Tobi Gellman, as Trustee of the Mayer Michael Lebowitz Trust v. ADT Security Services, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:10-cv-00501
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 6:26 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tobi Gellman, as Trustee of the Mayer Michael Lebowitz Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W Goldstein +1 713 877 1515 +1 713 877 1145 egoldstein@gliplaw.com
v.
No Logo ADT Security Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 183
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit byPlaintiff Gellman against Defendant ADT are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/23/2012. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
    Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by ADT Security Services Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/3/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 5 Motion to Stay. ORDERED, that this action is hereby STAYED pending the determination of Plaintiffs Appeal of the 12/14/2010 Memorandum Opinion and Order (D.N. 194) granting Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, and dismissing without prejudice, in the related matter pending in this Court styled Tobi Gellman, as Trustee of the Mayer Michael Lebowitz Trust v. ADT Security Services, Inc., et al. (Civil Action No. 2:07-cv-00282-TJW). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/12/2011. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ADT Security Services Inc. (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra C Fennell on behalf of ADT Security Services Inc (Fennell, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 11/22/2010. (ch, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                  COMPLAINT against ADT Security Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2769696.), filed by Tobi Gellman, as Trustee of the Mayer Michael Lebowitz Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/22/2010: # 3 Civil Cover Sheet (Signed)) (ch, ). (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 21 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?