District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

United States of America v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-308

Tags
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:41 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
CAPTION, reflecting proper appellants, AMENDED.[1760313] [16-308] [Entered: 04/28/2016 10:53 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 92 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [88] filed by Appellant United States of America; granting motion to extend time [85] filed by Appellant HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Bank USA, N.A., in 16-308, 16-1094, by RKW, FILED. [1760303][92] [16-308, 16-353, 16-1068, 16-1094] [Entered: 04/28/2016 10:51 AM]
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
      MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 16-308, 16-1068, 16-1094, Appellant United States of America in 16-353, FILED. Service date 04/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1755903] [16-308, 16-1068, 16-1094, 16-353] [Entered: 04/21/2016 04:50 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
        MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC in 16-308, 16-1094, FILED. Service date 04/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1755641] [16-308, 16-1094] [Entered: 04/21/2016 02:41 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
          NEW CASE MANAGER, Anna Greenidge, ASSIGNED.[1755545] [16-1094] [Entered: 04/21/2016 01:17 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Anna Greenidge, ASSIGNED.[1710268] [16-353] [Entered: 02/22/2016 05:06 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 16-353, Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 16-308, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1710139] [16-353, 16-308] [Entered: 02/22/2016 04:16 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                FORM B, on behalf of Appellant United States of America in 16-353, Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America in 16-308 , FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF.[1710124] [16-353, 16-308] [Entered: 02/22/2016 04:11 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                  ORDER, dated 02/22/2016, dismissing appeal by 03/07/2016, unless Appellee-Cross-Appellant United States of America submits Form B, FILED.[1709764] [16-353, 16-308] [Entered: 02/22/2016 01:08 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                    NEW CASE MANAGER, Anna Greenidge, ASSIGNED.[1706475] [16-308] [Entered: 02/17/2016 02:44 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee HSBC Holdings plc and HSBC Bank USA, N.A. in 16-308, Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings plc in 16-353, FILED. Service date 02/17/2016 by CM/ECF. [1706072] [16-308, 16-353] [Entered: 02/17/2016 11:13 AM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 207 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?