RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION TO DISMISS 72 Amended Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Forum Non Conveniens filed by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larrain Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversion, Maquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Replies due by 12/27/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Francisco Gonzalez de Cossio, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Enrique Gonzalez Calvillo, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Gabriel Soledad)(Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
AFFIDAVIT signed by : Adam S. Hakki. re 80 MOTION TO DISMISS 72 Amended Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Forum Non Conveniens by Citigroup Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Oscar Cruz Barney. re 80 MOTION TO DISMISS 72 Amended Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Forum Non Conveniens by Citigroup Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
MOTION TO DISMISS 72 Amended Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and For Forum Non Conveniens by Citigroup Inc.. Responses due by 11/7/2016 (Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER granting 78 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Defendant's brief in support of its motion to dismiss and the Plaintiffs' brief in opposition thereto shall each not exceed 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (zvr) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spoont, Joshua) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Partner Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund (GP) Limited (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 54 Motion for Judicial Notice, in light of the filing of the Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [ECF No. 72]. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/24/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Citigroup Inc., filed by Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Moneda International Inc., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Marfield Maritime Inc., Hoop Lobith International B.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, Calvi Shipping C.V., ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Waypoint Asset Management LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Nordic Trustee ASA, Shanara International SA., Halani International Ltd., Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited.(Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER denying 59 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Forum Non Conveniens Discovery and Request to Extend Deadline to Amend Complaint. The Plaintiffs have not established good cause to conduct forum non conveniens discovery. Even had they done so, the request is overbroad and fails to identify any necessary discovery with any particularity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the deadlines set forth in the Court's Endorsed Order entered June 14, 2016 [ECF No. 63]. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 8/9/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 MOTION for Discovery Forum Non Conveniens MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint MOTION for Hearing filed by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER granting 67 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum of law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 50] that is no more than 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 7/5/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 MOTION for Discovery Forum Non Conveniens MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint MOTION for Hearing filed by Citigroup Inc.. Replies due by 7/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
Notice of Supplemental Authority re 50 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,,,, for Forum Non ConveniensDefendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Citigroup Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER granting 60 Agreed Joint Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion for Forum Non Conveniens Discovery; granting 62 Renewed Agreed Joint Motion Regarding Extension of Deadlines. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the following schedule is set:(1) The Defendant shall file its memorandum in opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Forum Non Conveniens Discovery [ECF No. 59] by 6/30/2016;(2) The Plaintiffs shall file their reply to the same by 7/13/2016;(3) The Plaintiffs' deadline to amend the Complaint as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) is extended until 14 days from the date of the Court's disposition of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Forum Non Conveniens Discovery [ECF No. 59];(4) The Plaintiffs' deadline for filing their memorandum in opposition to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 50] is extended until (a) 40 days after the date of Court's disposition of the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Forum Non Conveniens Discovery, if no discovery is permitted; or (b) 40 days after completion of forum non conveniens discovery, if any discovery is permitted; and(5) The Defendant's deadline for filing a reply to Plaintiffs' opposition memorandum is extended until 40 days after Plaintiffs file their opposition memorandum. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 6/14/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
Agreed Joint MOTION to Continue /Modify Briefing Schedule re 59 MOTION for Discovery Forum Non Conveniens MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint MOTION for Hearing filed by Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Shanara International SA., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Hoop Lobith International B.V., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Halani International Ltd., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Nordic Trustee ASA, Blue Marine Technology Group, Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Padstow Financial Corp., Marfield Maritime Inc., Calvi Shipping C.V., Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, Otto Candies, LLC, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Moneda International Inc., Waypoint Asset Management LLC by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Responses due by 6/27/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morillo, Juan) Modified Text on 6/10/2016 (ls). (Entered: 06/09/2016)
Clerks Notice to Filer re 59 MOTION for Discovery Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Conduct Forum Non Conveniens Discovery, Request to Extend Deadline to Amend Complaint, Incorporated Memorandum of Law, and Request for Hearing. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
Renewed Agreed Joint MOTION for Extension of Time/Deadlines by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morillo, Juan) Modified Text on 6/8/2016 (ls). (Entered: 06/07/2016)
MOTION for Discovery Forum Non Conveniens by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Responses due by 6/24/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gabriel F. Soledad, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morillo, Juan). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint, MOTION for Hearing on 6/8/2016 (ls). (Entered: 06/07/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 56 Agreed Joint Motion for Extension of Deadlines. The parties may refile this motion and the Court will consider it after the Plaintiffs file their forthcoming motion seeking discovery relating to the forum non conveniens arguments raised in the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 6/6/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Clerks Notice to Filer re 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiffs to Amend Complaint as a Matter of Course and Oppose the Motion to Dismiss and for Defendant to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re 50 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Compl. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ls) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
Agreed Joint MOTION for Extension of Time/Deadlines by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Morillo, Juan) Modified Text on 6/3/2016 (ls). (Entered: 06/02/2016)
Clerks Notice to Filer re 54 Notice (Other),. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
Motion requesting Judicial Notice in support by Citigroup Inc. re 50 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,,,, for Forum Non ConveniensDefendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (Garcia-Linares, Manuel) Modified to convert document to a motion on 5/10/2016 (ls). (Entered: 05/09/2016)
AFFIDAVIT signed by : Adam S. Hakki, Esq.. re 50 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,,,, for Forum Non ConveniensDefendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Citigroup Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
AFFIDAVIT signed by : Dr. Oscar Cruz Barney. re 50 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,,,, for Forum Non ConveniensDefendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Citigroup Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,,,,,, for Forum Non Conveniens, Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint,,,,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 5/26/2016) by Citigroup Inc.. (Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER granting 48 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Defendant is permitted to file a motion to dismiss of no more than 35 pages in length. The Plaintiffs are permitted to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss of no more than 35 pages in length. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 5/9/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Briefing on Motion to Dismiss by Citigroup Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, Georgia) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter W. Homer on behalf of Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Blue Marine Technology Group(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Calvi Shipping C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Coperatieve Rabobank U.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party EIG Global Project Fund II LTD.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Gulf Investments and Services Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Halani International Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Hoop Lobith International B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party ICE 1 EM CLO Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin (pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Marfield Maritime Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Moneda International Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos (pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V. (pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Nordic Trustee ASA(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Otto Candies, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Padstow Financial Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Shanara International SA.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Shipyard De Hoop B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Peter W. Homer added to party Waypoint Asset Management LLC(pty:pla). (Homer, Peter) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Approval of the Proposed Briefing Schedule. The Defendant Citigroup shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 5/9/2016. The Plaintiffs shall file any opposition thereto no later than 7/8/2016. The Defendant shall file any reply no later than 8/8/2016. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/21/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Georgia A. Thompson on behalf of Citigroup Inc.. Attorney Georgia A. Thompson added to party Citigroup Inc.(pty:dft). (Thompson, Georgia) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Manuel Antonio Garcia-Linares on behalf of Citigroup Inc.. Attorney Manuel Antonio Garcia-Linares added to party Citigroup Inc.(pty:dft). (Garcia-Linares, Manuel) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nordic Trustee ASA identifying Corporate Parent Nordic Trustee Holding ASA, Other Affiliate DNB Bank ASA, Other Affiliate Nordea Bank AB for Nordic Trustee ASA (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos identifying Corporate Parent Moneda Asset Management S.A. for Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Padstow Financial Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Moneda Asset Management S.A. for Moneda International Inc. (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V. identifying Corporate Parent Grupo Maquinas Diesel, S.A. de C.V. for Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V. (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hoop Lobith International B.V., Shipyard De Hoop B.V. identifying Corporate Parent Shipyard De Hoop B.V. for Hoop Lobith International B.V.; Corporate Parent Stichting Administratiekantoor Shipyard De Hoop B.V. for Shipyard De Hoop B.V. (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Marfield Maritime Inc., Shanara International SA. identifying Corporate Parent Coastline Group Incorporated for Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Marfield Maritime Inc., Shanara International SA. (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V. identifying Corporate Parent Blue Marine Technology Group for Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V. (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/9/2016. (zvr) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint,,,,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Otto Candies, LLC. All Defendants. (Trask, Gregory) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Patrick Jacobs on behalf of Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Blue Marine Technology Group(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Calvi Shipping C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Coperatieve Rabobank U.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party EIG Global Project Fund II LTD.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Gulf Investments and Services Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Halani International Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Hoop Lobith International B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party ICE 1 EM CLO Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin (pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Marfield Maritime Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Moneda International Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos (pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V. (pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Nordic Trustee ASA(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Otto Candies, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Padstow Financial Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Shanara International SA.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Shipyard De Hoop B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Patrick Jacobs added to party Waypoint Asset Management LLC(pty:pla). (Jacobs, Kevin) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan Pablo Morillo on behalf of Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory J. Trask on behalf of Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC. Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Blue Marine Technology Group(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Calvi Shipping C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Coperatieve Rabobank U.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party EIG Global Project Fund II LTD.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Gulf Investments and Services Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Halani International Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Hoop Lobith International B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party ICE 1 EM CLO Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin (pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Marfield Maritime Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Moneda International Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos (pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V. (pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Nordic Trustee ASA(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Otto Candies, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Padstow Financial Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Shanara International SA.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Shipyard De Hoop B.V.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory J. Trask added to party Waypoint Asset Management LLC(pty:pla). (Trask, Gregory) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
NOTICE by Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, Calvi Shipping C.V., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Halani International Ltd., Hoop Lobith International B.V., ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, Marfield Maritime Inc., Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Moneda International Inc., Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., Nordic Trustee ASA, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Shanara International SA., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Waypoint Asset Management LLC of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (srd) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William C. Turnoff is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (srd) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
COMPLAINT against Citigroup Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8521055, filed by Moneda S.A. Administradora General de Fondos, Moneda Renta CLP Fondo de Inversion, ICE 1 EM CLO Limited, Ashmore Emerging Markets Tri Asset Fund Limited, Larran Vial S.A. Sociedad Administradora De Fondos De Inversin, EIG Global Project Fund II LTD., Candies Mexican Investments S. de R.L. de C.V., Otto Candies, LLC, Gulf Investments and Services Ltd., Moneda International Inc., Copernico Capital Partners (Bermuda) Ltd., Mquinas Diesel S.A. de C.V., ICE Oryx Alpha Master Fund Limited, Marfield Maritime Inc., Hoop Lobith International B.V., Coastline Maritime Pte. Ltd., ICE Global Credit (DCAM) Master Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets High Yield Corporate Debt Fund, Moneda Latin American Corporate Debt, Ocean Mexicana, S.A. de C.V., Blue Marine Technology Group, ICE Focus EM Credit Master Fund Limited, Calvi Shipping C.V., ICE Global Credit Alpha Master Fund Limited, Moneda Dueda Latinoamericana Fondo de Inversion, Ashmore Emerging Markets Special Situations Opportunities Fund Limited Partnership, Waypoint Asset Management LLC, Padstow Financial Corp., Ashmore Emerging Markets Corporate High Yield Fund Limited, Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Debt Fund, Blue Marine Shipping II, S.A. de C.V., Coperatieve Rabobank U.A., Shipyard De Hoop B.V., Ashmore SICAV Emerging Markets Corporate Debt Fund, Ashmore Emerging Markets Debt and Currency Fund Limited, Nordic Trustee ASA, Shanara International SA., Halani International Ltd., Ashmore Emerging Markets High Yield Plus Fund Limited.(Morillo, Juan) (Entered: 02/26/2016)