Variant Holdings LLC et al v. YELP! Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00066
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 7:30 PM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Variant Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Charles van Cleef, Attorney at Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Van Cleef +1 903 248 8244 +1 903 248 8249 charles@vancleef.pro

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall Lesesne Werner +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 mwerner@cepiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnathan K Yazdani-Beioky +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 jyazdani@cepiplaw.com

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Suite 125

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Edmonds +1 713 364 5291 +1 832 415 2535 jedmonds@ip-lit.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Brooks Long +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 jlong@cepiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen F Schlather +1 713 364 2371 +1 832 415 2535 sschlather@ip-lit.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
No Logo Variant Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Charles van Cleef, Attorney at Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Van Cleef +1 903 248 8244 +1 903 248 8249 charles@vancleef.pro

Represented by Collins Edmonds & Pogorzelski PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marshall Lesesne Werner +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 mwerner@cepiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Johnathan K Yazdani-Beioky +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 jyazdani@cepiplaw.com

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Suite 125

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Edmonds +1 713 364 5291 +1 832 415 2535 jedmonds@ip-lit.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Brooks Long +1 281 501 3425 +1 832 415 2535 jlong@cepiplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen F Schlather +1 713 364 2371 +1 832 415 2535 sschlather@ip-lit.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
v.
Yelp! Inc. Yelp! Inc., Defendant

Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daralyn J Durie +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 362 6300 ddurie@durietangri.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse Geraci +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 jgeraci@durietangri.com

Represented by Haltom & Doan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darby Vincent Doan +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 ddoan@haltomdoan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Haltom Doan +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 jdoan@haltomdoan.com

Represented by WARREN L. CONWAY, ATTORNEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morgan Day Vaughan +1 806 775 1100 +1 806 775 7930 morgandvaughan@gmail.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to 2 THIRD Amended Complaint by YELP! Inc.(ch, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against YELP! Inc, filed by Variant Holdings LLC, Variant Inc.(ch, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER the clerk is directed to SEVER the claims against Nextag and Yelp into individual causes of actions. Such severed actions are hereby ORDERED transferred to the Norther District of Calfornia. This order only applies to Nextag and Yelp (severed from case 2:11-cv-290). Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/13/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 45 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?