Sampo IP, LLC v. Blackboard, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00601
District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 12:18 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sampo Ip LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Matthew Haynes +1 703 684 8007 +1 709 647 5989 matthew.haynes@leclairryan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurin H. Mills +1 703 647 5903 +1 703 647 5953 laurin.mills@leclairryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sachin Kumar Gupta +1 212 612 3272 sachin.gupta@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason A LaBerteaux +1 212 612 3270 +22612329 226 612 3297 jason.laberteaux@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F Petrsoric +1 212 257 6494 +1 212 612 3297 john.petrsoric@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
No Logo Blackboard Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman & Canoles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Noona +1 757 624 3239 +1 757 624 3169 senoona@kaufcan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Duane Bright +1 949 851 0633 +1 949 851 9348 cbright@mwe.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Foster +1 949 757 7103 +1 949 851 9348 dfoster@mwe.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. Nadel +1 202 756 8000 +1 202 478 1847 mnadel@mwe.com
v.
No Logo Blackboard Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaufman & Canoles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Noona +1 757 624 3239 +1 757 624 3169 senoona@kaufcan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Duane Bright +1 949 851 0633 +1 949 851 9348 cbright@mwe.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Foster +1 949 757 7103 +1 949 851 9348 dfoster@mwe.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. Nadel +1 202 756 8000 +1 202 478 1847 mnadel@mwe.com
Salesforce.com, Inc. Salesforce.com, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Exacttarget, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ncino, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuireWoods LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William McFarland +1 757 640 3700 +1 757 640 3701 rmcfarland@mcguirewoods.com

Toggle Switch Represented by unither.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaun Robert Snader +1 703 282 8535 ssnader@unither.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry Ting-Hsi Pan +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 hpan@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Shatzer +1 202 973 8803 +1 202 973 8899 lshatzer@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Shih +1 650 493 6300 +1 650 565 5100 ashih@wsgr.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jose Carlos Villarreal +1 512 338 5400 +1 512 338 5499 jvillarreal@wsgr.com
No Logo Sampo Ip LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Matthew Haynes +1 703 684 8007 +1 709 647 5989 matthew.haynes@leclairryan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurin H. Mills +1 703 647 5903 +1 703 647 5953 laurin.mills@leclairryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sachin Kumar Gupta +1 212 612 3272 sachin.gupta@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason A LaBerteaux +1 212 612 3270 +22612329 226 612 3297 jason.laberteaux@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F Petrsoric +1 212 257 6494 +1 212 612 3297 john.petrsoric@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Whitman +1 212 257 4455 +1 212 612 3297 robert.whitman@mishcon.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and filed on 4/17/2014. (rsim, ) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/31/14. (afar) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
      Joint MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss by Blackboard, Inc., Sampo IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
        Response to 52 Discovery Plan (Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Rule 26(f) Report) filed by Blackboard, Inc., Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
          Discovery Plan by Sampo IP, LLC.(Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
            ANSWER to Counterclaim by Sampo IP, LLC.(Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
              Rebuttal Brief re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Induced Infringement, Contributory Infringement, and Willful Infringement filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                Memorandum in Opposition re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Induced Infringement, Contributory Infringement, and Willful Infringement filed by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 47 the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jose C. Villarreal as certified by Local Counsel Shaun R. Snader. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 01/15/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jose C. Villarreal and Certification of Local Counsel Shaun R. Snader Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3811616. by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Snader, Shaun) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 41 the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Raymond Foster as certified by Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 01/10/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 40 the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Duane Bright as certified by Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 01/10/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 35 the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Albert Shih as certified by Local Counsel Shaun R. Snader. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 01/10/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER granting 34 the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Larry L. Shatzer as certified by Local Counsel Shaun R. Snader. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 01/10/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 33 the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Ting-Hsi Pan as certified by local counsel Shaun R. Snader. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 01/10/2014. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Raymond Foster and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3802546. by Blackboard, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                  Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Duane Bright and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3802537. by Blackboard, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM and against Sampo IP, LLC by Blackboard, Inc..(Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                      Brief in Support to 37 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Induced Infringement, Contributory Infringement, and Willful Infringement filed by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Induced Infringement, Contributory Infringement, and Willful Infringement by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                          Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (McFarland, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                            Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Albert Shih and Certification of Local Counsel Shaun R. Snader Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3801570. by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Snader, Shaun) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Larry L. Shatzer and Certification of Local Counsel Shaun R. Snader Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3783624. by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Snader, Shaun) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry Ting-Hsi Pan and Certification of Local Counsel Shaun R. Snader Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3783617. by Salesforce.com, Inc.. (Snader, Shaun) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Robert Snader on behalf of Salesforce.com, Inc. (Snader, Shaun) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER that the time within which Defendant Salesforce.com, Inc. may answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and through January 6, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 12/12/2013. (rsim, ) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Berger as certified by Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes for Sampo IP, LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/10/2013. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Berger and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Blackboard, Inc. served on 11/21/2013; and as to Salesforce.com, Inc. served on 11/21/2013 (rsim, ) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Blackboard shallhave through and including January 6, 2014, in which to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 12/3/2013. (rsim, ) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 16 , the Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Whitman as certified by Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes for Sampo IP, LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/03/2013. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING ECF 15, the Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Raskin as certified by Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes for Sampo IP, LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/03/2013. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 14 , the Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John F. Petrsoric as certified by Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes for Sampo IP, LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/03/2013. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 13 , the Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason LaBerteaux as certified by Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes for Sampo IP, LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/03/2013. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER GRANTING ECF 12, the Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sachin K. Gupta as certified by Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes for Sampo IP, LLC. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/03/2013. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 20 , the Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Scott Nadel as certified by Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 12/03/2013. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Scott Nadel and Certification of Local Counsel Stephen Edward Noona Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3764958. by Blackboard, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Blackboard, Inc.. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Blackboard, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Noona on behalf of Blackboard, Inc. (Noona, Stephen) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Whitman and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Raskin and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John F. Petrsoric and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason LaBerteaux and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sachin K. Gupta and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Berger and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) Modified on 12/10/2013 (rsim, ). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Whitman and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3750875. by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark S. Raskin and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3750844. by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John F. Petrsoric and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3750830. by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason LaBerteaux and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3750822. by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sachin K. Gupta and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3750795. by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Berger and Certification of Local Counsel C. Matthew Haynes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-3750677. by Sampo IP, LLC. (Haynes, C. Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Summons Issued, original and one copy, as requested to Blackboard, Inc. and Salesforce.com, Inc. (summons package to be picked up by plaintiff's attorney) (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Judge Notice & Judge's Instructions)(tbro) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Report on the filing of an action regarding patent(s) 6,161,149; 6,772,229; 8,015,495. (tbro) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sampo IP, LLC. (tbro) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Blackboard, Inc., Salesforce.com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 14683039841), filed by Sampo IP, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Receipt)(tbro) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?