Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Kia Motors America, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00282
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 12:19 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
v.
Kia Motors America, Inc. Kia Motors America, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kia Motors America, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    FINAL JUDGMENT. The parties shall take nothing and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Kia Motors America Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Kia Motors America, Inc. served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
          ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv278 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                SUMMONS Issued as to Kia Motors America, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against Kia Motors America, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4063513.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 41 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?