Jeannie May v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 16-1285

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 5:36 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803170905 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT FILED - The judgment of the Originating Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion.. ROGER L. WOLLMAN, LAVENSKI R. SMITH and WILHELMINA M. WRIGHT Hrg Dec 2016 [4517479] [16-1285, 16-1307] (AMT) [Entered: 03/29/2017 07:52 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803170884 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Roger L. Wollman, Lavenski R. Smith and Wilhelmina M. Wright AUTHORING JUDGE:Wilhelmina M. Wright (PUBLISHED) [4517469] [16-1285, 16-1307] (AMT) [Entered: 03/29/2017 07:33 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803096393 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CLERK ORDER:Granting [4480173-2] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Ben Alexander Barnes. Mr. Ben Alexander Barnes for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, 16-1307 has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [4480481] [16-1285, 16-1307] (AMT) [Entered: 12/15/2016 04:49 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803095708 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Mr. Ben Alexander Barnes for Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285 w/service 12/15/2016. [4480173] [16-1285, 16-1307] (BAB) [Entered: 12/15/2016 12:09 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803083271 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CLERK ORDER:Granting [4473806-2] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Ms. Rhiana Luaders. Ms. Rhiana Luaders for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, 16-1307 has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [4473868] [16-1285, 16-1307] (AMT) [Entered: 11/29/2016 04:21 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803083110 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Ms. Rhiana Luaders for Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285 w/service 11/29/2016. [4473806] [16-1285, 16-1307] (RL) [Entered: 11/29/2016 03:42 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803083000 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Ms. Elizabeth Scott Letcher for Ms. Jeannie K May in 16-1285, 16-1307 for argument in December, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4473754] [16-1285, 16-1307] (ESL) [Entered: 11/29/2016 03:06 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803081832 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ARGUMENT RESPONSE/APPEARANCE FORM filed by Mr. Jeffrey Mark Tillotson for Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285 for argument in December, at the U.S. Courthouse in St. Louis, Missouri. [4473212] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT) [Entered: 11/28/2016 02:57 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 00802924017 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                  Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, 16-1307 [4395209] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 00802924014 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                    APPELLANT brief of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, 16-1307 submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4395208] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802922628 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                      CLERK ORDER:Granting [4394478-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Jeffrey Mark Tillotson. Brief of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC due 05/03/2016. Appendix due on 05/03/2016. [4394562] [16-1285, 16-1307] (AMT)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802922435 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                        MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 05/03/2016, filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Mark Tillotson for Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Mark Tillotson for Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1307 w/service 05/02/2016. [4394478] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802909738 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                          CLERK ORDER:Granting [4388182-2] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Jeffrey Mark Tillotson. Brief of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC due 05/02/2016. Appendix due on 05/02/2016. [4388361] [16-1285, 16-1307] (AMT)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802909358 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                            MOTION extension until May 2, 2016 to file Appellant/Cross-Appellee brief and appendix., filed by Attorney Mr. Jeffrey Mark Tillotson for Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285 w/service 04/13/2016. [4388182] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802889642 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE filed by Elizabeth S. Letcher for Appellee Ms. Jeannie K May w/service 03/16/2016 [4378706] [16-1285] (ESL)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802876988 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
                                CLERK ORDER:Granting [4372491-2] Court Reporter motion extension of time to file transcript. in 16-1285 Transcript now due on 04/11/2016. Brief of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC due 04/18/2016. Appendix due on 04/18/2016 [4372667] [16-1285, 16-1307] (AMT)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802876729 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                  Motion of for extension of time to file transcript until 04/11/2016 at 05:00 pm. w/service 02/29/2016. [4372491] [16-1285, 16-1307] (GDM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802876638 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                    DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellee Ms. Jeannie K May in 16-1285, Appellant Ms. Jeannie K May in 16-1307. w/service 02/29/2016 [4372466] [16-1285, 16-1307] (PMC)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802870201 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                      Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1307. Transcript ordered [4369289] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802869295 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                        DESIGNATION of record filed by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1307. w/service 02/18/2016 [4368884] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802869288 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                          APPELLANT'S FORM A filed by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1307 - w/service 02/18/2016. [4368882] [16-1285, 16-1307] --[Edited 02/19/2016 by AMT] (JMT)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802869285 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                            STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1285, Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1307 - w/service 02/18/2016. [4368881] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802869282 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
                                              METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and Appellee Ms. Jeannie K May in 16-1285, Appellant Ms. Jeannie K May and Appellee Nationstar Mortgage, LLC in 16-1307 - Joint Appendix - w/service 02/18/2015 [4368880] [16-1285, 16-1307] (JMT)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802862527 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                APPEARANCE filed by Paul Catalano for Appellee Ms. Jeannie K May w/service 02/10/2016 [4365578] [16-1285] (PMC)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802862509 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                  APPEARANCE filed by David Humphreys for Appellee Ms. Jeannie K May w/service 02/10/2016 [4365569] [16-1285] (RDH)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802862486 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None
                                                    APPEARANCE filed by Luke Wallace for Appellee Ms. Jeannie K May w/service 02/10/2016 [4365563] [16-1285] (LJW)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802860098 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. - FOR CAL [4364379] [16-1285] (JMT)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00802860041 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                        APPEARANCE filed by Jeffrey M. Tillotson, P.C. for Appellant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC w/service 02/05/2016 [4364353] [16-1285] (JMT)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 249 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?