Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Bose Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00386
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 5:54 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Bose Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED without prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Norman IP Holdings, LLC.( DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv384 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
          ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Bose Corporation. (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 6/13/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 06/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Issued as to Bose Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chester Jianbon Shiu on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Gerald DiNovo on behalf of Norman IP Holdings, LLC (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against Bose Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4134417.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Adam) Modified on 5/13/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Space Space

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 60 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?