Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. BlackBerry Limited et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00362
District Judge Walter S. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 9:19 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Affinity Labs Of Texas, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray Reed & McGraw PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Greer Henry, Sr. +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 dhenry@grayreed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray Reed and McGraw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell E Jumper +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 rjumper@grayreed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAMAN, HOWELL, SMITH & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Palmer +1 254 755 4100 +1 254 754 6331 palmer@namanhowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Arenz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 parenz@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Burgess +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 dburgess@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cyrus A. Morton +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 cmorton@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J. Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 621 339 4181 rschutz@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shira T. Shapiro +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 sshapiro@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Tietz +1 612 349 8492 ktietz@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Manske +1 612 349 8786 +1 612 339 4181 wemanske@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela M. Munoz-Kaphing +1 612 349 8284 +1 612 339 4181 ammunoz-kaphing@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Elizabeth Roberg-Perez +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 seroberg-perez@rkmc.com
v.
No Logo Blackberry Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheria Dranise Smith +1 214 550 8162 +1 214 550 8185 ssmith@carterstafford.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Chapin Columbia +1 617 535 4074 +1 617 535 3800 scolumbia@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Stuart Dean +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 jdean@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hayman +1 310 551 9334 rhayman@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hasan M. Rashid +1 617 535 4004 hrashid@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tala Katherine Toufanian +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 Ttoufanian@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry B. Wong +1 713 653 1908 bwong@mwe.com
BlackBerry Ltd. BlackBerry Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "BlackBerry Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheria Dranise Smith +1 214 550 8162 +1 214 550 8185 ssmith@carterstafford.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Chapin Columbia +1 617 535 4074 +1 617 535 3800 scolumbia@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Stuart Dean +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 jdean@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hayman +1 310 551 9334 rhayman@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hasan M. Rashid +1 617 535 4004 hrashid@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tala Katherine Toufanian +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 Ttoufanian@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry B. Wong +1 713 653 1908 bwong@mwe.com
No Logo Affinity Labs Of Texas, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray Reed & McGraw PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Greer Henry, Sr. +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 dhenry@grayreed.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Greer Henry, Sr. +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 dhenry@grayreed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gray Reed and McGraw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell E Jumper +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 rjumper@grayreed.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell E Jumper +1 214 954 4135 +1 214 953 1332 rjumper@grayreed.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAMAN, HOWELL, SMITH & LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Palmer +1 254 755 4100 +1 254 754 6331 palmer@namanhowell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Palmer +1 254 755 4100 +1 254 754 6331 palmer@namanhowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Arenz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 parenz@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Arenz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 parenz@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Burgess +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 dburgess@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel R. Burgess +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 dburgess@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cyrus A. Morton +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 cmorton@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cyrus A. Morton +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 cmorton@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J. Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 621 339 4181 rschutz@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J. Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 621 339 4181 rschutz@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shira T. Shapiro +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 sshapiro@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shira T. Shapiro +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 sshapiro@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Tietz +1 612 349 8492 ktietz@robinskaplan.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristine Tietz +1 612 349 8492 ktietz@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Manske +1 612 349 8786 +1 612 339 4181 wemanske@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E. Manske +1 612 349 8786 +1 612 339 4181 wemanske@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela M. Munoz-Kaphing +1 612 349 8284 +1 612 339 4181 ammunoz-kaphing@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela M. Munoz-Kaphing +1 612 349 8284 +1 612 339 4181 ammunoz-kaphing@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Elizabeth Roberg-Perez +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 seroberg-perez@rkmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Elizabeth Roberg-Perez +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 seroberg-perez@rkmc.com
No Logo Blackberry Corporation, Counter Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheria Dranise Smith +1 214 550 8162 +1 214 550 8185 ssmith@carterstafford.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Chapin Columbia +1 617 535 4074 +1 617 535 3800 scolumbia@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Stuart Dean +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 jdean@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hayman +1 310 551 9334 rhayman@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hasan M. Rashid +1 617 535 4004 hrashid@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tala Katherine Toufanian +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 Ttoufanian@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry B. Wong +1 713 653 1908 bwong@mwe.com
BlackBerry Ltd. BlackBerry Ltd., Counter Plaintiff
Officially listed as "BlackBerry Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheria Dranise Smith +1 214 550 8162 +1 214 550 8185 ssmith@carterstafford.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Steven Torkelson +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jtorkelson@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Chapin Columbia +1 617 535 4074 +1 617 535 3800 scolumbia@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Stuart Dean +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 jdean@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell Hayman +1 310 551 9334 rhayman@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hasan M. Rashid +1 617 535 4004 hrashid@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tala Katherine Toufanian +1 310 277 4110 +1 310 277 4730 Ttoufanian@mwe.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Henry B. Wong +1 713 653 1908 bwong@mwe.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Counter Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Counter Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., LTD"

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com
No Logo Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Counter Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., LTD"

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com
No Logo Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGinnis, Lochridge & Kilgore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Duncan Milvenan +1 512 495 6005 +1 512 505 6305 rmilvenan@mcginnislaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Northern District of California District as case number 5:14-CV-3031. (ad) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING 99 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDERED that 100 Sealed Motion is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that all pending motions in this case 68 , 73 , 76 , 78 , 91 & 97 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Sealed Motion filed. Referral Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document) (ad) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William E. Manske ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6595370) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Henry, David) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, re 97 MOTION AFFINITY LABS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF ITS MOTION TO RECONSIDER TRANSFER OF VENUE re 96 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hasan Rashid, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Rashid, Hasan) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              MOTION AFFINITY LABS' MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF ITS MOTION TO RECONSIDER TRANSFER OF VENUE re 96 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Henry, David) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Referral Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Motion to Reconsider Transfer of Venue, # 2 Sealed Document Proposed Order Motion for Leave, # 3 Sealed Document Proposed Order Motion to Reconsider) (Henry, David) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                  Affinity Labs' Answer to Blackberry's Counterclaims ANSWER to 80 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC.(Henry, David) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                    Affinity Labs' Answer to Samsung's Counterclaims ANSWER to 79 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC.(Henry, David) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING 39 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF RELATED CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab A - Order Transfer)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. Referral Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Proposed Order, # 2 Sealed Document Reply in Support of Cross Motion for Protective Order, # 3 Sealed Document Declaration of Munoz-Kaphing, # 4 Sealed Document Exhibit A to Declaration of Munoz, # 5 Sealed Document Exhibit B to Declaration of Munoz, # 6 Sealed Document Exhibit C to Declaration of Munoz) (Henry, David) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER, Discovery Hearing set for 6/16/2014 08:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (tb) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske: Pretrial Conference held on 6/5/2014. A Telephone Conference was held. Topics and issues were discussed by the parties. Court ordered that a Proposed Draft Order be received by e-mail by 5:00 p.m. Friday, June 6, 2014. The Court set Monday, June 16th at 8:00 a.m. for a Discovery Hearing. The Court has requested that the parties put together a draft Order which is agreeable to both Plaintiffs and Defendants as to form listing areas of disagreement. This should be entered by June 9, 2014 if possible. The July 15 date listed in the Court's Order is going to be moved to June 27. Discovery disputes are to be handled by e-mailing letter briefs no later than Tuesday, June 10 with a copy to the other side. Responsive briefs may then be e-mailed. The discovery disputes will be heard on June 16. The Hearing on the 16th will include: discovery disputes, licensing issues, plan for production and timeframe for depositions; an adr plan and to discuss staging. Pre-hearing briefing proposals should be e-mailed in the form of a letter brief with a copy to all parties, as well as the Clerk's office. Parties from each case shall be copied on the things in the other case at this point. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.)(tb) (Main Document 89 replaced on 6/5/2014) (sm3). (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER GRANTING 77 Motion to Amend Pre-Markman Deadlines. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 1/5/2015 09:00AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, Jury Trial set for 1/5/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2014, Discovery due by 10/28/2014, Motions due by 10/28/2014. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (mc5) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 6/5/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (mc5) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske: Status Conference held on 6/3/2014. A Telephone Conference was held. Topics and issues were discussed by parties. Court ordered Plaintiff to produce the proposed language by close of business today, 6/3/14 by 5:00 p.m. central to all Defendants and will require a Response from Defendants by 5:00 p.m. on 6/4/14 as to whther or not the Protective Order can be modified appropriately. Parties are to confer as to a date that an all day hearing can be held. The dates to be considered are June 16-18. A Telephone Conference was set for 6/5/14 at 10:00a.m. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter FTR.)(mc5) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Jeffrey C. Manske. (ad) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                          ATTACHMENT [Proposed] Order to 82 Response to Motion, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC, re 78 Opposed MOTION Affinity Labs' Opposed Motion for Status Conference on Discovery Issues re 42 Scheduling Order, filed by Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                              RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Rashid, Hasan) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER to 66 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC by BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation.(Rashid, Hasan) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                  ANSWER to 67 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC by Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC.(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Opposed MOTION Affinity Labs' Opposed Motion for Status Conference on Discovery Issues re 42 Scheduling Order, by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick M. Arenz, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend Pre-Markman Deadlines re 42 Scheduling Order, by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Reply, # 2 Exhibit Tab B, # 3 Affidavit Declaration-Hong, # 4 Proposed Order) (Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                          STIPULATION Joint Stipulation as to Discovery from Experts or Consultants by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                            DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 71 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (ad) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Affinity Labs' Opposition Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Sealed Document Affinity Labs' Proposed Order, # 3 Sealed Document Declaration of A. Munoz-Kaphing, # 4 Sealed Document Exhibit 1) (Henry, David) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF JOINDER IN SAMSUNG'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited re 68 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rashid, Hasan) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Sealed Document, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of A. Munoz-Kaphing, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Henry, David) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority to 34 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Wong, Blake) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheria Dranise Smith on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. Attorney Sheria Dranise Smith added to party BlackBerry Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sheria Dranise Smith added to party BlackBerry Limited(pty:dft) (Smith, Sheria) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Hong Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Hong Dec; Exs A-D, # 4 Proposed Order)(Milvenan, Richard) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Samsung TeleCommunications America, LLC amending, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited amending 1 Complaint., filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry on behalf of Sharon E. Roberg-Perez ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6484657) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry on behalf of Angela M. Munoz-Kaphing ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6484394) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER Granting 58 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        ADR Report Filed - CONSENT - BlackBerry's ADR Docketing Statement by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited(Dean, Jon) Modified on 5/12/2014 to add CONSENT(ad). (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          ADR Report Filed - Affinity Labs' Individual ADR Docketing Statement by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Affinity Labs' Motion to Supplement Scheduling Order by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Morton, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 34 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant BlackBerry Corporation, Defendant BlackBerry Limited AFFINITY LABS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN OPPOSITION TO THE BLACKBERRY DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Henry, David) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING 28 Motion to Dismiss the Induced Infringement Claim. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint with the Clerk of the Court within 14 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is admonished that failure to timely file an amended complaint will bar it from reasserting the induced infringement claim in this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell Hayman for BlackBerry Corporation,Russell Hayman for BlackBerry Limited. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Steven Torkelson for Blake Wong ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6428270) by on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Steven Torkelson for Tala Katherine Toufanian ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6428233) by on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Steven Torkelson for Hasan Rashid ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6428183) by on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Steven Torkelson for Sarah Chapin Columbia ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6428120) by on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Steven Torkelson for Jon Dean ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6428055) by on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Steven Torkelson for Russell Hayman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-6427915) by on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Order, sua sponte, Concerning Courtroom Decorum and Trial Procedures.. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Selection set for 10/27/2014 09:00AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, Jury Trial set for 10/27/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Walter S. Smith, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/9/2014, Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2014, Discovery due by 8/29/2014, Joinder of Parties due by 5/14/2014, Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2014. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion to Consolidate Cases, and the Proposed Scheduling Motions are DENIED. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, re 39 Sealed Motion filed filed by Defendant BlackBerry Corporation, Defendant BlackBerry Limited to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Motion filed (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document, # 2 Sealed Document, # 3 Sealed Document, # 4 Sealed Document, # 5 Proposed Order) (ad) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE Affinity Lab's Reply In Support of Motion To Consolidate to 35 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 34 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant BlackBerry Corporation, Defendant BlackBerry Limited AFFINITY LABS' OPPOSITION TO THE BLACKBERRY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Russell W. White, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Kristine A. Tietz, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits A thru J)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, re 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Induced Infringement with Brief in Support filed by Defendant BlackBerry Corporation, Defendant BlackBerry Limited (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, re 31 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases Affinity Labs' Opposed Motion to Consolidate filed by Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Defendants' Opposed Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibit 1 Torkelson Declaration w/ Exhs. A-J, # 3 Exhibit 1 Torkelson Declaration Exhs. K-U, # 4 Sealed Document Exhibit 2 Geng Declaration, # 5 Sealed Document Exhibit 3 Taylor Declaration w/ Exhs. A-H, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Under Seal) (Torkelson, John) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Scheduling Recommendations Affinity Labs Reply Brief In Support of Its Motion for Entry of a Proposed Schedule and In Opposition to Blackberrys Motion re. Dkt. 30 by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC, re 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Induced Infringement with Brief in Support filed by Defendant BlackBerry Corporation, Defendant BlackBerry Limited Affinity Labs' Opposition to Blackberry's Motion to Dismiss Affinity Labs' Claim of Induced Infringement (Henry, David) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases Affinity Labs' Opposed Motion to Consolidate by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition to 29 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Torkelson Declaration Ex. A, # 2 Proposed Order Ex. B)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Opposed Motion for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Induced Infringement with Brief in Support by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Patrick M. Arenz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6152756) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. This order replaces 25 which was previously entered as the docket clerk erroneously listed the defendant incorrectly on the previous order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Torkelson, John) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (ad) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Patrick M. Arenz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6152756) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Carter, E.) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by E. Leon Carter on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Carter, E.) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shira T. Shapiro for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Burgess for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kristine A. Tietz for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cyrus A. Morton for Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Walter S. Smith. (tb) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Shira T. Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6062700) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Ronald J. Schutz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6059932) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Daniel R. Burgess ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6059876) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Kristine A. Tietz ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6059748) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Greer Henry for Cyrus A. Morton ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-6057411) by on behalf of Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Henry, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (mc5) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Ronald J. Schutz re attorny admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Cyrus A. Morton re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Daniel R. Burgess re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Shira T. Shapiro re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Kristine A. Tietz re attorney admission requirements. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mc5) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Henry, David) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-6039584). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Henry, David) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?