Lone Star WiFi LLC v. Marriott International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00050
District Judge Michael H. Schneider, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 9:58 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lone Star Wifi LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragalone Conroy PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan H. Rastegar +1 214 785 6670 +1 214 785 6680 jrastegar@bcpc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
Marriott International, Inc. Marriott International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alison Marie Haddock , +1 404 256 6900 +1 404 253 6901 amhaddock@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Norwood Jameson +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 wjameson@duanemorris.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Yungwirth +1 404 253 6900 +1 404 253 6901 msyungwirth@duanemorris.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant Marriott International Inc are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/14/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated into cause number 6:14cv33, for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as lead counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The Clerk shall close all cases listed above other than the lead case. Any motions - including motions challenging venue or jurisdiction - filed prior toconsolidation in any of the consolidated cases must be refiled in Lead Case 6:14cv33 to be considered by the Court. Plaintiff shall file a notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the lead case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison Haddock Hutton on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Hutton, Alison) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis Norwood Jameson on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Jameson, Louis) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marriott International, Inc..( Yungwirth, Matthew) Modified on 2/25/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Sean Yungwirth on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Yungwirth, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                        SUMMONS Issued as to Marriott International, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                            ***FILED IN ERROR. INCORRECT DOCUMENT. SEE ENTRY 7 FOR CORRECTED FILING.*** Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) Modified on 1/28/2014 (gsg). (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Lone Star WiFi LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4496839.), filed by Lone Star WiFi LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,490,348, # 3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,312,286, # 4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,583,935)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?