J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Camacho
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Western District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00141

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 1:20 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 0605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/31/17 granting 21 Motion for Default Judgment. cc: Counsel, Jose Camacho, Gabriel Guzman (DJT)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Mail Returned
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Default Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Default Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Entry of Default
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Entry of Default
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Case Assignment
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?