QualiQode, LLC v. Red Hat, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00214
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 5:34 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Qualiqode, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN MACHADO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Y Brandt +1 903 212 3130 +1 903 753 6761 tbrandt@thebrandtlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dotson Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Glyn Dotson +1 903 212 3113 +1 903 757 2387 darrell@dotsonlawfirm.com
v.
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Red Hat, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Bruce Perry +1 919 890 8759 dperry@redhat.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/28/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by QualiQode, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Hat, Inc..(Perry, David) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
        DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Hat, Inc..( Perry, David) Modified on 5/2/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/02/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of QualiQode, LLC (Dotson, Darrell) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Hat, Inc..( Perry, David) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by QualiQode, LLC. Red Hat, Inc. served on 3/18/2014, answer due 4/8/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Issued as to Red Hat, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                    Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K Part 1, # 2 Exhibit K Part 2, # 3 Exhibit L - US 6,073,109)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                      Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G - US 6,058,413, # 2 Exhibit H - JBoss-Enterprise, # 3 Exhibit I - JBoss_Enterprise BPEL Tools, # 4 Exhibit J -wsbpel-v2.0.pdg)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                        Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F Part 5, # 2 Exhibit F Part 6)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                          Additional Attachments to Main Document: 1 Complaint,.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F Part 3, # 2 Exhibit F Part 4)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Red Hat, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4562008.), filed by QualiQode, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US 5,630,069, # 3 Exhibit B - Red Hat JBoss BRMS, # 4 Exhibit C - BPMN, # 5 Exhibit D - Red Hat Customer Portal, # 6 Exhibit E - US 5, 734,837, # 7 Exhibit F Part 1, # 8 Exhibit F Part 2)(Brandt, Todd) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 37 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?