Condatis LLC v. Trico Marine Services Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:10-cv-00663
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Leonard Davis
Last Updated January 15, 2017 at 3:32 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Condatis LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by NELSON LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Joseph Nelson +1 903 561 8449 +1 877 534 6769 kyle@knelsonlaw.com

Represented by po box 750 Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Phillip Love +1 903 690 7100 +1 903 392 2267 greg@lovetrialfirm.com

Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Stevens Henry, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott English Stevens +1 903 753 6760 +1 903 753 6761 scott@stevenshenry.com

Represented by The Dotson Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darrell Glyn Dotson +1 903 212 3113 +1 903 757 2387 darrell@dotsonlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Trico Marine Services, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Eugene Mitchell +1 214 720 4300 +1 214 981 9339 john.mitchell@akerman.com

Represented by Vinson & Elkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angela B Degeyter +1 214 220 7763 +1 214 999 7763 adegeyter@velaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Notice 5 of Voluntary Dismissal of deft Trico Marine Services Inc is GRANTED and deft is hereby dismissed without prejudice of all claims. Each party will bear its own costs and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/10. cc:attys 12-30-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Condatis LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Trico Marine Services Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Trico Marine Services Inc., filed by Condatis LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER severing defendant Trico Marine Services Inc from civil action 6:10cv600; staying this case and ordering deft Trico Marine Services Inc to file a notice that the bankruptcy proceedings have concluded within 10 days of their completion. The Court waives the filing fee in the new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/10. cc:attys 12-14-10(mll, ) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 42 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?