Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Tiffen Company, LLC, The
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-01019
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 11:08 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Tiffen Company, LLC, The, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims against Defendant are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan Casey O'Neill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (O'Neill, Ryan) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. ORDERED that Tiffens deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement is extended until and including March 21, 2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of Defendant The Tiffen Company, LLC by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tiffens deadline to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint is extended to 3-06-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/30/13. cc:attys 1-30-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
              Return of Service Executed as to Tiffen Company, LLC, on 1/14/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 2/4/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of Defendant The Tiffen Company, LLC by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Issued as to Tiffen Company, LLC, The and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Tiffen Company, LLC, The, filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Tiffen Company, LLC, The ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3930599.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 5,490,216, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Casto, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?