Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00284
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:44 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch Stewart Kolasch & Birch, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Gorenstein +1 703 205 8000 +1 703 205 8050 cg@bskb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ali M Imam +1 703 205 8000 +1 703 205 8050 ami@bskb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder msmith@bskb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Mitsubishi Motors North America Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
      DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Motors Corporation for Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
          ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
              ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles Gorenstein on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4113647. (Gorenstein, Charles) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ali M Imam on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4113646. (Imam, Ali) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael T Smith on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4109431. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv278 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Issued as to Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT against Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4063657.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?