & Irene Pergament Foundation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo The Sperry Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becker, Glynn, Muffly, Chassin & Hosinski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Alec P. Ostrow +1 212 888 3033 +1 212 888 0255
No Logo The Transferee Defendants, which are listed in Exhibit 2 to the Consolidated Opposition, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by The Transferee Defendants, which are listed in Exhibit 2 to the Consolidated Opposition

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space The Transferee Defendants, which are listed in Exhibit 2 to the Consolidated Opposition
No Logo The Wiener Family Limited Partnership, Wiener Family Holding Corp., Marvin M. Wiener and Sondra M. Wiener,Charles E. Wiener and Carolyn B. Wiener, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Meth +1 973 992 4800 +1 973 992 9125 msteen@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Toby T. Hobish and LI Ram L.P., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , Carole Neville +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 cneville@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Transferee Defendants listed on Exhibit 1 of this letter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by Transferee Defendants listed on Exhibit 1 of this letter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Transferee Defendants listed on Exhibit 1 of this letter
No Logo Trincastar Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Richard Beryl Levin +1 212 891 1600 +1 212 891 1699 rlevin@jenner.com
No Logo Trust Created Under the Last Will and Testament of Beatrice Bader, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pryor Cashman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Richard Levy, Jr. +1 212 326 0886 +1 212 326 0806 rlevy@pryorcashman.com
No Logo Trust F/B/O Melissa Perlen U/A Dated 9/12/1979, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Jonathan Laurence Flaxer +1 212 907 7327 +1 212 754 0330 jflaxer@golenbock.com
No Logo TRUST F/B/O [A.J.C.], [K.F.C.] AND [L.C.C.], as amended, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by TRUST F/B/O [A.J.C.], [K.F.C.] AND [L.C.C.], as amended

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TRUST F/B/O [A.J.C.], [K.F.C.] AND [L.C.C.], as amended
No Logo TRUST F/B/O [W.P.S.] & [J.G.S.], Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , ,

Toggle Switch Represented by TRUST F/B/O [W.P.S.] & [J.G.S.]

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TRUST F/B/O [W.P.S.] & [J.G.S.]
No Logo Trust For Architectural Easements, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Trust For Architectural Easements

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trust For Architectural Easements
No Logo Trust u/t/a 8/20/90, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Terence William McCormick +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mccormick@mintzandgold.com
No Logo Trust U/W/O David L. Fisher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz & Gold LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , Terence William McCormick +1 212 696 4848 +1 212 696 1231 mccormick@mintzandgold.com
No Logo UBS Deutschland AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marshall Ross King +1 212 351 3905 +1 212 351 5243 mking@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Unifortune Asset Management SGR SPA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Noah Greenwald +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 dgreenwald@cravath.com
No Logo Unifortune Conservative Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Noah Greenwald +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 dgreenwald@cravath.com
No Logo Windsor Plaza LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Windsor Plaza LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windsor Plaza LLC
No Logo Windsor Plaza LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rattet PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James B. Glucksman +1 914 371 7400

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert Leslie Rattet

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Leslie Rattet +1 914 381 7400 +1 914 381 7406
No Logo ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack G. Stern +1 212 446 2340 +1 212 446 2350 jstern@bsfllp.com
No Logo Zeus Partners Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Anthony L. Paccione

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , Anthony L. Paccione +1 212 940 8502 +1 212 894 5502
No Logo Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Nicholas Cremona +1 212 589 4682 +1 212 459 4221
Space Edward John Jacobs +1 212 589 4674 +1 212 589 4201 ejacobs@bakerlaw.com
, Thomas Leslie Long +1 614 228 1541 +1 212 589 4201 tlong@bakerlaw.com
, Keith R. Murphy +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 kmurphy@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, DAVID J. SHEEHAN +1 212 589 4616 +1 212 589 4201 dsheehan@bakerlaw.com
, Ona T. Wang +1 212 589 4254 +1 212 589 4201 owang@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cresswell, Bobby

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina Griffin +1 212 589 4276 +1 212 589 4201

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lalit K Jain Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lalit K Jain +1 718 255 6576 +1 347 637 5498

Toggle Switch Represented by Strawser, Richard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Oren Warshavsky +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201

Toggle Switch Represented by TUGGLE DUGGINS & MESCHAN PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Seanna Brown +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201

Toggle Switch Represented by Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, Howard L. Simon +1 212 237 1000 +1 212 262 1215 hsimon@windelsmarx.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Barry Lunn +1 302 571 6600 mlunn@ycst.com
No Logo Ashley Terrill, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Anthony M. Vassallo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony M Vassallo +1 917 862 1936 +1 866 334 9752
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Gawker Media LLC, et al., Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandeep Qusba +1 212 455 3760
Space William Thomas Russell, Jr. +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 wrussell@stblaw.com
No Logo Shiva Ayyadurai, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Anthony M. Vassallo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony M Vassallo +1 917 862 1936 +1 866 334 9752
No Logo Gawker Media, Llc, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel H. Levitin +1 212 701 3770 +1 212 269 5420

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg Mattisen Galardi +1 212 335 4640 +1 212 884 8680 gregg.galardi@ropesgray.com
Space D. Ross Martin +1 617 951 7266 +1 617 951 7050 RMartin@ropesgray.com
No Logo Transcare Corporation, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynn P. Harrison, III +1 212 696 6028 +1 212 697 1559
1 MetroTech Center
Brooklyn, NY 11201
KINGS-NY
Tax ID / EIN: 75-2528381 Steven J. Reisman +1 212 696 6065 +1 212 697 1559

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
1 MetroTech Center
Brooklyn, NY 11201
KINGS-NY
Tax ID / EIN: 75-2528381 Alex Jared Chase +1 914 872 7150 alex.chase@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Irving H. Picard, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan R. Barr +1 202 861 1534 +1 202 861 1783 jbarr@bakerlaw.com
Space John J. Burke +1 202 861 1600 +1 202 861 1783 jburke@bakerlaw.com
Space Torello H. Calvani +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 tcalvani@bakerlaw.com
, Nicholas Cremona +1 212 589 4682 +1 212 459 4221
Space Brian K. Esser +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 besser@bakerlaw.com
Space Jessie Morgan Gabriel +1 614 228 1541 +1 614 462 2616 jgabriel@bakerlaw.com
, Thomas Leslie Long +1 614 228 1541 +1 212 589 4201 tlong@bakerlaw.com
Space John Moscow +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201
, Keith R. Murphy +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 kmurphy@bakerlaw.com
Space Irving H. Picard +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 ipicard@bakerlaw.com
Space Geraldine E. Ponto +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4221 gponto@bakerlaw.com
Space Jorian L. Rose +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201
Space Elizabeth Anne Scully +1 202 861 1698 +1 202 861 1783 escully@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, DAVID J. SHEEHAN +1 212 589 4616 +1 212 589 4201 dsheehan@bakerlaw.com
Space Jennifer M. Walrath +1 202 861 1500 +1 202 861 1783 jwalrath@bakerlaw.com
, Ona T. Wang +1 212 589 4254 +1 212 589 4201 owang@bakerlaw.com
Space Catherine Elizabeth Woltering +1 614 462 2677 +1 614 462 2616 cwoltering@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hornbrook, Lynn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bik Cheema +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lalit K Jain Esq

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Lalit K Jain +1 718 255 6576 +1 347 637 5498

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, JD Mc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Resnick +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201

Toggle Switch Represented by Strawser, Richard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Oren Warshavsky +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201

Toggle Switch Represented by TUGGLE DUGGINS & MESCHAN PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Seanna Brown +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201

Toggle Switch Represented by Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, Howard L. Simon +1 212 237 1000 +1 212 262 1215 hsimon@windelsmarx.com
No Logo Salvatore LaMonica, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacqulyn S. Loftin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
3305 Jerusalem Avenue
Wantagh, NY 11793
(516) 826-6500 Jacqulyn S. Loftin +1 516 826 6500 +1 516 826 0222

Toggle Switch Represented by LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
3305 Jerusalem Avenue
Wantagh, NY 11793
(516) 826-6500 Gary Frederick Herbst +1 516 826 6500 +1 516 826 0222

Toggle Switch Represented by LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
3305 Jerusalem Avenue
Wantagh, NY 11793
(516) 826-6500 Holly R Holecek +1 516 826 6500 +1 516 826 0222 hrh@lhmlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Payton, Charles S.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
3305 Jerusalem Avenue
Wantagh, NY 11793
(516) 826-6500 Avery Samet +1 212 490 4100 +1 212 490 4208

Toggle Switch Represented by Storch Amini & Munves, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP
3305 Jerusalem Avenue
Wantagh, NY 11793
(516) 826-6500 Jaime Burton Leggett +1 212 497 8220 +1 212 490 4208
No Logo Kenneth M. Krys and Charlotte Caulfield as Joint Liquidators and Foreign Representatives of Fairfield Sentry Limited, Fairfield Sigma Limited, and Fairfield Lambda Limited, Liquidator

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth A. Molino +1 212 209 4800
No Logo Lucy L. Thomson, Patient Care Ombudsman
No Logo Prime Clerk Llc, Claims and Noticing Agent

Toggle Switch Represented by Prime Clerk Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam M. Adler +1 212 257 5465
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the United States Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Office of the United States Trustee
U.S. Federal Office Building
201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
(212) 510-0500 Greg Michael Zipes +1 212 510 0500

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Office of the United States Trustee
U.S. Federal Office Building
201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
(212) 510-0500 Andrea B. Schwartz +1 212 510 0500 +1 212 668 2255 andrea.b.schwartz@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit SS SIPA Case - 15 U.S.C. 78aaa et.seq.
  Entries (685) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18052 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Notice of Presentment of Proposed Order Granting Supplemental Authority to Stipulate to Extensions of Time to Respond and Adjourn Pre-Trial Conferences filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard. Objections due by 10/15/2018, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order)(Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18043 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Order Signed On 9/28/2018 Re: Setting Trial . (10-4390) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18001 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Motion to Approve /Motion to Correct Record on Appeal in Profit Withdrawal Matter filed by Seanna Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18000 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Declaration of Seanna R. Brown in Support of Trustee's Motion by Order to Show Cause to Correct Record on Appeal in Profit Withdrawal Matter (related document(s)17999) filed by Seanna Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17999 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice of Motion to Set Hearing /Notice of Trustee's Application for an Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9077-1(a) filed by Seanna Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17998 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Notice of Motion to Set Hearing /Notice of Trustee's Application for an Order to Show Cause Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9077-1(a) filed by Seanna Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Brown, Seanna) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17997 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference (Adv. Pro. No. 12-01576) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 1/30/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17996 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Strike the Notices of Withdrawal of Claim and Notices of Withdrawal of Objection to Determination of Claim filed by Chaitman LLP and Dentons US LLP (related document(s)17995) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17995 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Reply to Motion / Trustee's Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Strike the Notices of Withdrawal of Claim and Notices of Withdrawal of Objection to Determination of Claim filed by Chaitman LLP and Dentons US LLP (related document(s)17864) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17994 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for an Order Authorizing the Deposition of Federal Prisoner Annette Bongiorno (Adv. Pro. No. 10-05383) (related document(s)17993) filed by Torello H. Calvani on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Calvani, Torello) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17993 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Motion to Authorize /Notice of Motion for an Order Authorizing the Deposition of Federal Prisoner Annette Bongiorno (Adv. Pro. No. 10-05383) filed by Torello H. Calvani on behalf of Irving H. Picard with hearing to be held on 10/31/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/24/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Calvani, Torello) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17992 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pretrial Conference (Adv. No. 10-04468) filed by Matthew B. Lunn on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. with hearing to be held on 1/30/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17991 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Reply to Motion Reply Memorandum of Law of The Securities Investor Protection Corporation in Support of Trustee's Motion to Strike the Notices of Withdrawal of Claim and Notices of Withdrawal of Objection to Determination of Claim Filed by Chaitman LLP and Dentons US LLP (related document(s)17864) filed by Nathanael Kelley on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Kelley, Nathanael) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17975 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pretrial Conference to December 19, 2018 at 10:00 am (10-05168) filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17974 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pretrial Conference to December 19, 2018 at 10:00 am (10-05118) filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17973 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pretrial Conference to December 19, 2018 at 10:00 am (10-04348) filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17972 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pretrial Conference to December 19, 2018 at 10:00 am (10-04343) filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17971 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pretrial Conference to December 19, 2018 at 10:00 am (10-04341) filed by Nicholas Cremona on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Cremona, Nicholas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17970 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Order Signed On 9/12/2018. Re: Fifth Amendment To Case Management Plan (10-5383) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17969 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference (Adv. Pro. No. 12-01703) filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17968 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference (Adv. Pro. No. 12-01702) filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17967 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference (Adv. Pro. No. 12-01701) filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17966 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Pre-Trial Conference (Adv. Pro. No. 09-01239) filed by Thomas L. Long on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 12/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Long, Thomas) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17790 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to August 29, 2018 at 10:00 am (10-05390) filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17789 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Statement \Sixth Amended Case Management Notice (10-05384) filed by Elyssa Suzanne Kates on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Kates, Elyssa) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17788 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Letter / Email Dated 7/16/2018 Re: Madoff Cooperation Letter - Picard & Sheehan To Disclose Offshore Banks For Treasury Trades/FBI Agent Keith Kelly Filed by Dean Loren. (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17787 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      So Ordered Stipulation And Order Between The Plaintiff And Defendant Signed On 7/16/2018 Re: Dismissing This Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice, (Related Adversary Proceeding Case #10-05024(SMB), ECF Doc.#47). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17785 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Notice of Hearing / Notice Of Hearing On Applications For Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred By Applicants From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 (related document(s)17781, 17770, 17784, 17764, 17778, 17777, 17779, 17776, 17782, 17768, 17763, 17783, 17765, 17773, 17767, 17769, 17771, 17774, 17772, 17775, 17766, 17780) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 8/22/2018, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17784 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Werder Vigano As Special Counsel To The Trustee For A Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held For The Prior Compensation Periods for Werder Vigano, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$0.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Werder Vigano with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17783 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Kugler Kandestin, Llp As Special Counsel To The Trustee For A Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held For The Prior Compensation Periods for Kugler Kandestin, L.L.P., Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$0.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Kugler Kandestin, L.L.P. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17782 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Kelley, Wolter & Scott, Professional Association As Special Counsel To The Trustee For A Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held For The Prior Compensation Periods for Kelley Wolter & Scott, P.A, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$0.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Kelley Wolter & Scott, P.A with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17781 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Cochran Allan As Special Counsel To The Trustee For A Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held For The Prior Compensation Periods for Cochran Allan, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$0.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Cochran Allan with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17780 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Munari Giudici Maniglio Panfili e Associati As Special Counsel To The Trustee For A Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held For The Prior Compensation Periods for Munari Giudici Maniglio Panfili E Associati, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$0.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Munari Giudici Maniglio Panfili E Associati with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17779 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Bedell Cristin Guernsey Partnership As Special Counsel To The Trustee For A Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held For The Prior Compensation Periods for Bedell Cristin Guernsey Partnership, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$0.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Bedell Cristin Guernsey Partnership with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17778 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of La Tanzi, Spaulding & Landreth, PC As Special Counsel To The Trustee For A Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held For The Prior Compensation Periods for La Tanzi, Spaulding & Landreth, P.C., Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$0.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by La Tanzi, Spaulding & Landreth, P.C. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17777 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of The Scaletta Law Firm, PLLC As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Scaletta Law Firm, PLLC, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$20867.85, expenses: $0.00. filed by Scaletta Law Firm, PLLC with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17776 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber Llp As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$120415.50, expenses: $2456.35. filed by Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17775 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Ritter Schierscher Rechtsanwalte As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Ritter Schierscher Rechtsanwalte, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$867.45, expenses: $0.00. filed by Ritter Schierscher Rechtsanwalte with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17774 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Eugene F. Collins As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Eugene F. Collins, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$2855.20, expenses: $0.00. filed by Eugene F. Collins with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17773 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Browne Jacobson, LLP As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Browne Jacobson, LLP, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$879457.67, expenses: $8121.33. filed by Browne Jacobson, LLP with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17772 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of UGGC & Associes As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for UGGC & Associes, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$46670.97, expenses: $4120.92. filed by UGGC & Associes with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17771 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Williams, Barristers & Attorneys As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Williams, Barristers & Attorneys, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$315336.52, expenses: $0.00. filed by Williams, Barristers & Attorneys with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17770 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Previously Held Back for Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$39315.92, expenses: $1071.20. filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17769 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of SCA Creque As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for SCA Creque, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$6271.38, expenses: $0.00. filed by SCA Creque with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17768 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Graf & Pitkowitz Rechtsnwalte Gmbh As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Graf & Pitkowitz Rechtsanwalte GmbH, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$63063.60, expenses: $1568.45. filed by Graf & Pitkowitz Rechtsanwalte GmbH with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17767 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Soroker Agmon Nordman As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Soroker Agmon Nordman, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$506729.40, expenses: $5872.77. filed by Soroker Agmon Nordman with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17766 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Twenty-Sixth Application of Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 and Request for Partial Release of Holdback for Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$1,590,899.58, expenses: $27,593.98. filed by Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) (Simon, Howard) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17765 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Higgs & Johnson (Formerly Higgs Johnson Truman Bodden & Co) As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Higgs & Johnson, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$8958.68, expenses: $235.14. filed by Higgs & Johnson with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17764 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application Of Schiltz & Schiltz As Special Counsel To The Trustee For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 And For Release Of A Portion Of Fees Held Back for Schiltz & Schiltz, Special Counsel, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$42044.21, expenses: $2732.87. filed by Schiltz & Schiltz with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17763 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Twenty-Seventh Application Of Trustee And Baker & Hostetler LLP For Allowance Of Interim Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred From December 1, 2017 Through March 31, 2018 for Baker & Hostetler, L.L.P., Trustee's Attorney, period: 12/1/2017 to 3/31/2018, fee:$33507486.00, expenses: $400202.04. filed by Baker & Hostetler, L.L.P. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 8/22/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14576 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance filed by Philip W. Allogramento III on behalf of Delaware Life Insurance Company. (Allogramento, Philip) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5493 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Order Signed On 7/16/2018 Granting Re: Motion Extending Time To October 17, 2018 In Each Adversary Proceeding Case Listed In Exhibit 1 Attached Hereto For Service Of Process Pursuant To Rule 7004(a) And 9006(b)(1) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure And Rule 4(m) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedures In Certain Adversary Proceedings,(Related Doc.#5424). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5492 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          So Ordered Stipulation Between The Debtors And Daniel M. Berger Signed On 7/13/2018 Re: Resolving Claim No. 6334, (related document(s)3735, 3319, 4344, 2672, 2671, 3314, 4495). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Agenda for Hearing to be Held July 17, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Prevailing Eastern Time) (related document(s)1148) Filed by Adam M. Adler on behalf of Prime Clerk LLC. (Adler, Adam) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/20/18 at 10:02 AM RE: Motion for Entry of Bidding Procedures Order. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/9/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/18/2018. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/13/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/9/2018. (Cales, Humberto) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Statement / Notice of (I) Successful Bidder and Back-Up Bidder, (II) Filing of Transcript of Auction Held on July 12, 2018 and (III) Revised Sale Order filed by Gregg M. Galardi on behalf of Plan Administrator for the Debtors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit 1 # 3 Exhibit 2 # 4 Exhibit 3 # 5 Exhibit 4 # 6 Exhibit 5 # 7 Exhibit 6 # 8 Exhibit 7 # 9 Exhibit B # 10 Exhibit C) (Galardi, Gregg) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 698 Filed: 3/18/2021, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 690 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 622 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 620 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 619 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 618 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 617 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 616 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Endorsed Order
                                                                                                                                Memorandum Endorsed Order Signed On 7/16/2018 Granting Re: The Request For Transcendence's Reply Be Extended Until Wednesday July 25th, And That The Hearing Scheduled For July 19th Be Adjourned, With A Rescheduled Date Determined Next Week After The Parties Have Conferred On Availability. Transcendence Will File A Notice Of Adjournment Next Week Prior To The Hearing, (related document(s)606). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 615 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 614 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 612 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 611 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 610 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 609 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 07/25/18 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 608 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                So Ordered Stipulation And Order Between The Trustee And New York State Workers' Compensation Board Signed On 6/26/2018 Re: Extending The Time To And Including September 10, 2018 For New York State Workers' Compensation Board To File Proof(s) Of Claim In Some Or All Of The Debtors' Estates. (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Alias Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Extending the Time for the New York State Workers' Compensation Board to File Proof(s) of Claim in Some or All of the Debtors' Estates filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 606 Filed: 6/14/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Luma Al-Shibib on behalf of Transcendence Transit, Inc. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511) Responses due by 7/12/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay # 2 Proposed Order) (Al-Shibib, Luma) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 605 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 06/20/18 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation And Order Between The Trustee And GSHS Signed On 5/21/2018 Re: Tolling The Statute Of Limitations, (related document(s)603). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Tolling the Statute of Limitations filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Order signed on 5/17/2018 Granting First Application for Allowance of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Storch Amini PC. (Related Doc # 589)for Storch Amini PC, fees awarded: $100,000.00, expense awarded: $21,049.15. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                              Letter Re: Change of Address Filed by BDO USA, LLP. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Certificate of No Objection for First Application for Allowance of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Storch Amini PC (related document(s)589) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Storch Amini PC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 599 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation And Order Between The Trustee And Hospitals Insurance Company, Inc., Signed On 5/10/2018 Granting Re: Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Hospitals Insurance Company, Inc. In Re: Noemi La Santa V. Montefiore Center, Et Al. (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 598 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as it Applies to Montefiore Medical Center et al. filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 05/23/18 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 596 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation And Order Between The Trustee And New York State Workers' Compensation Board Signed On 5/7/2018 Re: Extending The Time To July 9, 2018 For The New York State Workers' Compensation Board To File Proof(s) Of Claim In Some Or All Of The Debtors' Estates. (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Extending the Time for the New York State Workers' Compensation Board to File Proof(s) of Claim in Some or All of the Debtors' Estates filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            So-Ordered Stipulation Signed on 5/2/2018 Between Attorneys for Trustee and Attorneys for Jagdeh Thakur Dial Re: Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as it Applies to Jagdeh Thakur Dial. (related document(s)593) (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 593 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as it Applies to Jagdeh Thakur Dial filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 592 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service (related document(s)589) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Signed On 4/18/2018 Granting Re: Limiting Notice Of The Hearing To Consider The First Interim Fee Application For Allowance Of Compensation Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel For Salvatore Lamonica, The Chapter 7 Trustee, (related document(s)589, 590); With A Hearing To Be Held On 5/17/2018 At 10:00 AM In Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Motion to Limit Notice Ex Parte Motion of Storch Amini PC for an Order Limiting Notice of the Hearing to Consider the First Interim Fee Application for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel for Salvatore LaMonica, the Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s)589) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Storch Amini PC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      First Application for Interim Professional Compensation First Interim Application of Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel for Salvatore LaMonica, the Chapter 7 Trustee, for Allowance of Full Permitted Amount for Hourly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel, period: 6/5/2017 to 2/19/2018, fee:$100,000.00, expenses: $23,225.84. filed by Storch Amini PC with hearing to be held on 5/17/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/10/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Employment Order # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Applicant's Time Records # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C: Applicant's List of Expenses # 4 Certification of Avery Samet, Esq. # 5 Notice of Hearing) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 04/25/18 at 12:30 PM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal of (1) Ex Parte Motion of Storch Amini PC for an Order Limiting Notice of the Hearing to Consider the First Interim Fee Application for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel for Salvatore LaMonica, the Chapter 7 Trustee [Dkt. No. 586]; and (2) First Interim Application of Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel for Salvatore LaMonica, the Chapter 7 Trustee, for Allowance of Full Permitted Amount for Hourly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period June 5, 2017 Through February 19, 2018 [Dkt. No. 595] (related document(s)585, 586) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Storch Amini PC. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            (ENTERED IN ERROR) Ex Parte Motion to Limit Notice Ex Parte Motion of Storch Amini PC for an Order Limiting Notice of the Hearing to Consider the First Interim Fee Application for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel for Salvatore LaMonica, the Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s)585) filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Storch Amini PC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Samet, Avery) Modified on 3/30/2018 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              (ENTERED IN ERROR) First Application for Interim Professional Compensation First Interim Application of Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel for Salvatore LaMonica, the Chapter 7 Trustee, for Allowance of Full Permitted Amount for Hourly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Storch Amini PC, Special Counsel, period: 6/5/2017 to 2/19/2018, fee:$100000.00, expenses: $23225.84. filed by Avery Samet with hearing to be held on 4/24/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/17/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbiit A: Employment Order # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Applicant's Time Records # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C: Applicant's List of Expenses # 4 Certification of Avery Samet, Esq. # 5 Notice of Hearing) (Samet, Avery) Modified on 3/30/2018 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 03/21/18 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation And Order Between The Trustee And Salvador Rivera Signed On 3/13/2018 Granting Re: Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Salvador Rivera, (related document(s)582, 581). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay As It Applies to Salvador Rivera filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Raymond J Suris on behalf of Salvador Rivera with hearing to be held on 4/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511) Responses due by 4/2/2018,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Motion Seeking an Order Vacate Stay # 2 Exhibit Police Report # 3 Exhibit Carrier Letter # 4 Exhibit Plaintiff Summons & Complaint # 5 Exhibit Verified Answer # 6 Exhibit Correspondance from Defendant's counsel # 7 Exhibit Proposed Order # 8 Exhibit Affidavit of Service) (Suris, Raymond) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation Between The Trustee, The Initial Debtors And The Subsequent Debtors Signed On 3/9/2018 Granting Re: Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Piedad Angamarca As Mother And Natural Guardian Of J.G. And Piedad Angamarca Individually, (related document(s)579). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay As It Applies to PIEDAD ANGAMARCA as Mother and Natural Guardian of J. G. and PIEDAD ANGAMARCA Individually filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            So Ordered Stipulation Between Salvatore LaMonica, As Chapter 7 Trustee And New York State Workers' Compensation Board Signed On 3/5/2018 Re: Extending The Time For The New York State Workers' Compensation Board To File Proof(s) Of Claim In Some Or All Of The Debtors' Estates, (related document(s)577; WCB Shall Have Until And Including 5/9/2018 To File its Proof(s) Of Claim. (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Proposed Order and Order by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee and New York State Workers Compensation Board Extending the Time to file a Proof(s) of Claim against Some or All of the Debtors estates until May 9, 2018 filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/23/2018. Re: Tolling The Statute Of Limitations (related document(s)572) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary case 18-01022. Complaint against Milea Associates I, LLC, Milea Associates II, LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.) (Receipt Number DEFERRED.). Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Jacqulyn Loftin, Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica, Chapter 7 Trustee of the Jointly Administered Estates of TransCare Corporation, et al.. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 02/28/18 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Adversary case 18-01021. Complaint against Lynn Tilton, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Limited, ARK Investment Partners II, L.P., LD Investments, LLC, Patriarch Partners II, LLC, Patriarch Partners III, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Transcendence Transit, Inc., Transcendence Transit II, Inc. Complaint of Salvatore LaMonica, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Jointly-Administered Estates of TransCare Corporation, et al. against Lynn Tilton, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Patriarch Partners Management Group, LLC, Ark II CLO 2001-1, Limited, Ark Investment Partners II, L.P., LD Investments, LLC, Patriarch Partners II, LLC, Patriarch Partners III, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Transcendence Transit, Inc., and Transcendence Transit II, Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (81 (Subordination of claim or interest)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Steven G. Storch on behalf of SALVATORE LAMONICA. (Storch, Steven) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Proposed Order /Stipulation and Order Tolling the Statute of Limitations filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Signed On 2/22/2018 Re: Granting Trustees Ex Parte Motion For Authority To File Complaint Under Seal(Related Doc # 566). (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Adversary case 18-01020. Complaint against Ever Dixie USA EMS Supply Co. (Fee Amount $ 350.) (Receipt Number DEFERRED.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of SALVATORE LAMONICA. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Adversary case 18-01019. Complaint against Signature Bank (Fee Amount $ 350.) (Receipt Number DEFERRED.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of SALVATORE LAMONICA. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Adversary case 18-01018. Complaint against Santander Bank, N.A. f/k/a Soverign Bank (Fee Amount $ 350.) (Receipt Number DEFERRED.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of SALVATORE LAMONICA. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Adversary case 18-01017. Complaint against ACE ENTERPRISES & SALE CORPORATION (Fee Amount $ 350.) (Receipt Number DEFERRED.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of SALVATORE LAMONICA. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Motion to file under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal TRUSTEE'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 107(b) AND BANKRUPTCY RULE 9018 AUTHORIZING THE FILING OF CERTAIN INFORMATION UNDER SEAL WITHIN THE TRUSTEES COMPLAINT AGAINST LYNN TILTON, PATRIARCH PARTNERS AGENCY SERVICES, LLC, PATRIARCH PARTNERS, LLC, PATRIARCH PARTNERS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC, ARK II CLO 2001-1, LIMITED, ARK INVESTMENT PARTNERS II, L.P., LD INVESTMENTS, LLC, PATRIARCH PARTNERS II, LLC, PATRIARCH PARTNERS III, LLC, PATRIARCH PARTNERS VIII, LLC, PATRIARCH PARTNERS XIV, LLC, PATRIARCH PARTNERS XV, LLC, TRANSCENDENCE TRANSIT, INC., AND TRANSCENDENCE TRANSIT II, INC. filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Stipulated Confidentiality Order # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Redacted Complaint # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Unredacted Complaint (Filed Under Seal) # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Proposed Order) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Filed by Meryl Sanders Viener, Esq.. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/2/2018. Re: Extending The Time For The New York State Workers Compensation Board To File Proof(S) Of Claim In Some Or All Of The Debtors Estates (related document(s)556) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and STipulation Extending Time for the New York State Workers Compensation Board to File Proof(s) of Claim in Some or All of the Debtors' Estates until March 9, 2018 filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/24/2018. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Raymond Velez (related document(s)561) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 561 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay As It Applies to Raymond Velez filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 560 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 01/24/18 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 559 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/8/2018. Re: Extending The Time For The New York State Workers Compensation Board To File Proof(S) Of Claim In Some Or All Of The Debtors Estates (related document(s)556) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/8/2018. Re: Extending The Time For The Trustee, On Behalf Of Each Or All The Debtors To File Proof(S) Of Claim In Each Or All The Other Debtor Estates (related document(s)555) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Letter to Judge Bernstein Seeking Conference Regarding Discovery Dispute with Patriarch Partners, LLC Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 556 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Proposed Order and STipulation Extending Time for the New York State Workers Compensation Board to File Proof(s) of Claim in Some or All of the Debtors' Estates until February 10, 2018 filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 555 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Extending the Time for the Trustee, on behalf of Each or All of the Debtors to File Proof(s) of Claim in Each or All of the Other Debtor Estates filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Signed On 1/2/2018 Re: Granting Trustees Ex Parte Motion Pursuant To Rule 2004 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure For An Order Directing The Examination Of, And Production And Turnover Of Documents By, Albion Investors Llc (Related Doc # 553) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Trustee's Ex Parte Motion Pursuant to FRBP 2004 for an Order Directing the Examination of, and Production of Documents by, Albion Investors LLC filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/21/2017. Re: Tolling The Statute Of Limitations (related document(s)551) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Proposed Order /Amended Stipulation and Order Tolling the Statute of Limitations filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/20/2017. Re: Tolling The Statute Of Limitations (related document(s)549) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Presentment of the Stipulation and Order Tolling the Statute of Limitations filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/18/2017. Re: Order Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Rogelio Lopez (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 12/20/17 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation (Amended) Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay As It Applies to Rogelio Lopez filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 12/5/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/5/2017. Re: Protective Order Governing Non-Disclosure Of Confidential Information (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Signed On 11/28/2017 Re: Enforcing The Automatic Stay Against The Action Pending In The New York Court Of Claims(Related Doc # 498) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Judge Bernstein Seeking Conference Regarding Discovery Dispute (related document(s)540) Filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Latest Proposed Version of Confidentiality Stipulation Showing Disputed Language)(Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/14/2017 10:01 AM RE: Motion To Stay Nys Court Of Claims Action.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/15/2018. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Reliable.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/27/2017. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 12/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/18/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/15/2018. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Judge Bernstein in Response to Letter from Chapter 7 Trustee to His Honor dated November 15, 2017 (related document(s)540) Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners VIII, LLC, Patriarch Partners XIV, LLC, Patriarch Partners XV, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Stipulation of Confidentiality # 2 Exhibit B-Stipulative Protective Order)(Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Judge Bernstein Seeking Conference Regarding Discovery Dispute Filed by Bijan Amini on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Patriarch Entities' Proposed Confidentiality Agreement # 2 Enclosure 2 - Trustee's Redlined Version of Patriarch Entities' Propsed Confidentiality Agreement)(Amini, Bijan) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 11/15/17 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            So Ordered Stipulation Agreed To By The Trustee and Patriarch Signed On 11/7/2017. (related document(s)510) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Signed On 11/3/2017 Re: Granting Trustees Ex Parte Motion Pursuant To Rule 2004 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure And Section 542(E) Of The Bankruptcy Code For An Order Directing The Examination Of, And Production And Turnover Of Documents By, Patriarch Partners, LLCs Former Managing Director Jean Luc Pelissier (Related Doc # 536) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Order Granting Trustee's Ex Parte Motion Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy PRocedure and Section 542(e) of the Bankruptcy Code for an Order Directing the Examination of, and Production and Turnover of Documents by, Patriarch Partners, LLC's Former Managing Director Jean Luc Pelissier filed by Jaime B. Leggett on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Leggett, Jaime) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 11/1/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Jose Cadiz (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as it Applies to Jose Cadiz filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/25/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Maria Rodriguez (related document(s)532) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as it Applies to Maria Rodriguez filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service of Limited Objection to Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Section 542(e) of the Bankruptcy Code for an Order Directing the Examination of, and Production and Turnover of Documents by, Entities and Persons Related to Patriarch Partners, LLC (related document(s)528) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, Patriarch Partners, LLC, Lynn Tilton. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service of Reply Affirmation (Docket No. 529) Filed by John Kiba on behalf of State Insurance Fund. (Kiba, John) (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply to Motion ; NYSIF Reply Affirmation Re: Transcendence Transit, Inc.'s Opposition (related document(s)498, 523) filed by John Kiba on behalf of State Insurance Fund. (Kiba, John). (Related Documents Modified on 10/20/2017) (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 10/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Objection to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Motion /Limited Objection to Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Section 542(e) of the Bankruptcy Code for an Order Directing the Examination of, and Production and Turnover of Documents by, Entities and Persons Related to Patriarch Partners, LLC (related document(s)510, 471) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Patriarch Partners, LLC, Lynn Tilton, Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 10/25/17 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service Filed by Luma Al-Shibib on behalf of Transcendence Transit, Inc.. (Al-Shibib, Luma) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/18/2017. Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Natalie Zedner (related document(s)519) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (Incorrect PDF File Submitted. See Document #526 For The Correct Entry) Certificate of Service Filed by Luma Al-Shibib on behalf of Transcendence Transit, Inc.. (Al-Shibib, Luma) Modified on 10/19/2017 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Nicholas Maxwell in Opposition to NY State Insurance Fund's Motion Seeking Injunctive Relief and Enforcing the Automatic Stay (related document(s)498) filed by Luma Al-Shibib on behalf of Transcendence Transit, Inc.. Reply due by 10/20/2017, (Al-Shibib, Luma) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Brian Stephen in Opposition to NY State Insurance Fund's Motion Seeking Injunctive Relief and Enforcing the Automatic Stay (related document(s)498) filed by Luma Al-Shibib on behalf of Transcendence Transit, Inc.. Reply due by 10/20/2017, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C) (Al-Shibib, Luma) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition to NY State Insurance Fund's Motion Seeking Injunctive Relief and Enforcing the Automatic Stay (related document(s)498) filed by Luma Al-Shibib on behalf of Transcendence Transit, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/17/2017, Reply due by 10/20/2017, (Al-Shibib, Luma) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Withdrawal Motion for an Order Compelling the Chapter 7 Trustee to Sign the Consent to Change Attorney Document in State Court Action (related document(s)508) filed by Alex J. Chase on behalf of Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP, as proposed incoming counsel to TransCare Corp. in the action commenced by Mata Auguste in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Index No. 13248/15. (Chase, Alex) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as it Applies to Natalie Zedner filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of the Chapter 7 Trustee's Response to the Motion Seeking Injunctive Relief and Enforcing the Automatic Stay Filed by the New York State Insurance Fund [ECF Dkt. No. 517] (related document(s)517) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Motion Seeking Injunctive Relief and Enforcing the Automatic Stay Filed by the New York State Insurance Fund (related document(s)498) filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 10/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter of change of address Filed by Mark Breter. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/11/2017. Re: Extending The Time For The Trustee, On Behalf Of Each Or All The Debtors To File Proof(S) Of Claim In Each Or All The Other Debtor Estates (related document(s)514) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Extending the Time for the Trustee, on behalf of Each or All the Debtors, to File Proof(s) of Claim in Each or All the Other Debtor Estates filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 10/10/2017. Re: Order Extending The Time For The New York State Workers Compensation Board To File Proof(S) Of Claim In Some Or All Of The Debtors Estates (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Extending the Time for the New York State Workers' Compensation Board to File Proof(s) of Claim in Some or All of the Debtors' Estates filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2004, Exhibit A: Proposed Order, Notice of Presentment (related document(s)510) Filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2004 and Bankruptcy Code Section 542(e) For an Order Directing the Examination of, and Production and Turnover of Documents by, Persons and Entities Related to Patriarch Partners, LLC filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 10/19/2017 at 05:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/16/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Order Granting Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2004 # 2 Notice of Presentment of Order Granting Trustee's Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2004) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service (related document(s)507, 508) filed by Alex J. Chase on behalf of TransCare Corporation. (Chase, Alex) (Entered: 09/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Compel the Chapter 7 Trustee to Sign the Consent to Change Attorney Document in State Court Action (related document(s)507) filed by Alex J. Chase on behalf of Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP, as proposed incoming counsel to TransCare Corp. in the action commenced by Mata Auguste in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Index No. 13248/15 with hearing to be held on 10/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 10/17/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Proposed Order) (Chase, Alex) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing on Motion for an Order Compelling the Chapter 7 Trustee to Sign the Consent to Change Attorney Document in State Court Action filed by Alex J. Chase on behalf of Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP, as proposed incoming counsel to TransCare Corp. in the action commenced by Mata Auguste in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, Index No. 13248/15. with hearing to be held on 10/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 10/17/2017, (Chase, Alex) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Adjournment of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding First Monthly Fee Statement of Kirkland & Ellis LLP and Kirkland & Ellis International LLP for Compensation for Services and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from April 6, 2018 through April 30, 2018 and Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion Seeking Entry of an Order (A) Extending the Time to File Notices of Removal of Civil Actions and (B) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)499, 498) filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service of Tracy Southwell (related document(s)502) Filed by Daniel H. Golden on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Nine West Holdings, Inc., et al.. (Golden, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Service of Jennifer L. Woodson (related document(s)355) filed by Daniel H. Golden on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Nine West Holdings, Inc., et al.. (Golden, Daniel) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Nuno Cardoso Regarding Notice of Amendment to List of Ordinary Course Professionals and Declarations of Disinterestedness of Elzaburu, S.L.P., Etti & Edu, Kim & Chang, Law Office of George C.J. Moore, P.A., Olivares Y Compania, S.C., Tilleke & Gibbins International Co., Ltd., Walkers and Lee and Li Pursuant to the Order Authorizing Nine West Holdings, Inc., et al., for the Retention and Compensation of Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business (related document(s)487, 485, 483, 490, 491, 489, 486, 488, 484) filed by Prime Clerk LLC.(Steele, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Adjournment of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on NYSIF's Motion to Enjoin Claim of Transcendence Transit, Inc. in the NYS Court of Claims, and Staying that Matter (related document(s)498) filed by John Kiba on behalf of State Insurance Fund. with hearing to be held on 10/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Kiba, John) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 08/23/17 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation Between Salvatore LaMonica, As Chapter 7 Trustee And Rogelio Lopez Signed On 8/17/2017 Granting Re: Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Rogelio Lopez, (related document(s)497). (Mercado, Tracey) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service by Attorney Affirmation (related document(s)498) Filed by John Kiba on behalf of State Insurance Fund. (Kiba, John) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Stay NYS Court of Claims Action filed by John Kiba on behalf of State Insurance Fund with hearing to be held on 9/12/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, 2) (Kiba, John) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Rogelio Lopez filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Re:Change of Address Filed by John Lameras. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Signed On 7/28/2017 Re: Approving Employment Of Storch Amini PC As Special Counsel For The Chapter 7 Trustee Nunc Pro Tunc To JUNE 5, 2017 (Related Doc # 494) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Application to Employ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Employ Storch Amini PC as Special Counsel for the Chapter 7 Trustee filed by Avery Samet on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Bijan Amini, Esq. in Support of Application # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order) (Samet, Avery) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 7/24/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Geisha Rayner And Chayse Rayner (related document(s)491) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit disclosing increase in hourly rates effective August 1, 2017 Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of CBIZ ACCOUNTING, TAX AND ADVISORY OF NEW YORK, LLC. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Geisha Rayner and Chayse Rayner filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter of change of address Filed by Vaughn Robbins. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 07/27/17 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Possible Dividend
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Possible Dividends (related document(s) (Related Doc # 487)) . Notice Date 07/07/2017. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Possible Dividends
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Possible Dividends. Proofs of claim due by 10/10/2017. (adi) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Trustee's Request for Clerk's Entry of Notice of Possible Dividends (Chapter 7 Cases)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Trustee's Request for Clerk's Entry of Notice of Possible Dividends Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion for Relief from Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      So Ordered Stipulation And Order Signed On 6/28/2017 Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Yolanda Houston (Related Doc # 445) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Yolanda Houston filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 06/21/17 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Designate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Signed On 6/12/2017 Re: (I) Pursuant To Rule 9001(5) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure, Designating Lynn Tilton As The Person Responsible To Perform The Obligations Of The Debtors Under The Bankruptcy Code; (II) Directing Peter Wolf, As Signatory Of The Initial Debtors Petitions, To Appear At The Meeting Of Creditors To Authentic The Initial Debtors Petitions; And (III) Directing Renee Dudley, As Signatory Of The Initial Debtors Petitions, To Appear At The Meeting Of Creditors To Authentic The Subsequent Debtors Petitions(Related Doc # 471) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Allow
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Signed On 6/6/2017 Re: Authorizing The Chapter 7 Trustee To Enter Into The Migration, Hosting & Storage Agreement With Datainstream, LLC And To Pay The Related Costs And Fees Under The Service Agreement(Related Doc # 476) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Objection to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection to Motion / Limited Objection to Chapter 7 Trustee's Application for the Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 9001(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Designating, Among Others, Lynn Tilton, in her Capacity as Director and Sole Member of the Debtors Board of Directors, as the Person Responsible to Perform the Obligations of the Debtors Under the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)471) filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 5/22/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Luz Wessin And Yolanda Rivera-Montalvo (related document(s)445) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 05/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Luz Wessin and Yolanda Rivera-Montalvo filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Order Authorizing the Chapter 7 Trustee to Enter into the Migration, Hosting & Storage Agreement with DataInStream, LLC and to Pay the Related Costs and Fees under the Service Agreement with Application Seeking the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Chapter 7 Trustee to Enter Into the Migration, Hosting & Storage Agreement with DataInStream, LLC and to Pay the Related Costs and Fees under the Service Agreement with Exhibit and Proposed Order (related document(s)476) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Motion to Allow
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Allow/Authorize the Chapter 7 Trustee to Enter into the Migration, Hosting and Storage Agreement with DataInStream LLC and to Pay the Related Costs and Fees under the Service Agreement. With the Order to be Presented to the Court for Entry on Friday, June 2, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica Objections due by 5/26/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Motion # 2 Exhibit A-Service Agreement # 3 Pleading Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Operating Report for the period ending April 30, 2017 Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Operating Report for the period ending March 31, 2017. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 5/26/2017 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Motion to Designate Pursuant to Rule 9001(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure: (i) Peter Wolf, Signatory of the Initial Debtors Petitions, as the Person Responsible to Perform the Obligations of the Initial Debtors under the Bankruptcy Code; (ii) Renee Dudley, Signatory of the Subsequent Debtors Petitions, as the Person Responsible to Perform the Obligations of the Subsequent Debtors under the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Lynn Tilton, in her Capacity as Director and Sole Member of the Debtors Board of Directors, as the Person Responsible to Perform the Obligations of the Debtors under the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s)471) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Motion to Designate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Designate Pursuant to Rule 9001(5) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure: (i) Peter Wolf, Signatory of the Initial Debtors Petitions, as the Person Responsible to Perform the Obligations of the Initial Debtors under the Bankruptcy Code; (ii) Renee Dudley, Signatory of the Subsequent Debtors Petitions, as the Person Responsible to Perform the Obligations of the Subsequent Debtors under the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Lynn Tilton, in her Capacity as Director and Sole Member of the Debtors Board of Directors, as the Person Responsible to Perform the Obligations of the Debtors under the Bankruptcy Code filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with hearing to be held on 6/6/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 5/30/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Motion to Designate # 2 Pleading Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Order Signed On 5/8/2017 Re: Pursuant To Rule 2004 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing The Production Of DocumentsBy, And Directing The Examination Of, Wells Fargo Bank F/K/A Wachovia Bank (Related Doc # 446) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service (related document(s)467) Filed by Rachel Ehrlich Albanese on behalf of BDO USA, LLP. (Albanese, Rachel) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Signed On 5/4/2017 Re: Pursuant To Rule 2004 Of The Federal Rules OfBankruptcy Procedure, Directing The Production Of Documents By Bdo USA, LLP (Related Doc # 448) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Withdrawal of Reservation of Rights with Respect to the Application of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing the Production of Documents by BDO USA, LLP (related document(s)465) filed by Rachel Ehrlich Albanese on behalf of BDO USA, LLP. (Albanese, Rachel) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Presentment of the Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2004, Directing the Production of Documents by BDO USA, LLP (related document(s)448) filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with presentment to be held on 5/5/2017 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/28/2017, (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement / Reservation of Rights with Respect to Application of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing the Production of Documents by BDO USA, LLP (related document(s)448) filed by Rachel Ehrlich Albanese on behalf of BDO USA, LLP. (Albanese, Rachel) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 5/1/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From TheAutomatic Stay As It Applies To Tracy Whitfield (related document(s)461) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 5/1/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From TheAutomatic Stay As It Applies To Christina Rosario And Juan R. Andino, Jr. Related document(s)462) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as it Applies to Christina Rosario and Juan R. Andino, Jr. filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from Stay as it Applies to Tracy Whitfield filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 4/25/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Judy Craig As Adoptive Mother Of M.C. (related document(s)455) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Signed On 4/25/2017 Re: Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing The Production Of Documents From, And Directing The Examination Of, Mark Bonilla In His Capacity As The Debtors Chief Financial Officer(Related Doc # 432) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Signed On 4/25/2017 Re: Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing The Production Of Documents From, And Directing The Examination Of, Peter Wolf In His Capacity As The Debtors Chief Operating Officer(Related Doc # 433) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Signed On 4/25/2017 Re: Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing The Production Of Documents From, And Directing The Examination Of, Glenn Leland In His Capacity As The Debtors Chief Executive Officer(Related Doc # 436) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to notify parties of hearing date (related document(s)445) Filed by Jack A. Yankowitz on behalf of Luz Wessin. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Yankowitz, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Judy Craig as Adoptive Mother of M.C. filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 4/21/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Frank Vergeli And Dkowan Johnson (related document(s)215) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Notice of Withdrawal of the Chapter 7 Trustee's Application Seeking the Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents from, and the Examination of, the Debtors (related document(s)452) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal of the Chapter 7 Trustee's Application Seeking the Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents from, and the Examination of, the Debtors (related document(s)435) filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Frank Vergeli and Dkowan Johnson filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service (SUPPLEMENTAL) of Notice of Presentment of Application of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing the Production of Documents By BDO USA, LLP and Application of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing the Production of Documents By BDO USA, LLP with Exhibit (related document(s)448) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Application of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing the Production of Documents By BDO USA, LLP and Application of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing the Production of Documents By BDO USA, LLP with Exhibit (related document(s)448) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for FRBP 2004 Examination /Production of Documents by BDO USA LLP filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 5/5/2017 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/28/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Application of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing the Production of Documents By, and Directing the Examination Of, Wells Fargo Bank f/k/a Wachovia Bank (related document(s)446) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and the Production of Documents by Wells Fargo Bank f/k/a Wachovia Bank filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 5/5/2017 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/28/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Supplemental Application # 2 Exhibit A-Supplemental Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Jack A. Yankowitz on behalf of Yolanda Rivera-Montalvo, Luz Wessin with hearing to be held on 5/22/2017 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Affidavit of Service) (Yankowitz, Jack) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 4/14/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Monika And Grzegorz Jamrozek (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Monika and Grzegorz Jamrozek filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 4/26/2017 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Amended Notice of Presentment of Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, the Debtors and Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, the Debtors with Exhibit (related document(s)437, 435) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, Peter Wolf in His Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Operating Officer and Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, Peter Wolf in His Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Operating Officer with Exhibit (related document(s)433) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, Mark Bonilla in His Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Financial Officer and Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, Mark Bonilla in His Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Financial Officer with Exhibit (related document(s)432) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, Glenn Leland in His Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Executive Officer and Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, Glenn Leland in His Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Executive Officer with Exhibit (related document(s)436) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Notice of Presentment of Application Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004, Directing the Production of Documents From, and Directing the Examination Of, the Debtors (related document(s)435) filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with presentment to be held on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 4/17/2017, (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of, and the Production of Documents by, Glenn Leland in his Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Executive Officer filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/17/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Pleading A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of, and the Production of Documents by, the Debtors filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/17/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (This Entry Has Been Refiled. See Document #435 For The Correct Entry) Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of, and the Production of Documents by, the Debtors filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/17/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) Modified on 4/7/2017 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of, and the Production of Documents by, Peter Wolf in his Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Operating Officer filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/17/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of, and the Production of Documents by, Mark Bonilla in his Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Financial Officer filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/17/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (This Entry Has Been Refiled. See Document #436 For The Correct Entry) Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of, and the Production of Documents by, Glenn Leland in his Capacity as the Debtors' Chief Executive Officer filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 4/24/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 4/17/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) Modified on 4/7/2017 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Signed On 4/4/2017 Re: Authorizing The Chapter 7 Trustee To Allocate The Expenses Of The Public Auctions Between The Debtors Estates And Reimburse The Transcare Corporation Estate And For Related Relief (Related Doc # 426) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 4/4/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Jean A. Dorziere And Joy Langaigne (related document(s)427) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Signed On 4/4/2017 Re: Pursuant To Rule 9019 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure, Approving The Stipulation By And Between The Chapter 7 Trustee, On Behalf Of The Debtors Estates, And Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC Resolving The Motion Of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC To Compel The Turnover Of Proceeds From The Sale Of Certain Personal Property (Related Doc # 407) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Jean A. Dorziere and Joy Langaigne filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Motion to Authorize the Chapter 7 Trustee to Allocate the Expenses of the Public Auction Sales Between the Debtors' Estates and to Reimburse the TransCare Corporation Estate and for Related Relief filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order # 2 Schedule 1-Public Auction Expenses # 3 Schedule 2-CON Expenses) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/31/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Isha Toyen-Fuentes (related document(s)424) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from Stay as it Applies to Isha Toyen-Fuentes filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/29/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Silvio Boccio (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Silvio Boccio filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/28/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Barbara Copozzi (related document(s)402) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Barbara Copozzi filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/24/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Lashawnette Mitchell (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Lashawnette Mitchell filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Signed On 3/21/2017 Re: Further Extending Chapter 7 Trustees Authorization To Operate The Debtors Businesses And Pay Certain Operating Expenses Of These Estates (Related Doc # 414) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Adjourn hearing Filed by Robert Morici on behalf of Barbara Capozzi. with hearing to be held on 4/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Morici, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Operating Report /Monthly Operating Statement for the Period Ended February 28, 2017 Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Motion to Authorize
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Motion to Authorize /Further Extend the Chapter 7 Trustee's Authorization Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 721 filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 3/22/2017 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Application for Interim Professional Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order sign in 3/8/2017 Granting Applications for Allowance of the Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of the Chapter 7 Trustee and His Retained Professionals(Related Doc #379)for LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP, fees awarded: $623,769.20, expense awarded: $24,339.97, (Related Doc #380)for CBIZ Accounting Tax & Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ Accounting, Tax & Advisory of San Diego, LLC, fees awarded: $517,502.72, expense awarded: $27,300.36,(Related Doc #381)for Lucy L. Thomson, fees awarded: $23,056.00, expense awarded: $0.00, (Related Doc #382)for Garfunkel Wild, P.C., fees awarded: $38,290.40, expense awarded: $33.31.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 3/7/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Marina Guzman (related document(s)408, 410) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Marina Guzman filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing on the Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking the Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019(a), Approving the Stipulation By and Between the Chapter 7 Trustee, on Behalf of the Debtors' Estates, and Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC Resolving the Motion of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC to Compel the Turnover of Proceeds from the Sale of Certain Personal Property and Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking the Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019(a), Approving the Stipulation by and Between the Chapter 7 Trustee, on Behalf of the Debtors' Estates, and Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC Resolving the Motion of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC to Compel the Turnover of Proceeds from the Sale of Certain Personal Property with Exhibit and Proposed Order (related document(s)407) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Joseph Faraldo on behalf of Marina Guzman with hearing to be held on 3/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Faraldo, Joseph) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Approve, Pursuant to 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Stipulation by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee and Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC Resolving the Motion of Patriarch Partners Agency Services LLC to Compel the Turnover of Proceeds from the Sale of Certain Personal Property filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with hearing to be held on 4/4/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 3/28/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Stipulation # 2 Pleading Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Operating Report /Monthly Operating Statement for the Period Ended January 31, 2017 Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 2/24/2017 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Notice to Creditors and Other Parties in Interest of Public Auction Sale of Certain Personal Property (related document(s)403) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Sale
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Sale of the Debtors' Vehicles: i) 2009 Ford E-350 Vin No. 1FDSS34P79DA72262; ii) 2009 Ford E-350 Vin No. 1FDSS34P49DA77595; and iii) 2006 Ford E-350 1FDWE35P36DA19464. The Public Auction is Scheduled for March 28, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. at Maltz Auction Inc., 39 Windsor Place, Central Islip, New York 11.722 (related document(s)52) filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Robert Morici on behalf of Barbara Capozzi with hearing to be held on 3/21/2017 at 10:00 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (Morici, Robert) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 2/10/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Lena Vulaj As Administratrix Of The Estate Of Anton Vulaj And Lena Vulaj Individually (related document(s)384) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TC Hudson Valley Ambulance Corp. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare Pennsylvania, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare Maryland, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TC Billing and Services Corp. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare New York, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule E/F- Part 1 # 2 Schedule E/F- Part 2 # 3 Schedule E/F- Part 3 # 4 Schedule E/F- Part 4 # 5 Schedule E/F- Part 5)(Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TC Ambulance Corporation Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare Harford County, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TC Ambulance North, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare Westchester, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TCBA Ambulance, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TC Ambulance Group, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare ML, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare Management Services, Inc. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Schedule[s]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual and Global Notes and Statement of Limitations, Methods and Disclaimer regarding the Debtors' Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs for TransCare Corporation. Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service (related document(s)383) Filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Order re: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Signed On 2/10/2017Pursuant To Rule 2004 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure, Directing The Production Of Documents By: I) HSBC Bank USA NA; And II) Signature Bank (Related Doc # 371) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Lena Vulaj as Administratrix of the Estate of Anton Vulaj and Lena Vulaj Individually filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Hearing (related document(s)380, 381, 382, 379) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 3/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 2/28/2017, (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Application for Interim Professional Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Garfunkel Wild, P.C., Special Counsel, period: 2/29/2016 to 12/31/2016, fee:$47,863.00, expenses: $33.31. filed by Holly R. Holecek with hearing to be held on 3/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/28/2017,. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Application for Interim Professional Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Lucy L. Thomson, Ombudsman Health, period: 3/29/2016 to 1/17/2017, fee:$28,820.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Holly R. Holecek with hearing to be held on 3/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/28/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Application and Exhibit A) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Application for Interim Professional Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Application for Interim Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for CBIZ Accounting Tax & Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ Accounting, Tax & Advisory of San Diego, LLC, Accountant, period: 2/29/2016 to 12/31/2016, fee:$666,878.40, expenses: $28,300.36. filed by Holly R. Holecek with hearing to be held on 3/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/28/2017,. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Application for Interim Professional Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Application for Interim Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP, Trustee's Attorney, period: 2/25/2016 to 12/31/2016, fee:$806,732.75, expenses: $25,603.27. filed by Holly R. Holecek with hearing to be held on 3/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/28/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Application and Exhibits A-D) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order signed on 2/6/2017 Re: Motion of Randy J. Creswell, Esq. and Perkins Thompson, P.A. to Withdraw as Counsel for Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC (Related Doc # 326). (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service (related document(s)376) filed by Randy J. Creswell on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Creswell, Randy) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 (related document(s)326) Filed by Randy J. Creswell on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order)(Creswell, Randy) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Withdrawal of Objections of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP to the Motion of Randy J. Creswell, Esq. and Perkins Thompson, P.A. to Withdraw as Counsel for Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (related document(s)348) filed by Adam Craig Harris on behalf of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP. (Harris, Adam) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers (related document(s)373) Filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers filed by Timothy Q. Karcher on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Karcher, Timothy) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Application of Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 2004 of FRBP directing production of documents by i) HSBC Bank USA NA; and ii) Signature Bank (related document(s)371) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Application for FRBP 2004 Examination
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application for FRBP 2004 Examination /Production of Documents by: I) HSBC Bank USA NA; and II) Signature Bank filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with presentment to be held on 2/9/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 2/2/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Application # 2 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Operating Report /Monthly Operating Statement for the Period Ended November 30, 2016 Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Patient Care Ombudsman Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fifth Notice of Patient Care Ombudsman Report filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Lucy L. Thomson. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Adjourning Meeting of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Section 341(a) Meeting Continued on 1/25/2017 at 11:30 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Operating Report /Monthly Operating Statement for the Period Ended December 31, 2016 Filed by Salvatore LaMonica on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/11/2017. Re: By And Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And Ipfs Corporation Resolving Motion Of IPFS Corporation For Relief From The Automatic Stay To Cancel Certain Insurance Policies (related document(s)338) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Order Re: Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Signed On 1/11/2017 Re: Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019(A), Approving The Mutual Release And Settlement Agreement By And Between The Chapter 7 Trustee, On Behalf Of The Debtors Estates, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., And Montefiore Medical Center, Montefiore Mount Vernon Hospital And Montefiore New Rochelle Hospital(Related Doc # 329) . (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/11/2017. Re: By And Between The Chapter 7 Trustee And Zurich American Insurance Company Resolving The Motion For Payment Of The Administrative Expense Claim Of Zurich American Insurance Company (related document(s)345) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/10/2017. Re: Respecting The Distribution Of Certain Sale Proceeds In Accordance With So Ordered Stipulation (related document(s)150, 78, 360) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/10/2017. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Andre Smith And Withdrawing Motion For Relief From Stay [Dkt. No. 129] (related document(s)129) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as to Andre Smith and Withdrawing Motion for Relief from Stay (related document(s)129) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Proposed Order Respecting the Distribution of Certain Sale Proceeds to Kin Leasing Corp. (related document(s)150, 78) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of the Motion of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC to Compel the Turnover of Proceeds from the Sale of Certain Personal Property (related document(s)358) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Adjournment of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Adjournment of Hearing for 2/8/2017 at 10:00 of the Motion of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC to Compel the Turnover of Proceeds from the Sale of Certain Personal Property (related document(s)284) filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) Docket Text Hearing Date Added on 1/10/2017 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 1/6/2017. Re: Authorizing The Chapter 7 Trustee On Behalf Of The Debtors Jointly Administered Bankruptcy Estates To Surrender The Real Property Located At And Known As 16 Middlebush Road, Wappingers Falls, New York 12590 (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and Order Authorizing the Chapter 7 Trustee on behalf of the Debtors' Jointly Administered Estates to Surrender the Real Property Known as and Located at 16 Middlebush Road, Wappingers Falls, New York 12590 Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service (related document(s)354) filed by Randy J. Creswell on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. (Creswell, Randy) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Adjournment of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s)326) filed by Randy J. Creswell on behalf of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2017 at 10:00 AM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511) (Creswell, Randy) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of the Motion of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC to Compel the Turnover of Proceeds from the Sale of Certain Personal Property (related document(s)352) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Adjournment of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of the Motion of Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC to Compel the Turnover of Proceeds from the Sale of Certain Personal Property (related document(s)284) filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 2/9/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/21/2016. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Linee K. Hyner (related document(s)349) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service re: Objections of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP to the Motion of Andy J. Creswell, Esq. and Perkins Thompson, P.A. to Withdraw as Counsel for Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC, (related document(s)348) Filed by Adam Craig Harris on behalf of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP. (Harris, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Proposed Order/Presentment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Proposed Order and Stipulation Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay as its Applies to Linee K. Hyner filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP to the Motion of Andy J. Creswell, Esq. and Perkins Thompson, P.A. to Withdraw as Counsel for Patriarch Partners Agency Services, LLC (related document(s)326) filed by Adam Craig Harris on behalf of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP. (Harris, Adam) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Transfer Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Adversary case 16-01282. Copy of Certified Order Transferring Case No. 16cv2831 from the U.S. District Court, S.D.N.Y. to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y. (Receipt Number USDC, Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Christopher James Kupka, Michael Brian Ershowsky, Eduard Korsinsky on behalf of Warren Eisenstadt. (Attachments: # 1 1 main # 2 1-1 # 3 1-2 # 4 2 # 5 3 # 6 4 # 7 5 # 8 6 # 9 8 # 10 9 # 11 10 # 12 11 main # 13 11-1 # 14 12 # 15 13 # 16 14 # 17 15 # 18 16 # 19 17 # 20 18 # 21 19 # 22 20 # 23 20-1 # 24 20-2 # 25 20-3 # 26 20-4 # 27 20-5 # 28 20-6 # 29 20-7 # 30 20-8 # 31 20-9 # 32 21 # 33 22 # 34 23 # 35 24 main # 36 24-1 # 37 24-2 # 38 25 # 39 26 # 40 27 # 41 28 # 42 29 main # 43 29-1 # 44 29-2 # 45 30 # 46 31 # 47 32 # 48 33 # 49 34 # 50 35 # 51 36 # 52 37 # 53 38 # 54 39 # 55 40) (Aquino, Lourdes) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing on the Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee and Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019(a), Approving the Stipulation By and Between the Chapter 7 Trustee, on Behalf of the Debtors' Estates, and Zurich American Insurance Resolving the Motion for Payment of the Administrative Expense Claim for Zurich American Insurance Company with Exhibit (related document(s)345) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: None Motion to Approve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Approve the Stipulation, pursuant to Rule 9019(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure by and between the Trustee, on behalf of the Debtors estates, and Zurich American Insurance Company Resolving the Motion for Payment of the Administrative Expense Claim of Zurich American Insurance Company filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica with hearing to be held on 1/10/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 1/3/2017,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Stipulation and Order) (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Notice of Hearing on the Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee and Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee Seeking Entry of an Order, Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Stipulation by and between the Chapter 7 Trustee, on behalf of the Debtors' Estates, and IPFS Corporation Resolving the Motion of IPFS Corporation for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Cancel Certain Insurance Policies (related document(s)338) Filed by Jacqulyn S. Loftin on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Loftin, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None So Ordered Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  So Ordered Stipulation Signed On 12/13/2016. Re: Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay As It Applies To Winston Barr (related document(s)340) (Barrett, Chantel) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace