Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. BMW North America, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00510
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 7:02 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo BMW North America, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Philip Lavelle +1 202 799 4780 +1 202 799 5021 joe.lavelle@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Neal Stein +1 202 346 8000 +1 202 346 8102 andrew.stein@dlapiper.com
v.
No Logo BMW North America, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Philip Lavelle +1 202 799 4780 +1 202 799 5021 joe.lavelle@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Neal Stein +1 202 346 8000 +1 202 346 8102 andrew.stein@dlapiper.com
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft are DISMISSED with prejuduice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BMW North America, LLC (mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by BMW North America, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against BMW North America, LLC, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant BMW North America, LLC from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/11/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Space Space

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 41 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?