Lone Star WiFi LLC v. Omni Hotel Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00033
District Judge Michael H. Schneider, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 31, 2017 at 11:21 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham Swaim, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C Wright +1 214 646 1495 +1 214 613 1163 twright@cunninghamswaim.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick J. Conroy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan H. Rastegar +1 214 785 6670 +1 214 785 6680 jrastegar@bcpc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
No Logo Omni Hotels Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M McDowell +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 cmcdowell@rosewalker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Edward Rose +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 mrose@rosewalker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham Swaim, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross Cunningham +1 214 646 1495 +1 214 613 1163 rcunningham@cunninghamswaim.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex Joseph Whitman +1 214 646 1495 +1 214 613 1163 awhitman@cunninghamswaim.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C Wright +1 214 646 1495 +1 214 613 1163 twright@cunninghamswaim.com
No Logo Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M McDowell +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 cmcdowell@rosewalker.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Edward Rose +1 214 752 8600 +1 214 752 8700 mrose@rosewalker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cunningham Swaim, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ross Cunningham +1 214 646 1495 +1 214 613 1163 rcunningham@cunninghamswaim.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex Joseph Whitman +1 214 646 1495 +1 214 613 1163 awhitman@cunninghamswaim.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C Wright +1 214 646 1495 +1 214 613 1163 twright@cunninghamswaim.com
Marriott International, Inc. Marriott International, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Marie Haddock , +1 404 256 6900 +1 404 253 6901 amhaddock@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Norwood Jameson +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 wjameson@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 msyungwirth@duanemorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dacus Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deron R Dacus +1 903 705 1117 +1 903 705 1117 ddacus@dacusfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that all relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Omni Hotels Corporation and Omni Hotels Management Corporation are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. All claims against Defendant Marriott International Inc are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 13 Amended Complaint. ORDERED the Omni Defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to April 14, 2014. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/14/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Brent) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/7/2014) (sm, ). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marriott International, Inc..( Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Responsive Pleading Deadline by Lone Star WiFi LLC, Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alex Joseph Whitman on behalf of Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Whitman, Alex) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas C Wright on behalf of Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher M McDowell on behalf of Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation (McDowell, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ross Cunningham on behalf of Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Cunningham, Michael) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin Edward Rose on behalf of Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation (Rose, Martin) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison Haddock Hutton on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Hutton, Alison) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis Norwood Jameson on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Jameson, Louis) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marriott International, Inc..( Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated into cause number 6:14cv33, for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendantsto the lead case, as well as lead counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The Clerk shall close all cases listed above other than the lead case. Any motions - including motions challenging venue or jurisdiction - filed prior to consolidation in any of the consolidated cases must be refiled in Lead Case 6:14-cv-33 to be considered by the Court. Plaintiff shall file a notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the lead case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                        Return of Service Executed as to Omni Hotels Management Corporation on 2/5/2014, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                          Return of Service Executed as to Omni Hotels Corporation on 2/3/2014, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                            Plaintiff's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, Filed on behalf of Defendants Omni Hotels Corporation and Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                              SUMMONS REISSUED as to Omni Hotels Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Omni Hotels Corporation, filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,490,348, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,312,286, # 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,583,935)(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER that Plaintiff shall file a notice that the case is ready for a schedulingconference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. If the case is not ready for scheduling conference within 90 days of this order, Plaintiff must file a detailed status report explaining the reason for the delay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 01/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Omni Hotel Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        COMPLAINT against Omni Hotel Corporation, Omni Hotels Management Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4487207.), filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 7,490,348, # 3 Exhibit B - United States Patent No. 8,312,286, # 4 Exhibit C - United States Patent No. 8,583,935)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?