Sue Causey v. Comcast Cable Communications,
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-10718

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2017 at 8:38 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109038921 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to dismiss appeal with prejudice filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. Joint Stipulation of Parties. [7835843-1] (ECF: Sheldon Philp)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109032205 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
    Notice of Settlement filed by Attorney Katherine Earle Yanes for Appellee Sue Causey. (ECF: Katherine Yanes)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108969832 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
      ORDER: Appellee’s motion to stay appeal in light of an anticipated settlement is GRANTED. Appellee’s brief is due 30 days from the date of this Order. [7788485-2] SM
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108959002 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None
        MOTION to stay further appellate proceedings filed by Sue Causey. Motion is Unopposed. [7788485-1] (ECF: Katherine Yanes)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108890664 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
          Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellant Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (ECF: Sheldon Philp)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108881593 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
            Appellant's brief filed by Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (ECF: Sheldon Philp)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108833392 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
              Briefing Notice issued to Appellant Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. The appellants brief is due on or before 04/04/2016. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108828687 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Gus M. Centrone for Appellee Sue Causey. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Gus Centrone)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108826256 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                  Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sheldon Philp for Appellant Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (ECF: Sheldon Philp)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108826253 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                    Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sheldon Philp for Appellant Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Sheldon Philp)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 01108826242 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sheldon Philp for Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (ECF: Sheldon Philp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 01108826235 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jaime A. Bianchi for Comcast Cable Communications, LLC. (ECF: Jaime Bianchi)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108821257 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gus M. Centrone for Sue Causey and Brian Shrader for Sue Causey. (ECF: Gus Centrone)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108821207 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                            APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Katherine Earle Yanes for Sue Causey. (ECF: James Felman)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108818744 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                              CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Comcast Cable Communications, LLC on 02/19/2016. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 03/14/2016 as to Appellant Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 182 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?