Fluker v. Trump et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00809
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 4:46 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Annette Fluker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Annette Fluker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette Fluker +1 718 377 3245
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Trump, Ivana, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivana Trump"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331cv
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
CIVIL JUDGMENT: It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That the complaint is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to the January 5, 2010 order in Fluker v. Charles, No. 09 Civ. 9537 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 5, 2010). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/27/2013). (rjm) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1651. The Plaintiff has filed this new case in forma pauperis, requesting the Court's leave to file after four pages of typewritten allegations. (Compl. at 8.) To the extent the Plaintiff's allegations are intelligible, they are frivolous. I find no merit in the Plaintiff's application seeking the Court's leave to file. Her application is denied, and this case is dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/27/2013). (rjm) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
      Pro Se Acknowledgment Letter Mailed: Pro Se acknowledgment letter mailed to the plaintiff via USPS to the address noted on the Complaint on 2/8/2013. (jd) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against Donald Trump, Ivana Trump. Document filed by Annette Fluker. (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4, # 4 part 5, # 5 part 6, # 6 part 7)(jd) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
          REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Annette Fluker.(jd) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 39 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?