Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Ubisoft, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00628
District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 24, 2018 at 1:34 PM DT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Ubi Soft, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      Case reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark Christopher Lang on behalf of Ubisoft, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741778. (Lang, Mark) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric A Buresh on behalf of Ubisoft, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741236. (Buresh, Eric) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Wayne Hartsell; Edward R Nelson, III; Ryan Casey O'Neill; Jaime Kate Olin; Barry Bumgardner and Edward E Casto, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv626 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ubisoft, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ubisoft Entertianment SA for Ubisoft, Inc.. (Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Ubisoft, Inc..(Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                          Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubisoft, Inc..( Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubisoft, Inc..( Marriott, Michelle) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Issued as to Ubisoft, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT against Ubisoft, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4302070.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?