Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00281
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 6:46 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
v.
No Logo Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. All costs and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC Certificate Of Interested Parties (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC served via Melanie McGrath on 4/2/2013, answer due 4/23/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
          ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv278 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.( Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS REISSUED as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                      SUMMONS Issued as to Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                        Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4063452.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 29 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?