Landmark Technology, LLC v. Nutrisystem Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00024
Magistrate Judge John D. Love, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 3:52 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Martin Gibson +1 310 201 3548 +1 310 203 0567 sgibson@jmbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reza Mirzaie +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rmirzaie@raklaw.com
No Logo Nutri/system, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Royal Davis +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 thomas.davis@morganlewis.com
v.
No Logo Nutri/system, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Winstol D. Carter, Jr. +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 winn.carter@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Royal Davis +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 thomas.davis@morganlewis.com
No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Marmaro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley Martin Gibson +1 310 201 3548 +1 310 203 0567 sgibson@jmbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Ainsworth +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 charley@pbatyler.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Christopher Bunt +1 903 531 3535 +1 903 533 9687 rcbunt@pbatyler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Reza Mirzaie +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 rmirzaie@raklaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Nutrisystem Inc is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
      Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Landmark Technology, LLC, Nutrisystem Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 19 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are STAYED to 6-19-2014. Parties are ordered to submit closing documents no later than 6-19-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/21/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE by Landmark Technology, LLC re 15 Order, Set Hearings Certificate of Interested Persons (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Nutrisystem Inc. of Finanical Interest Statement of Defendant Nutrisystem, Inc. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Landmark Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 5/30/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/28/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Landmark Technology, LLC CASE IS READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nutrisystem Inc. (Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                        Defendant Nutrisystem Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Landmark Technology, LLC by Nutrisystem Inc..(Davis, Thomas) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nutrisystem Inc..( Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                            Defendant Nutrisystem Inc.'s First Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nutrisystem Inc.( Carter, Winstol) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landmark Technology, LLC. Nutrisystem Inc served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Landmark Technology, LLC (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS Issued as to Nutrisystem Inc., and forwarded to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/18/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stanley M Gibson on behalf of Landmark Technology, LLC (Gibson, Stanley) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Landmark Technology, LLC (Bunt, Robert) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landmark Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against Nutrisystem Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4481032.), filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 87 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?