AstraZeneca LP et al v. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00999
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 9, 2016 at 11:51 PM EST (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Astrazeneca AB Astrazeneca AB, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com
AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jill K. MacAlpine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill K. MacAlpine

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark J. Feldstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Feldstein

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan P. O'Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P. O'Quinn
Astrazeneca UK, Ltd. Astrazeneca UK, Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "AstraZeneca UK Limited"
Officer/Director, Viela Bio, Inc.
Officer/Director, Zeneca Group Plc

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by James H. Wallace , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Wallace, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark A. Pacella

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Pacella

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/16/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wesley E. Weeks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wesley E. Weeks

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J. Brodzik +1 267 767 8417 gbrodzik@ycst.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lennon +1 302 252 4320 +1 302 252 4330 jlennon@ycst.com
v.
Mylan, Inc. Mylan, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by James H. Wallace , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2015, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Wallace, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark A. Pacella

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2015, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Pacella

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/14/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wesley E. Weeks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/14/2015, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wesley E. Weeks
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by James H. Wallace , Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Wallace, Jr.

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark A. Pacella

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark A. Pacella

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Bilson +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 dab@pgslaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/16/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Phillips, Jr. +1 302 655 4200 +1 302 655 4210 jcp@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wesley E. Weeks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wesley E. Weeks

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory J. Brodzik +1 267 767 8417 gbrodzik@ycst.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Michael Lennon +1 302 252 4320 +1 302 252 4330 jlennon@ycst.com
Astrazeneca AB Astrazeneca AB, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com
AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jill K. MacAlpine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill K. MacAlpine

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark J. Feldstein

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Feldstein

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan P. O'Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P. O'Quinn
Astrazeneca UK, Ltd. Astrazeneca UK, Ltd., Counter-Defendant
Officially listed as "AstraZeneca UK Limited"
Officer/Director, Viela Bio, Inc.
Officer/Director, Zeneca Group Plc

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin A. Smyth +1 302 984 6300 bsmyth@mccarter.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORAL ORDER: On or before March 10, 2016, each party or each party group shall email to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Cathleen Kennedy, the information requested in the attached Order. Ordered by Judge Thynge on 2/25/16. (Attachments: # 1 Order Requesting Information re: ADR) Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00999-RGA et al.(cak) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. The above-captioned actions are hereby consolidated for all discovery and validity trial, but not for infringement trials, into C.A. No. 15-1000-RGA. From this point forward, all filings pertaining to any of the above-captioned actions shall be filed on the docket in C.A. No. 15-1000-RGA. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2016. Fact Discovery completed by 6/8/2017. Joint Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 1/25/2017. A Markman Hearing is set for 2/14/2017, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/16/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 3 day Bench Trial on validity issues is set for 3/26/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. One day Bench Trials are set for 4/2/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; 4/4/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; 4/6/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; 4/9/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6B; 4/11/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; 4/13/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; 4/16/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; 4/18/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A; 4/20/2018, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2016. Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00999-RGA et al.(nms) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
      PROPOSED Scheduling Order, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 2/25/2016 (nms). (Entered: 02/25/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on 02-10-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2016. (lad) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
          Proposed Scheduling Order, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Silver, Daniel) Modified on 2/9/2016 (nms). (Entered: 02/08/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 21 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 2/10/2016, at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2016. (nms) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against all Plaintiffs, by Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Lennon, James) Modified on 1/4/2016 (nms). (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney James Michael Lennon. Attorney John C. Phillips, Jr., and David A. Bilson of Phillips, Goldman & Spence, P.A. terminated. (Lennon, James) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SO ORDERED Granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice regarding Defendant Mylan, Inc., filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Mylan Inc. terminated., Attorney John C. Phillips, Jr; James H. Wallace, Jr; Wesley E. Weeks; David A. Bilson and Mark A. Pacella terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/14/2015. (nms) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Defendant Mylan Inc. and Amending Caption to Reflect Same, by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Smyth, Benjamin) Modified on 12/10/2015 (nms). (Entered: 12/09/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark J. Feldstein, Charles E. Lipsey, Ryan P. O'Quinn and Jill K. MacAlpine - filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Certification for Mark J. Feldstein, Charles E. Lipsey, Ryan P. O'Quinn and Jill K. MacAlpine)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James H. Wallace, Jr., Mark A. Pacella and Wesley E. Weeks - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of James H. Wallace, Jr., # 2 Certification of Mark A. Pacella, # 3 Certification of Wesley E. Weeks)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Mylan Inc. for Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Tom W. Jenkins re 12 Opening Brief in Support, by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Phillips, John) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms). (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Frank Mullery re 12 Opening Brief in Support, by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Phillips, John) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms). (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                  OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/10/2015. (Phillips, John) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms). (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John) Modified on 11/24/2015 (nms). (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 11/3/2015, answer due 11/24/2015. (Smyth, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Mailing regarding service on Mylan Inc. made on November 2, 2015, by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Smyth, Benjamin) Modified on 11/9/2015 (nms). (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca UK Limited filed by AstraZeneca UK Limited. (sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                              Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca AB filed by AstraZeneca AB. (sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca PLC for AstraZeneca LP filed by AstraZeneca LP. (sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,251,910; 6,525,060; 7,250,419; 7,265,124; 8,425,934. (sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 09/17/2015. Date of Expiration of Patent: SEE ANDA.Thirty Month Stay Deadline: 1/20/2019. (sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                        COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1818730.) - filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca UK Limited, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, AstraZeneca AB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(sec) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?