Trump et al v. Grosfeld et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-03664
District Judge Colleen McMahon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 26, 2017 at 1:09 AM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Garfunkel Wild, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Leon +1 516 393 2570 +1 516 466 5964 mleon@jaspanllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Row Kretzing +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 LKRETZING@JASPANLLP.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Jr."

Toggle Switch Represented by Garfunkel Wild, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Leon +1 516 393 2570 +1 516 466 5964 mleon@jaspanllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Row Kretzing +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 LKRETZING@JASPANLLP.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
No Logo Trump, Ivanka, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Ivanka Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Garfunkel Wild, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Leon +1 516 393 2570 +1 516 466 5964 mleon@jaspanllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Row Kretzing +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 LKRETZING@JASPANLLP.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
Trump Marks Baja LLC Trump Marks Baja LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Garfunkel Wild, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Leon +1 516 393 2570 +1 516 466 5964 mleon@jaspanllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Row Kretzing +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 LKRETZING@JASPANLLP.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
Trump Marks LLC Trump Marks LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Garfunkel Wild, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Leon +1 516 393 2570 +1 516 466 5964 mleon@jaspanllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Row Kretzing +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 LKRETZING@JASPANLLP.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
Trump Organization, LLC Trump Organization, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Garfunkel Wild, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Leon +1 516 393 2570 +1 516 466 5964 mleon@jaspanllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Row Kretzing +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 LKRETZING@JASPANLLP.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Garfunkel Wild, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Leon +1 516 393 2570 +1 516 466 5964 mleon@jaspanllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaspan Schlesinger Hoffman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurel Row Kretzing +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 LKRETZING@JASPANLLP.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Robert Schlesinger +1 516 746 8000 +1 516 393 8282 SSCHLESINGER@JSHLLP.COM
v.
No Logo Adam Fisher, Defendant
No Logo Jason Grosfeld, Defendant
No Logo PB Impulsores, S. de R.L. de C.V., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332oc
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE THAT plaintiffs, Donald J. Trump, Donald J. Trump, Jr., Ivanka Trump, Trump Marks LLC, Trump Marks Baja LLC, Trump Organization, Inc. and Trump Organization, LLC, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, dismiss without prejudice all causes of action in the above- captioned matter against defendants Jason Grosfeld, Adam Fisher and PB Impulsores, S. de R.L. de C.V. (the "defendants"). Said dismissal is filed without prejudice since defendants have not served an answer to the Complaint, dated April 8, 2009. (lmb) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Pollack & Kaminsky, New Attorney: Litman, Asche & Gioiella, Address: Litman, Asche & Gioiella, 45 Broadway, 30th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10006, 212-809-4500. Document filed by Jason Grosfeld. (Asche, Richard) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that the time for all defendant to appear and to answer or make any motion in retaliation to the summons and complaint in this action, be and the same is extended, sine die. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/4/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that the time for all defendants to appear and to answer or make any motion in relation to the summons and complaint be and hereby is extended, sine die, as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/20/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer By Stipulation of the Parties. Document filed by Trump Marks LLC, Trump Marks Baja LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Ivanka Trump.(Kretzing, Laurel) Modified on 7/17/2009 (db). (Entered: 07/16/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:... Initial Conference set for 7/17/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/20/09) (cd) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trump Marks LLC, Trump Marks Baja LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Ivanka Trump.(mbe) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against Jason Grosfeld, Adam Fisher, PB Impulsores, S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 683860)Document filed by Trump Marks LLC, Trump Marks Baja LLC, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Organization LLC, Donald J. Trump, Donald Trump, Jr, Ivanka Trump.(mbe) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 122 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?