Sentegra, LLC v. Asus Computer International
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-03768
District Judge Gregory H. Woods, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 12:24 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sentegra, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush, Irene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaston Kroub +1 917 702 9135 gkroub@kskiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sergey Kolmykov +1 917 702 9135 skolmykov@kskiplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@kskiplaw.com
v.
No Logo Asus Computer International, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell S Feller +1 212 684 3900 +1 212 684 3999 msfeller@grr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Li Chen +1 214 627 9950 lchen@chenmalin.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dwayne Cuthbert Norton +1 469 729 5853 dnorton@chenmalin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Turner Boyd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Michael Masur +1 650 521 5935 +1 650 521 5931 masur@turnerboyd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keeley I Vega +1 650 521 5939 +1 650 521 5931 vega@turnerboyd.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 52 Motion for Dwayne C. Norton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
    MOTION for Dwayne C. Norton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of North Carolina, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Dwayne) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Dwayne C. Norton on behalf of Asus Computer International. New Address: Chen Malin LLP, 1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2400, Dallas, Texas, United States of America 75201, 214-627-9950. (Norton, Dwayne) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 49 Motion for Li Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
          MOTION for Li Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, LI) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by LI Chen on behalf of Asus Computer International. New Address: Chen Malin LLP, 1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 2400, Dallas, Texas, United States of America 75201, 214-627-9950. (Chen, LI) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Li Chen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11860529. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, LI) Modified on 1/21/2016 (sdi). (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Dwayne C. Norton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11859986. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State Bar of Texas, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - North Carolina State Bar, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Dwayne) Modified on 1/21/2016 (sdi). (Entered: 01/20/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mitchell Feller dated November 17, 2015 re: Motion to Dismiss and/or Transfer (DE 31 and related). Document filed by Asus Computer International.(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gaston Kroub dated 10/22/2015 re: D.E. 43. Document filed by Sentegra, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer. . Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION of Godwin Yan in Support re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer.. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Keeley Vega in Support re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer.. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer. . Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Jon Shore in Opposition re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer.. Document filed by Sentegra, LLC. (Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Gaston Kroub in Opposition re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer.. Document filed by Sentegra, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer. . Document filed by Sentegra, LLC. (Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time To Amend Pleadings and For Service of Initial Document Requests addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gaston Kroub dated 9/22/2015. Application granted. The deadline to file any motion to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties, as provided in paragraph 4 of the Case Management Plan, is extended to November 3, 2015. As noted in paragraph 6(f) of the Case Management Plan, internal fact discovery deadlines may be extended on consent of all parties without application to the Court. The parties have agreed that initial requests for production of documents shall be served by November 3, 2015. The Court is not granting a stay of discovery. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Docket Number 35. (Motions due by 11/3/2015.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/23/2015) (kko) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time To Amend Pleadings and For Service of Initial Document Requests addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gaston Kroub dated 9/22/2015. Document filed by Sentegra, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Keeley Vega in Support re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer.. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of Godwin Yan in Support re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer.. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 31 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer. . Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer. Document filed by Asus Computer International.(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to transfer. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in support of motion to dismiss, # 2 Declaration of Godwin Yan in support of motion to dismiss or transfer, # 3 Declaration of Keeley Vega in support of motion to dismiss or transfer, # 4 Exhibit A to Vega Declaration, # 5 Exhibit B to Vega Declaration, # 6 Exhibit C to Vega Declaration, # 7 Exhibit D to Vega Declaration, # 8 Exhibit E to Vega Declaration, # 9 Exhibit F to Vega Declaration, # 10 Exhibit G to Vega Declaration, # 11 Exhibit H to Vega Declaration, # 12 Exhibit I to Vega Declaration, # 13 Exhibit J to Vega Declaration, # 14 Exhibit K to Vega Declaration)(Feller, Mitchell) Modified on 9/17/2015 (db). (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/28/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/28/2015 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/18/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER: As discussed during an August 28, 2015 initial pretrial conference, in the event the Court denies ACI's Motion to dismiss and/or transfer, the parties will meet and confer and propose dates certain based on the following schedule of events and deadlines in view of the Local Patent Rules (LPR); as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/1/2015) (mro) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time re: briefing schedule for Motion to Dismiss / Improper Venue (DKT 24). Application granted. The deadline for defendant's motion to dismiss and/or transfer is extended to September 16, 2015; plaintiff's opposition is due two weeks after the date of service of defendant's motion; and defendant's reply, if any, is due one week after the date of service of plaintiff's opposition. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Docket Number 25. (Motions due by 9/16/2015.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 9/1/2015) (kko) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time re: briefing schedule for Motion to Dismiss / Improper Venue (DKT 24) addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mitchell Feller dated August 31, 2015. Document filed by Asus Computer International.(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: As discussed during an August 28, 2015 initial pretrial conference, defendant's motion to dismiss for improper venue and/or transfer venue are due no later than September 14, 2015; plaintiff's opposition is due two weeks after the date of service of defendant's motion; and defendant's reply, if any, is due one week after the date of service of plaintiff's opposition. (Motions due by 9/14/2015.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/31/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be tried to a jury. Present best estimate of the length of trial is 5-8 days. Motions due by 12/9/2016. Deposition due by 9/2/2016. Fact Discovery due by 9/2/2016. Expert Discovery due by 11/4/2016. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/31/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Gaston Kroub dated 08/21/2015 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Sentegra, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 20 Letter Motion for Conference seeking leave to file motion to dismiss and/or transfer. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for August 28, 2015 will also serve as a pre-motion conference for defendant's proposed motions to dismiss and transfer. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Docket Number 19. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/19/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    LETTER MOTION for Conference seeking leave to file motion to dismiss and/or transfer addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Joshua Masur dated 8/18/2015. Document filed by Asus Computer International.(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Leave to File motion to dismiss and/or transfer and request for pre-motion conference . Document filed by Asus Computer International.(Feller, Mitchell) Modified on 8/19/2015 (ldi). (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER denying 17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to submit joint status letter and case management plan and of initial pretrial conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mitchell Feller dated August 5, 2015. The Court does not currently anticipate that this case will be designated as related to case No. 1:15-cv-01535. Therefore, the application is denied. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/6/2015) (kko) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to submit joint status letter and case management plan and of initial pretrial conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mitchell Feller dated August 5, 2015. Document filed by Asus Computer International.(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 14 Motion for Keeley I. Vega to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 13 Motion for Joshua M. Masur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Woods, Gregory) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                AMENDED MOTION for Keeley I. Vega to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Vega, Keeley) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  AMENDED MOTION for Joshua M. Masur to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Masur, Joshua) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:15-CV-01535 (CM). Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Related Case Statement)(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Keeley I. Vega to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11107024. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Vega, Keeley) Modified on 7/2/2015 (wb). (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Joshua M. Masur to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11106977. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Asus Computer International. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Masur, Joshua) Modified on 7/2/2015 (wb). (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/28/2015 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/19/2015) (kko) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Application granted. The date by which defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 28, 2015. Asus Computer International answer due 8/28/2015. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/19/2015) (kko) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint or to otherwise respond addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Mitchell Feller dated June 19, 2015. Document filed by Asus Computer International.(Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Scott. Feller on behalf of Asus Computer International. (Feller, Mitchell) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sentegra, LLC.(Kroub, Gaston) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Asus Computer International served on 6/8/2015, answer due 6/29/2015. Service was accepted by Kirstin Edralin, Process Specialist. Document filed by Sentegra, LLC. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Asus Computer International. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401125461)Document filed by Sentegra, LLC.(moh) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?