Chizmar v. Acco Brands Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-02181
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 2:24 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo James S Chizmar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush, Irene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaston Kroub +1 917 702 9135 gkroub@kskiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sergey Kolmykov +1 917 702 9135 skolmykov@kskiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@kskiplaw.com
No Logo ACCO Brands Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED shubham.mukherjee@btlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Powlen +1 317 727 2211 +1 317 231 7433 david.powlen@btlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad S.C. Stover +1 302 300 3474 chad.stover@btlaw.com
v.
No Logo ACCO Brands Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED shubham.mukherjee@btlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Powlen +1 317 727 2211 +1 317 231 7433 david.powlen@btlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad S.C. Stover +1 302 300 3474 chad.stover@btlaw.com
Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad S.C. Stover +1 302 300 3474 chad.stover@btlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goulston & Storrs, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/26/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY JONATHAN A. GRIPPO +1 212 878 6900 jgrippo@goulstonstorrs.com
No Logo James S Chizmar, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bush, Irene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gaston Kroub +1 917 702 9135 gkroub@kskiplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sergey Kolmykov +1 917 702 9135 skolmykov@kskiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@kskiplaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (109) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to 82 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by James S Chizmar. USCA Case Number 2015-1715. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Daniel E. O'Toole, Clerk USCA for the Federal Circuit. Certified: 02/08/2016. (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WITHOUT OPINION)(nd) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
    COST BOND OF NON-RESIDENT PLAINTIFF, BOND #3118973 posted by James S. Chimzar in the amount of $2,000.00, posted on August 3, 2015. (km) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 72 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion for Bond. For the foregoing reasons, the motion for attorneys' fees is DENIED, and the motion for an appeal bond is GRANTED in part. Within 30 days, the plaintiff shall post a bond in the amount of $2,000 as security for costs associated with his appeal. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/17/2015) (spo) Modified on 7/17/2015 (spo). (Entered: 07/17/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 75 Motion to Seal; granting 87 Motion to Seal; granting 93 Motion to Seal; granting 100 Motion to Seal. The motions to seal are GRANTED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/14/2015) (spo) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
          RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: 95 MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond). . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Zachary D. Silbersher in Opposition re: 95 MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond).. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
              DECLARATION of James S. Chizmar in Opposition re: 95 MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond).. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 95 MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond). . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Appeal Bond. . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Appeal Bond. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 95 MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond). (Redacted). Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Chad S.C. Stover in Support re: 95 MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond).. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 95 MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond). (Redacted). Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Bond (Appeal Bond). Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 93 MOTION to Seal the Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Appeal Bond. . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION to Seal the Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Appeal Bond. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document 92 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Zachary D. Silbersher in Opposition re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C, # 4 Exs. D-E, Q-R, # 5 Ex. F, # 6 Ex. G, # 7 Ex. H, # 8 Ex. I, # 9 Ex. J, # 10 Ex. K, # 11 Ex. L, # 12 Ex. M, # 13 Ex. N, # 14 Ex. O, # 15 Ex. P)(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of James S. Chizmar in Opposition re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 87 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Attorneys Fees. . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                              MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Attorneys Fees. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 84 Letter Request for Leave to File Motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7, filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants are free to file the motion described in the letter. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/16/2015) (spo) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Zachary Silbersher dated June 16, 2015 re: Defendants' Request for Leave to File Motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7 [Dkt. 84]. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated June 16, 2015 re: Request for Leave to File Motion pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 7. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF DOCKETING & USCA Case Number 15-1715 from the US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit assigned to 82 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by James S Chizmar. (nd) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT from 63 Clerk's Judgment,. Form 7 and Form 22 are due within 14 days. Document filed by James S Chizmar. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-11003122. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: ACCO's counterclaims for declaratory judgment against Chizmar are each dismissed without prejudice, subject to reinstatement in the event of reversal or remand of the Court's claim construction or summary judgment rulings on appeal. Nothing in this Stipulation should be construed as waiving or in any way affecting Defendants' ability to move the Court for recovery of their attorneys' fees and costs. Party James S Chizmar terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/4/2015) (spo) Modified on 6/8/2015 (spo). (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION of Chad S.C. Stover in Support re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Michael Kier in Support re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 77 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION to Seal Motion for Attorneys Fees. . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Seal Motion for Attorneys Fees. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation.(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Kier, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of Michael Kier, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Chad Stover, # 4 Exhibit Ex. A to Declaration of Chad Stover, # 5 Exhibit Ex. B to Declaration of Chad Stover, # 6 Exhibit Ex. C to Declaration of Chad Stover, # 7 Exhibit Ex. D to Declaration of Chad Stover)(Stover, Chad) Modified on 6/4/2015 (db). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation.(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              FILING ERROR - APPEAL OF FINAL JUDGMENT PENDING - BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION to recover costs against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. The Clerk may tax costs 14 days after this filing. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 6/17/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Bill of Costs)(Stover, Chad) Modified on 6/4/2015 (dt). Modified on 6/8/2015 (dt). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law Supporting Motion for Attorneys Fees, # 2 Affidavit of Michael Kier, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of Michael Kier, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Chad Stover, # 5 Exhibit Ex. A to Declaration of Chad Stover, # 6 Exhibit Ex. B to Declaration of Chad Stover, # 7 Exhibit Ex. C to Declaration of Chad Stover, # 8 Exhibit Ex. D to Declaration of Chad Stover)(Stover, Chad) Modified on 6/4/2015 (db). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Seal Motion for Attorneys Fees. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Stover, Chad) Modified on 6/4/2015 (db). (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 66 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants are free to file a motion provided they do so within seeven (7) days. The Court intimates no view on the merits of such a motion. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/26/2015) (spo) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Zachary Silbersher dated May 27, 2015 re: 66 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion to Recovery Attorneys' Fees addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated May 26, 2015. . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion to Recovery Attorneys' Fees addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated May 26, 2015. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 4/27/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 4/27/2015 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2015.(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              CLERK'S JUDGMENT: it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated May 8, 2015, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in its entirety; the Court need not reach the issue on Claim 17's; indefiniteness; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 5/13/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal Attachment 1, # 2 Right to Appeal Attachment 2)(tn) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 4/27/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 4/27/2015 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2015.(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Because Claim 20 of the '140 Patent is invalid as anticipated, and because the Flex Binders do not infringe Claim 17 of the '640 Patent, the defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in its entirety. The Court need not reach the issue of Claim 17's indefiniteness. The Clerk is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/8/2015) (kko) Modified on 5/11/2015 (kko). (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of and Application for Withdrawal as Counsel fo Shubham Mukherjee. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated April 28, 2015 re: MPEP. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation.(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc. There will be oral argument on the pending summary judgment motion on April 27, 2015 at 2 p.m. The Court will hear argument on the following two issues in successive rounds, i.e. each side will be heard on an issue before proceeding to the next issue: 1. The priority date of Claim 20 of the '140 patent. 2. Infringement of Claim 17 of the '640 patent, both literal infringement and by application of the doctrine of equivalents. The Court will not foreclose the parties from being heard on any other issue raised by the pending motion. The Court anticipates no more than one hour of argument. (Oral Argument set for 4/27/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/3/2015) (spo) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 54 Response to Motion filed by James S Chizmar. ENDORSEMENT: leave to submit sur-reply is granted, as is sur-sur reply and sur-sur-sur reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/8/2014) (mro) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated 12/5/2014 re: Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Request for Sur-Reply. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 49 Response to Motion, filed by James S Chizmar. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied without prejudice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/2/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Chad S.C. Stover in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 48 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/1/2014) (lmb) Modified on 12/2/2014 (lmb). (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Zachary D. Silbersher dated December 1, 2014 re: 48 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated 12/1/2014. . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated 12/1/2014. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Zachary D. Silbersher dated November 21, 2014 re: Oral Argument re Defendants Summary Judgment Motion. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Zachary D. Silbersher in Opposition re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 42 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion. . Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 40 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 Order, Set Deadlines 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated 11/18/2014. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 12/3/2014. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/18/2014) (ama) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 23 Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,, 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated 11/18/2014. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Summary Judgment on 10/31/2014. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Chad S.C. Stover in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Kyley Reed in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, E, F, G, H, and K, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit N)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Edward Busam in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, # 2 Exhibit G)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. Responses due by 11/21/2014(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Motion. . Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc.. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Summary Judgment Motion. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc..(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ADDENDUM...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SUBJECT TO ADDENDUM ORDER (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/15/2014) (tn) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed). Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Chad S.C. Stover dated September 12, 2014 re: mediation. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation.(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Zachary D. Silbersher dated September 12, 2014 re: Mediation. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: that Barnes & Thornburg LLP, 1000 N. West Street, Suite 1500, Wilmington, Delaware 19801, be substituted as attorneys of record for Staples, Inc. in the above-entitled action in the place and stead of Goulston & Storrs PC. Attorney Chad S.C. Stover for Staples, Inc. added. Attorney Jonathan Anthony Grippo terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/26/2014) (tn) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 21 Counterclaim. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Kolmykov, Sergey) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The parties may conduct discovery solely on the issues identified in defendants' proposed motion, described in paragraph 2 of the parties' July 1, 2014, letter (Docket # 22), until October 17, 2014. The Court does not anticipate granting an extension of this date. Within 14 days of the close of discovery in paragraph 1 hereof, defendants may file their motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff's response will be due 21 days after the motion is filed. Defendants may reply 7 days after the response is filed. Any issues of claim construction related to the motion may be addressed in the summary judgment submissions. All other discovery is stayed. (Discovery due by 10/17/2014.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/10/2014) (tn) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Zachary D. Silbersher dated July 1, 2014 re: Joint Letter On Behalf of All Parties re Initial Pre-Trial Conference Scheduled July 9, 2014 at 12:00 p.m.. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 2 Complaint,., COUNTERCLAIM against James S Chizmar. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation.(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation.(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 18 Motion for Shubham Mukherjee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Shubham Mukherjee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukherjee, Shubham) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Anthony Grippo on behalf of Staples, Inc.. (Grippo, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 2 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Staples, Inc..(Grippo, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Staples, Inc..(Grippo, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Shubham Mukherjee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9762479. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Good Standing Certificate, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mukherjee, Shubham) Modified on 6/10/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 12 Motion for Chad S.C. Stover to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Chad S.C. Stover to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9757047. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Good Standing Certificates (SC and DE), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Time to answer or move extended to June 23, 2014. Conference Adjourned From: June 4, 2014 To: July 9, 2014 at 12:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/27/2014) (tn) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David M. Powlen dated May 26, 2014. Document filed by Acco Brands Corporation.(Powlen, David) (Entered: 05/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The time for Staples to answer or move is extended to June 9. Application granted. Staples, Inc. answer due 6/9/2014. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/30/2014) (tn) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 9, 2014 for Defendant Staples, Inc. addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Zachary D. Silbersher dated April 30, 2014. Document filed by James S Chizmar.(Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Acco Brands Corporation waiver sent on 4/8/2014, answer due 6/9/2014. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Staples, Inc. served on 4/10/2014, answer due 5/1/2014. Service was accepted by Kerrie Barrett, Legal Dept. Document filed by James S Chizmar. (Silbersher, Zachary) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/4/2014 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 12C of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/3/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED STANDING ORDER IN RE IMPLEMENTATION OF PATENT PILOT PROGRAM IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 21, 2011). It appearing that the Court has elected to participate in the Pilot Project for Patent Cases established pursuant to Pub L. No. 111-349, 124 Stat. 3674. Therefore, effective November 21, 2011, the Court's participation in the Patent Pilot Project will commence and shall include pro se cases. The Pilot program will be subject to the following procedures: When a designated Pilot judge receives a patent case on initial assignment, the case shall be assigned to that judge for all purposes, without further notice to the Assignment Committee and the Case Assignment Unit.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/29/2012) (sjo) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jd) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Acco Brands Corporation, Staples, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401091131)Document filed by James S Chizmar.(jd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/1/2014: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (jd). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jd) (jd). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?