Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Wildpackets, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00267
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:37 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Wildpackets, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael John Sacksteder +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 msacksteder@fenwick.com
v.
No Logo Wildpackets, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael John Sacksteder +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 msacksteder@fenwick.com
Space Lauren Estelle Whittemore +1 650 988 8500 +1 415 281 1350 lwhittemore@fenwick.com
No Logo Wildpackets, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Sacksteder +1 415 875 2300 +1 415 281 1350 msacksteder@fenwick.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiffs and Defendant Wildpackets Inc are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs and Defendant shall each bear their own attorney's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Change of Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial purposes only. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv256 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. A single ESI, Discovery, Protective, and Docket Control Order shall govern the consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit a uniform Docket Control Order by 6-14-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc..(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Estelle Whittemore on behalf of Wildpackets, Inc. (Whittemore, Lauren) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Sacksteder on behalf of Wildpackets, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wildpackets, Inc. (Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                        Defendant WilkdPackets, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint for Patent Infringement By Uniloc Plaintiffs; Demand for Trial By Jury, COUNTERCLAIM to Uniloc Plaintiffs' Original Complaint for Patent Infringement against Wildpackets, Inc. by Wildpackets, Inc..(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Scott R Maynard on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4145003. (Maynard, Scott) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                            Return of Service Executed as to Wildpackets, Inc. on 4/29/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 5/20/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding May 21, 2013 Case Management Conference (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Wildpackets, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT against Wildpackets, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4056805.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,490,216)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?