Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00572
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 19, 2017 at 2:36 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Fagan, Jr. +1 214 627 9975 mfagan@chenmalin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant
No Logo Boost Mobile, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Motorola Mobility LLC Motorola Mobility LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Sprint Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sprint Spectrum, LP, Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims against all defendants in this cause are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for all named Defendants to this action to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 10-14-2013. No more extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of All Defendants by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                          SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Verizon Communications, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es), # 3 Summons(es), # 4 Summons(es), # 5 Summons(es), # 6 Summons(es), # 7 Summons(es), # 8 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                      COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Motorola Mobility LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Verizon Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4250595.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US 6,377,804, # 3 Exhibit B - US 6,819,923, # 4 Exhibit C - US 7,215,962, # 5 Exhibit D - US 7,941,174, # 6 Exhibit E - US 8,055,820, # 7 Exhibit F - US 7,218,923)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?