Hewett v. Trump Organization
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10007
District Judge Reginald C. Lindsay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 2:36 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo R. Joseph Hewett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by R. Joseph Hewett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space R. Joseph Hewett +1 508 641 3833
v.
No Logo Archie Worldwide Inc., Defendant
No Logo CJ Worldwide, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Jean Worldwide Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mark Burnett, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Trump Productions LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw 1 Complaint, by R. Joseph Hewett.(York, Steve) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 1 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
    COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Trump Organization, Inc., Trump Productions LLC, Donald Trump, Mark Burnett, Jean Worldwide Inc., Archie Worldwide Inc., CJ Worldwide, Inc. Filing fee: , filed by R. Joseph Hewett.(Filo, Jennifer) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2007 (Filo, Jennifer). (Entered: 01/04/2007)
    LREF

    Statistics

    This case has been viewed 106 times.

    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
    Space
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
     
    PlainSite
    Sign Up
    Need Password Help?