Blue Water Investment LLC v. Creative Bath Products, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-13125
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2018 at 8:24 PM DT (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Blue Water Investment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Steven N. Fox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven N. Fox +1 781 713 4244 +1 781 821 8919 sfox@foxpatent.com
v.
No Logo Creative Bath Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kmart Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Blue Water Investment LLC (Fox, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading due by cob 9.25.15. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
      First MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/25/2015 to File Responsive Pleading to First Amended Complaint by Blue Water Investment LLC.(Fox, Steven) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Blue Water Investment LLC. Acknowledgement filed by Blue Water Investment LLC. (Fox, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Blue Water Investment LLC. Creative Bath Products, Inc. served on 8/11/2015, answer due 9/1/2015. Acknowledgement filed by Blue Water Investment LLC. (Fox, Steven) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
            Summons Issued as to Creative Bath Products, Inc., Kmart Corporation. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Franklin, Yvonne) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                REPORT ON THE FILING/TERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING PATENT OR TRADEMARK. (Fox, Steven) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/11/2015)to correct fillable form (Franklin, Yvonne). (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5698035 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Blue Water Investment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Fox, Steven) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/11/2015) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/11/2015) to correct fillable forms (Franklin, Yvonne). (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 104 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?