Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. v. Charter Communications, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00540
District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 8:17 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BEAR CREEK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley Manion Jones Hake Kurowski LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer B. Furey +1 617 737 3100 +1 617 737 0374 jfurey@cmjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MIELE LAW GROUP, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony L. Miele +1 617 818 2692 tony@mielelawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ventker & Warman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marissa Marriott Henderson +1 757 625 1192 mhenderson@ventkerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David N. Ventker +1 757 625 1192 +1 757 625 1476 dventker@ventkerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Charter Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2c

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nichole Buck Vanderslice +1 804 272 2920 +1 804 697 6135 nvanderslice@nbvlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 281
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal; each party to bear its own costs and fees as to Bear Creek Technologies, Inc., Charter Communications, Inc. (lsal) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc., Charter Communications, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal (Original To Be Filed by Hand))(Vanderslice, Nichole) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/28/2011 at 03:25 PM before District Judge John A. Gibney Jr. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 10/25/11. (wtuc) (Entered: 10/25/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING defendant's 11 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading; the defendant shall file its response to the Complaint no later than November 3, 2011. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 9/26/2011. (lhin, ) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Charter Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (Vanderslice, Nichole). Modified docket entry on 09/23/2011. (walk, ). (Entered: 09/22/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole Buck Vanderslice on behalf of Charter Communications, Inc. (Vanderslice, Nichole) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc.; Charter Communications, Inc. served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. (lhin, ) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. for the Admission of Jennifer B. Furey, Esquire Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 09/01/2011. (walk, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. for the Admission of Jennifer Bush Furey, Esquire, Pro hac vice. (Attachment: # 1 Receipt)(lhin) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                    Summons Reissued as to Charter Communications, Inc. (summons mailed to counsel for service). (lhin, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                      Summons Returned UNEXECUTED by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. as to Charter Communications, Inc. (lhin, ) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                        Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, Inc. and returned to counsel of record via first-class mail for service; (lsal) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                          Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 7889722. (lsal) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                            Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (lsal) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT against Charter Communications, Inc. (Filing fee $350.00 receipt number 24583012581) filed by Bear Creek Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Receipt)(lsal) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 96 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?