Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Sony Creative Software Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00973
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 1:53 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
Sony Creative Software Inc. Sony Creative Software Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Churchill +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 rchurchill@ldlkm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory S. Gewirtz +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ggewirtz@ldlkm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FAHD KHALID MAJIDUDDIN +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 fmajiduddin@lernerdavid.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
v.
Sony Creative Software Inc. Sony Creative Software Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Churchill +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 rchurchill@ldlkm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory S. Gewirtz +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ggewirtz@ldlkm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED FAHD KHALID MAJIDUDDIN +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 fmajiduddin@lernerdavid.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/15/2013 Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2013 Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Hon. W. Royal Furgeson, Jr., Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by United States District Court For The Northern District of Texas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space W. Royal Furgeson, Jr. +1 214 753 2355
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims and counterclaims between Platinfiffs and Defendant are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees, expenses, and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The civil action 6:12cv968 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to submit their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions and to comply with all other deadlines is extended to 11-04-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/22/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Invalidity Contentions and All Oct. 21 Deadlines) by Sony Creative Software Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Majiduddin, Fahd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/30/2013: # 3 Revised Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 10/21/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                Joint MOTION for Entry of Discovery, E-Discovery, and Protective Orders by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Regarding Disclosures Required by Paragraphs 2(B) and 2(C) of the Court's Discovery Order (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER that the parties submit their agreed Discovery Orders, ESI Orders, and Protective Orders in compliance with this Order within ten days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Sony Creative Software Inc. (Defendant Sony Creative Software Inc.'s Notice of Compliance) (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 2/2/2015. The Hon William Royal Furgeson Jr is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 1/4/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 9/11/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Disclosures (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Joint Notice of Dispute (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER re Notices of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order, and ESI Order. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint notice of dispute indicating the points that cannot be agreed upon, each partys proposal, and a brief statement of reasoning in support of each partys proposal. The joint notice SHALL be submitted on or before 9-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Sony Creative Software Inc. (Defendants' Notice of Agreement Regarding Docket Control Order and Notice of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order) (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Docket Control Order and Notice of Dispute Concerning Discovery Order, Protective Order and ESI Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to File Additional Related Cases (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/29/2013 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/25/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to 18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant Sony Creative Software, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Creative Software Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Sony Creative Software Inc.. (Henson, Walter) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Sony Creative Software Inc..(Henson, Walter) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Raymond B Churchill, Jr on behalf of Sony Creative Software Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3976675. (Churchill, Raymond) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Fahd K Majiduddin on behalf of Sony Creative Software Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3976448. (Majiduddin, Fahd) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gregory S Gewirtz on behalf of Sony Creative Software Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3974841. (Gewirtz, Gregory) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sony Creative Software Inc..( Henson, Walter) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Return of Service Executed as to Sony Creative Software Inc. on 1/7/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 1/28/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Creative Software Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Sony Creative Software Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3927886.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,024,696)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?