Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC v. Blackstone Group LP
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00341
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 6:38 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Robert Lamb +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 wrlamb@gillamsmithlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
v.
No Logo Blackstone Group Lp, Defendant
Unknown Role, Schwarzman Stephen A
Unknown Role, Bcp V Gp L.l.c.
Unknown Role, SW Cayman Ltd L.P.
Unknown Role, Bma V L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Pinnacle Foods, Inc.
Unknown Role, Kosmos Energy Ltd.
Unknown Role, Btoa L.l.c.
Unknown Role, CF Corp
Unknown Role, Bto Gp L.l.c.
Unknown Role, GSO Holdings I LLC
Eastman Kodak Company Unknown Role, Eastman Kodak Company
Unknown Role, Bma Vi L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Riata Energy, Inc.
Unknown Role, Apria, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J. McNabnay +1 214 747 5070 +1 214 747 2091 mcnabnay@fr.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE - FILED IN ERROR ENTERED IN WRONG CASE PLEASE IGNORE re 10 Affidavit of Service (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
    ***FILED IN WRONG CASE PLEASE IGNORE***AFFIDAVIT of Service for served on Vocalocity Inc on 7/6/13, filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (ehs, ) Modified on 6/28/2013 (ehs, ). (Entered: 06/26/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. Blackstone Group LP is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/7/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
        MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Blackstone Group LP.( McNabnay, Neil) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. Blackstone Group LP served CMRR on 5/1/2013, answer due 5/22/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
              SUMMONS Issued as to Blackstone Group LP. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC (Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Blackstone Group LP ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4109488.), filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamb, William) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 16 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?