Jones v. Maples/Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:98-cv-07132
District Judge Sidney H. Stein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 11, 2017 at 11:58 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by (96-A-4639)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Jones
v.
No Logo Barbara Thompson, Defendant
No Logo CBS Entertainment, Defendant
No Logo CDL Hotels, Defendant
No Logo Deborah McLaughlin, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Donald J. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump, Jr."
No Logo Edgar Bronfman, Jr., Defendant
No Logo International Creative Management, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Olshan, Grundman, Frome, Rosenzweig & Wolosky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Stuart Lafayette +1 212 451 2300 +1 212 451 2222 mlafayette@olshanlaw.com
No Logo Jeffrey Goldman, Defendant
No Logo Judith Regan, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Woods, Defendant
No Logo Lisa Roina, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Olshan, Grundman, Frome, Rosenzweig & Wolosky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Stuart Lafayette +1 212 451 2300 +1 212 451 2222 mlafayette@olshanlaw.com
No Logo Trump, Marla Maples, Defendant
Officially listed as "Marla Maples/Trump"
No Logo Mary Trump, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Calamari, Defendant
No Logo Robert Morgenthau, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo The Plaza Hotel, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Trump Organization, Inc."
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 66 Notice of Appeal filed by Charles Jones USCA Case Number 02-7650. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. MACKECHNIE, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 12/15/03. (pr, ) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
    Notice that the record on appeal has been certified and transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals: [66-1] appeal by Charles Jones. (sb) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by Charles Jones from [65-1] order . Copies of notice of appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP and A.D.A. $105.00 APPEAL FILING FEE DUE. (sb) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER denying [64-1] motion for an Order recalling and vacating its Order of February 26, 2002; denying [64-2] motion amend or otherwise modify said Order; denying [64-3] motion to strike portions of the Court's gratuitous comments from the record, pursuant to FRCP 59(e) and/or 60 (b). ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Charles Jones for an Order recalling and vacating its Order of February 26, 2002 and, amend or otherwise modify said Order and additionally, to strike portions of the Court's gratuitous comments from the record, pursuant to FRCP 59(e) and/or 60 (b) . Return date not indicated. Declaration of Charles Jones in support of motion attached. (yv) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT; That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion (86623) and Order dated 2/26/02, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted and the complaint is dismissed with prejudice except for plaintiff's claim for conversion which is dismissed without prejudice. ( signed by James M. Parkison, Clerk of Court ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 3/1/02. (tp) (Entered: 03/01/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
              OPINION AND ORDER #86623, granting [50-1] motion for an order dismissing this action with prejudice against named defendants; granting [54-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, to dismiss the complaint; granting [44-1] motion to dismiss the action purs to FRCP 12(b)(6); denying [53-1] cross motion purs. to Rule 56 of the F.R.C.P. for summary judgment as to the 11th Cause of Action against defts Morgenthau, Woods and McLaughlin and the 13th Cause of Action against deft Maples/Trump for conversion and interference with the property rights of pltff, there being no genuine triable issues of fact to consider; denying [53-2] cross motion that a temporary restraining order enter pending determination of this proceeding; the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of defendants w/ prejudice. The only claim is being dismissed w/out prejudice is plaintiff's claim for conversion of a $319.50 tape recorder and nine audio tapes. ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (Sent orig. doc. to the Judgment Clerk) (ae) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of Charles Jones in support of Re: [53-1] cross motion purs. to Rule 56 of the F.R.C.P. for summary judgment as to the 11th Cause of Action against defts Morgenthau, Woods and McLaughlin and the 13th Cause of Action against deft Maples/Trump for conversion and interference with the property rights of pltff, there being no genuine triable issues of fact to consider, and [53-2] cross motion that a temporary restraining order enter pending determination of this proceeding. (kw) (Entered: 06/06/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE by Robert Morgenthau, Kevin Woods, Deborah McLaughlin Re: [53-1] cross motion purs. to Rule 56 of the F.R.C.P. for summary judgment as to the 11th Cause of Action against defts Morgenthau, Woods and McLaughlin and the 13th Cause of Action against deft Maples/Trump for conversion and interference with the property rights of pltff, there being no genuine triable issues of fact to consider; [53-2] cross motion that a temporary restraining order enter pending determination of this proceeding. (sn) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Stein from Morrie I. kleinbart, dated 5/11/01; counsel for the parties writes to request a two week extension to finalize a response to plaintiff's [53-1,2] cross-motion for summary judgment. The opposition to plaintiff's cross motion is due 5/28/01 , and the reply is due 6/11/01 . ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (kkc) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None
                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by Robert Morgenthau, Kevin Woods, Barbara Thompson, Deborah McLaughlin in support of re: [50-1] motion for an order dismissing this action with prejudice against named defendants (pl) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: None
                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by Marla Maples/Trump, Donald J. Trump, Trump Organization, Matthew Calamari, Donald Trump Jr., Jeffrey Goldman in support of re: [50-1] motion for an order dismissing this action with prejudice against named defendants (sac) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York in support of: [54-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, to dismiss the complaint. (kkc) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The City of New York in support of [54-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, to dismiss the complaint. (kkc) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by The City of New York for an order pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, to dismiss the complaint . Return date 4/23/01. (kkc) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Charles Jones purs. to Rule 56 of the F.R.C.P. for summary judgment as to the 11th Cause of Action against defts Morgenthau, Woods and McLaughlin and the 13th Cause of Action against deft Maples/Trump for conversion and interference with the property rights of pltff, there being no genuine triable issues of fact to consider , and furthermore, that a temporary restraining order enter pending determination of this proceeding . No return date indicated. Declaration of Charles Jones, and memorandum of law in support attached. (sn) (Entered: 04/24/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  THIRD REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: the Trump defendants shall serve and file their motion to dismiss by 3/30/01; plaintiff's opposition to such motion shall be due by 4/30/01; plaintiff, if he so chooses, may file a single brief in opposition to all motions to dismiss. The Trump Defendants' reply will be due by 5/11/01. ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 04/16/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Marla Maples/Trump, Donald J. Trump, Trump Organization, Matthew Calamari, Donald Trump Jr., Jeffrey Goldman in support of [50-1] motion for an order dismissing this action with prejudice against named defendants . (djc) (Entered: 04/03/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Marla Maples/Trump, Donald J. Trump, Trump Organization, Matthew Calamari, Donald Trump Jr., Jeffrey Goldman for an order dismissing this action with prejudice against named defendants ; Return date 5/11/01. Attached is Declaration in support of Jeffrey L. Goldman (djc) (Entered: 04/03/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        SECOND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Trump Defendants shall serve and file their motion to dismiss on or before 3/23/01; Plaintiff's opposition to such motion shall be due on or before 4/23/01; plaintiff if he chooses, may file a ingle brief in opposition to all motions to dismiss on this date; The Trump Defendants' reply will be due on or before 5/4/01. ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (ae) (Entered: 03/26/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: the Trump defts motion to dismiss is due by 3/16/01; pltff's response to motion deadline 4/16/01; the Trump deft's reply to response to motion deadline 4/30/01 ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (lam) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Letter filed addressed to Judge Stein from Charles Jones, dated 03/16/01; re: pro se plaintiff Charles Jones requests the Court to deny the Trump defendants a further extension and direct the Trump defendants to answer the complaint forthwith. (djc) (Entered: 03/21/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Stein from Kathleen A. Donohue, dated 3/8/01; reset dft. The City of New York's motion and memorandum of law to dismiss the complaint filing deadline for 3/16/01 . ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (pl) Modified on 03/15/2001 (Entered: 03/14/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Morgenthau, Kevin Woods, Deborah McLaughlin, Barbara Thompson in support of [44-1] motion to dismiss the action purs to FRCP 12(b)(6) . (cd) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Robert Morgenthau, Kevin Woods, Deborah McLaughlin, Barbara Thompson to dismiss the action purs to FRCP 12(b)(6) ; Return date 4/23/01; attached is an affirmation in support of Morrie I. Kleinbart (cd) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles Jones (Answer due 2/18/01 for Judith Regan, for Jeffrey Goldman, for Donald Trump Jr., for Barbara Thompson, for Barbara Thompson, for The City of New York, for Deborah McLaughlin, for Deborah McLaughlin, for Matthew Calamari, for Trump Organization, for Kevin Woods, for Robert Morgenthau, for Donald J. Trump, for Marla Maples/Trump amending [31-1] amended complaint ; Summons issued. Jury Trial Demanded. (djc) Modified on 01/31/2001 (Entered: 01/31/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Stein from Jay H. Berg, dated 12/28/00. Re: plaintiff writes to advise the Court that he was withdrawing the action with prejudice against certain defendants, including our client Mary Trump and request that the Court direct the Clerk to amend the Order (dated 12/19/00) to reflect Mr. Jones' representation that he is withdrawing the action as to Mrs. Trump, we would greatly appreciate it; On consent of plt., this action is dismissed with prejudice as against Mary Trump . ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (pl) Modified on 01/10/2001 (Entered: 01/09/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Order of dismissal with prejudice as against defts The Plaza Hotel and CDL Hotels. ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ) (sn) (Entered: 12/21/2000)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action with prejudice as against defendants CDL Hotels USA, Inc. (described as CDL Hotels in the complaint) and Plaza Operating Partners, Ltd. (described as the Plaza Hotel in the complaint) without costs to any party to this stipulation. ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ) (kw) (Entered: 12/21/2000)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER; the Court records indicate that stipulations of dismissal have been filed as against defts Edgar Bronfman, Jr.; Lisa Roina; International Creative Management; and CBS Broadcasting Inc . Pltff shall serve and file a second amended complaint by 2/1/01 . Set answer to second amended complaint due for 3/9/01 for Jeffrey Goldman, for Donald Trump Jr., for Mary Trump, for Barbara Thompson, for Barbara Thompson, for CDL Hotels, for The City of New York, for Deborah McLaughlin, for Deborah McLaughlin, for Matthew Calamari, for Trump Organization, for Kevin Woods, for Robert Morgenthau, for The Plaza Hotel, for Donald J. Trump, for Marla Maples/Trump ; pltff's opposition to any motion is due by 4/9/01, and the replies are due by 4/23/01. If no motions are filed by 3/9/01, the parties shall notify the Court in writing to schedule a pretrial conference . ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Letter filed by Charles Jones addressed to Judge Stein from Charles Jones, dated 5/23/00, re: Court's Order to amend the complaint by 6/5/00. (pl) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Letter filed by Charles Jones addressed to Judge Sprizzo from Charles Jones, dated 6/26/99, re: plaintiffs request for a continuance of its suspension fo this case for a period of 14 months. (pl) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Letter filed by Charles Jones addressed to Judge Stein from Charles Jones, dated 5/2/00, re: clarification of the Court's June 5the deadline to amend, serve and file the amended complaint in this action. (pl) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Letter filed by Charles Jones addressed to Judge Stein from Charles Jones, dated 11/10/00, re: plaintiffs request the Court set an initial case management date for this action. (pl) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter filed by Charles Jones addressed to Pro Se Clerk from Charles Jones, dated 06/02/00, re: Filing of Amended Complaint. (pl) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Letter filed by Charles Jones addressed to Judge Sprizzo from Charles Jones, dated 07/10/99, re: Judge Mukasey's recent 39-page opinion. (pl) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMO-ENDORSEMENT on Application for an extension of time to serve amended complaint; application denied as moot; the amended complaint has already been filed . ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 12/20/2000)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None
                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles Jones; (Answer due 12/4/00 for Int'l. Creative, for Edgar Bronfman Jr., for Lisa Roina, for CBS Entertainment, for Jeffrey Goldman, for Donald Trump Jr., for Mary Trump, for Barbara Thompson, for Barbara Thompson, for CDL Hotels, for The City of New York, for Deborah McLaughlin, for Deborah McLaughlin, for Matthew Calamari, for Trump Organization, for Kevin Woods, for Robert Morgenthau, for The Plaza Hotel, for Donald J. Trump, for Marla Maples/Trump ); amending [1-1] complaint; Summons issued. (pl) (Entered: 11/27/2000)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER, that there will be a pretrial conference in this action on 12/15/00 at 11:00 a.m. All parties are directed to appear in Courtroom 23A at that time. ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                Application for extension of time to serve amended complaint purs. to order of the Court, filed by pltff Charles Jones. (sn) (Entered: 06/12/2000)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER; because the pltff is incarcerated, the pretrial conference scheduled for 4/6/00, is hereby adjourned sine die; the case is removed from the suspense calendar and restored to the active docket of this Court ; pltff shall have until 6/5/00, to file and serve an amended complt. ; any written communications from pltff must be served on all parties at the same time and in the same manner that they are served on the Court ; pltff is directed to contact the Pro Se Office at 805-0175 for any procedural assistance ; ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); copies mailed (ls) (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Letter filed by Charles Jones addressed to Judge Stein from Charles Jones, dated 3/27/00, . (jp) (Entered: 04/06/2000)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/16/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE; counsel and pltff pro se are directed to appear in Courtroom 23A on 4/6/00 at 10:30 a.m. for a case management conference purs. to FRCP 16. At that time, counsel for all parties must appear prepared to discuss the progress of the case and the scheduling of discovery proceedings, any dispositive motions, the feasability of settlement or alternative dispute resolution, the dates for future conferences, and the submission of a joint pretrial order . ( signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein ); Copies mailed. (jp) (Entered: 03/16/2000)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Notice of reassignment to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Mark S. Lafayette, Charles Jones. (em) (Entered: 03/10/2000)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of change of atty name of counsel for Lisa Roina, Int'l. Creative (lam) (Entered: 11/09/1999)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION of discontinuance with prejudice as to deft CBS Broadcasting Inc. (sued incorrectly herein as "CBS Entertainment") ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ) (lam) (Entered: 10/05/1999)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of the action as against defendants Lisa Roina and International Creative Management pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the FRCP with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ) (kw) (Entered: 09/13/1999)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/24/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                STIPULATION of dismissal as against deft Edgar Bronfman, Jr., purs to Rule 41(a) of the FRCP, with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other ( signed by Judge Robert J. Ward ) (lam) (Entered: 08/24/1999)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER, all discovery shall be stayed sine die ; this action is transferred to the suspense docket of this Court until 9/1/00, with leave of any party to apply on 5 days' notice for its restoration to the trial calendar of this Court ; reset pre-trial conference for 10:45 a.m. on 9/11/00 ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); Copies (kw) (Entered: 08/03/1999)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Transcript of record of proceeding before Judge Sprizzo on 2/18/99. (kw) (Entered: 04/23/1999)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Edgar Bronfman Jr. (lam) (Entered: 03/19/1999)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Edgar Bronfman Jr. in support of [16-1] motion to dismiss this action with prejducie (lam) (Entered: 03/19/1999)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Edgar Bronfman Jr. to dismiss this action with prejudice . With declaration in support of Mark P. Zimmett attached. Return date 9/10/99 @10:45am. (lam) Modified on 08/26/1999 (Entered: 03/19/1999)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER, all discovery in the action shall be stayed until 9/1/99 ; this action is transferred to the Suspense Docket of this Court until 9/1/99, with leave of any party to apply on 5 days' notice for its restoration to the trial calendar of this Court ; reset pretrial conference for 10:45 a.m. on 9/10/99 ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); Copies mailed (kw) (Entered: 02/23/1999)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings filed for dates of 12/21/98 before Judge Sprizzo. (lam) (Entered: 02/08/1999)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER, that all discovery in the action shall be stayed until 4/23/99 ; that this action be transferred to the Suspense Docket of this Court until 4/23/99, with leave of any party to apply on 5 days' notice for its restoration to the trial calender ; set pretrial conference for 10:45 4/23/99 ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ); Copies mailed (lam) (Entered: 01/08/1999)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 1/22/99 for Int'l. Creative, for Lisa Roina ( signed by Judge John E. Sprizzo ). (lam) (Entered: 01/07/1999)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Lisa Roina, and Int'l. Creative. (kw) (Entered: 12/22/1998)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge John E. Sprizzo Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Charles Jones . (bm) (Entered: 12/10/1998)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: reset answer due for 1/15/99 for The Plaza Hotel ( signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey ); Copies mailed (sac) (Entered: 12/07/1998)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Notice of reassingment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Charles Jones . (ri) (Entered: 12/01/1998)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment due to a Judge's Recusal to Judge Michael B. Mukasey. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of Charles Jones . (bm) Modified on 12/01/1998 (Entered: 12/01/1998)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by CBS Entertainment in support of [5-1] motion for an order dismissing the complaint as to CBS, pursuant to Rule 8, Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 12(f) of the FRCP. (kw) (Entered: 11/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by CBS Entertainment for an order dismissing the complaint as to CBS, pursuant to Rule 8, Rule 12(b)(6), and Rule 12(f) of the FRCP ; Return date 1/7/99. (kw) (Entered: 11/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Rule 1.9 certificate filed by CBS Entertainment. (kw) (Entered: 11/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter by Chuck Jones to Judge Scheindlin dated 10/29/98, plaintiff requests that your honor recuse herself from Jones v. Trump, et al, index no. 98cv7133 for reasons of the clearly prejudical conflicts that are set forth in this letter with respect to these two civil rights actions; the request to recuse was granted. The case was ordered reassigned on 10/30/98. Plaintiff is directed to refrain from further communication with this chambers ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (ae) (Entered: 11/12/1998)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER, the plaintiff is directed to have the S&C promptly served on defendant(s). If service is not made upon the defendant(s) or plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected by 2/12/99, the Court will dismiss this action. The Pro Se Clerk at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl St., may be of assistance in connection with court procedures but cannot give legal advice ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed (ae) (Entered: 10/30/1998)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 328372 (bm) (Entered: 10/09/1998)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 577 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?