Jones, et al v. Maples/Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-03311
District Judge John E. Sprizzo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 16, 2017 at 12:16 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CHARLES JONES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES JONES +1 443 413 1397
v.
No Logo Barbara Thompson, Defendant
No Logo CBS Entertainment, Defendant
No Logo CDL Hotels, Defendant
No Logo Deborah McLaughlin, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Jr."
No Logo Edgar Bronfman, Jr., Defendant
No Logo International Creative Management, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Goldman, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Woods, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Roina, Defendant
No Logo Trump, Marla Maples, Defendant
Officially listed as "Marla Maples/Trump"
No Logo Mary Trump, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Calamari, Defendant
No Logo Robert Morgenthau, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo The Plaza Hotel, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization"
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER, that this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice purs to Rule 4(m) of the FRCP ; that the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to close the action (signed by Judge Kevin T. Duffy ); Copies mailed. (lam) (Entered: 02/08/2000)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER, that unless pltff can demonstrate that defts have been served or can show good cause why defts have not been served on or before 10/28/98, this action shall be dismissed without prejudice purs to FRCP(4)(m) ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); Copies mailed (lam) (Entered: 10/05/1998)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER, that unless pltff can demonstrate that defts have been served or can show good cause why defts have not been served on or before 10/5/98, this action shall be dismissed without prejudice purs to FRCP (4)(m) ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); Copies mailed (lam) (Entered: 09/30/1998)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 315353 (pl) (Entered: 05/11/1998)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

          Space Space

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 35 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?