Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Texas Instruments Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00227
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2017 at 4:21 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Twelfth Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara N. Kerrane +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jill.adair@klgates.com
No Logo TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roth Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Aline Abraham +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 aa@rothfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brendan Clay Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 br@rothfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl R Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 cr@rothfirm.com
v.
No Logo TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Roth Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Aline Abraham +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 aa@rothfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brendan Clay Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 br@rothfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl R Roth +1 903 935 1665 +1 903 935 1797 cr@rothfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com
TERMINATED: 02/26/2013 Stephen Eugene Edwards +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 sedwards@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Ipswitch Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan T Harris +1 617 526 9663 +1 617 526 9899 n8harris@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by One International Place

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin J. Daniels +1 617 526 9600 jdaniels@proskauer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Willi Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Norman Willi +1 512 288 3200 +1 512 288 3202 jwilli@willilawfirm.com
No Logo Rosetta Stone Ltd., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Cheryl T Burgess +1 949 760 0404 +1 949 760 9502 cheryl.burgess@kmob.com
Space Jon W. Gurka +1 949 760 0404 +1 949 760 9502 jon.gurka@kmob.com
Space Joseph Robert Re +1 949 760 0404 +1 949 760 9502 jre@kmob.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Solarwinds Worldwide, LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Twelfth Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara N. Kerrane +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jill.adair@klgates.com
No Logo Solarwinds, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Gregory Schortgen +1 214 939 5567 +1 214 939 5849 steve.schortgen@klgates.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3100

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin E. Weed +1 312 781 7166 +1 312 345 1843 benjamin.weed@klgates.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Twelfth Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sara N. Kerrane +1 949 253 0900 +1 949 253 0902 jill.adair@klgates.com
No Logo Storagecraft Technology Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
Space Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maschoff Brennan Laycock Gilmore Israelsen & Wright, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Rachel Jacques +1 435 252 1360 rjacques@mabr.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE Charles J. Veverka +1 435 252 1360 cveverka@mabr.com
No Logo James Knowles, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Knowles Mediations

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Knowles +1 903 534 3800 +1 903 534 3806 jimk@knowlesmed.com
No Logo MICHAEL MCLEMORE, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of James A. McGurk, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T McLemore +1 713 224 1007 mtmesq@flash.net
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. All claims, counterclaims, and third-party claims in the instant suit are DISMISSED in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/21/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 82 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Ipswitch, Inc., Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims of Plaintiffs aredismissed with prejudice from the case. Defendant Ipswitchs counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs and Defendant Ipswitch shall each bear their own attorneys fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/20/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Ipswitch, Inc. by Ipswitch, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 80 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., SolarWinds, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, Uniloc USA, Inc. Any and all claims of Plaintiffs against Defendants SolarWinds, Inc. and SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC are dismissed with prejudice from the case. Defendants' counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendants SolarWinds, Inc. and SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sara N Kerrane on behalf of SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4401467. (Kerrane, Sara) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Markman Hearing held on 10/1/2013. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, ) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Patent Rule 4-5(d) Claim Construction Chart (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                    ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** Claim Construction Chart by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) Modified on 9/27/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-5(d) (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Estimated Amount of Time Required for Markman Hearing (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                          REPLY to 67 Claim Construction Brief filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit D, # 3 Exhibit E)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                            REPLY to 67 Claim Construction Brief filed by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Benjamin E. Weed, # 2 Exhibit A - '696 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B - 3/21/05 Response to Office Action, # 4 Exhibit C - Notice of Allowance, # 5 Exhibit D - Concise Oxford Dictionary Excerpt, # 6 Exhibit E - Merriam-Webster's Collegiate Dictionary Excerpt)(Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. Notice of Change of Lead Counsel for Defendants SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC and SolarWinds, Inc. (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. This case is REFERRED FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ONLY. The undersigned will continue to oversee all other matters. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE by SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, SolarWinds, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance Regarding Technology Tutorial (Sinclair, Bryan) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                    CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven W. Hartsell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 65 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiffs and Defendant Texas Instruments Incorporated are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/31/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Texas Instruments With Prejudice by Texas Instruments Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER appointing Michael McLemore as technical advisor to the Court in this action, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiffs and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Agreement for Proposed Technical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Patent Rule 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                REPORT of Mediation by James Knowles. Mediation result: Suspended(Knowles, James) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Texas Instruments Incorporated Defendants' Notice of Compliance with PR 4-1 Disclosures (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 57 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Rosetta Stone Ltd. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gurka, Jon) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 52 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Rosetta Stone Ltd are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Rosetta Stone Ltd. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ipswitch, Inc., SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC, Texas Instruments Incorporated DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-1 DISCLOSURES (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 49 Motion to Stay. All deadlines between Uniloc and Rosetta Stone are hereby stayed. Parties shall file dismissal papers by 3-22-2013, or the stay will be lifted. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/12/13. cc:attys 3-12-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Second MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Between Uniloc and Rosetta Stone by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephen Edwards terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/26/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by StorageCraft Technology Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Germer, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Protective Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stephen E. Edwards by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 41 Motion to Stay All Deadlines between Uniloc and Rosetta Stone. By 3/8/2013 the parties shall file either dismissal papers or a status report with the Court. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/13/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ipswitch, Inc., Rosetta Stone Ltd., SolarWinds, Inc., Texas Instruments Incorporated DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4 (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Agreed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Between Uniloc and Rosetta Stone by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 38 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/13. cc:attys 1-17-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting 37 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. All claims asserted in this suit between pltf and deft StorageCraft Technology Corporation are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them.Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/16/13. cc:attys 1-17-13(mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Storagecraft Technology Corporation With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 6/28/2013. James Knowles is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/26/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/04/12. cc:attys 12-04-12(mll, ) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/12. cc:attys 11-30-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/30/12. cc:attys 11-30-12(mll, ) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and E-Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ESI Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 30 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants SolarWinds, Inc. and SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Defendants SolarWinds, Inc. and SolarWinds, Worldwide, LLC's ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by SolarWinds, Inc..(Schortgen, Steven) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against SolarWinds, Inc., filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A..(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/12. cc:attys 10-29-12 (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint to Add SolarWinds Worldwide, LLC by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. This civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue, with the following causes: 6:12cv228, 6:12cv229, 6:12cv230, and 6:12cv232. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv227 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the Lead Case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/09/12. cc:attys 10-09-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 6/28/2013. James Knowles is appointed Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/26/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/12. cc:attys 10-02-12(mll, ) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/26/12. cc:attys 9-27-12(mll, ) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order, Discovery Order and E-Discovery Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/24/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 9/10/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Sign-in Sheet) (sms, ) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 9/10/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/12. cc:attys 8-20-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 16 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant Texas Instruments Incorporated by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Texas Instruments Incorporated.(Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Texas Instruments Incorporated.( Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Clay Roth on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated (Roth, Brendan) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl R Roth on behalf of Texas Instruments Incorporated (Roth, Carl) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Texas Instruments Incorporated.( Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Return of Service Executed as to Texas Instruments Incorporated on 4/17/2012, by personal service; answer due: 5/8/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Instruments Incorporated, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen E Edwards on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Edwards, Stephen) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Texas Instruments Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3521794.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,024,696, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?