Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. General Electric Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00516
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 5:38 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
v.
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr. +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 wlackey@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutton McAughan Deaver PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A Andrews +1 713 800 5700 +1 713 800 5699 jandrews@smd-iplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James McAughan, Jr. +1 713 800 5700 +1 713 800 5699 bmcaughan@smd-iplaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims by pltf against deft General Electric Company are DISMISSED with prejudice. All counterclaims by deft against pltf are dismissed as moot. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-01-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
    ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to 2 Complaint by General Electric Company.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT against General Electric Company, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendant General Electric Company from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 59 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?